EP1991188 - A DISPOSABLE PANT-LIKE ABSORBENT UNDERGARMENT THAT PROVIDES CLOSE TO THE BODY FIT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 13.11.2009 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.11.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 16.12.2009 [2009/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KIMBERLY-CLARK WORLDWIDE, INC. 401 North Lake Street Neenah, WI 54956 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2008/47] | For all designated states KIMBERLY-CLARK WORLDWIDE, INC. 401 North Lake Street Neenah WI 54956 / US | ||
Former [2008/39] | For all designated states KIMBERLY-CLARK WORLDWIDE, INC. 401 North Lake Street Neenah, WI 54956 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KRAUTKRAMER, Patsy Ann 5000 Petrack Lane Omro, WI 54963 / US | 02 /
PAVELETZKE, Julie Ann W2385 Holly Lane Appleton, WI 54915 / US | 03 /
KISTLER, Annastacia Jane 400 West Glendale Avenue Appleton, WI 54911 / US | 04 /
HAMILTON, Wendy Lynn 1412 Westwood Drive Neenah, WI 54956 / US | [2008/47] | Representative(s) | Davies, Christopher Robert, et al Dehns St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2008/47] | Davies, Christopher Robert, et al Frank B. Dehn & Co. St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | Application number, filing date | 07705956.6 | 26.02.2007 | [2008/47] | WO2007IB50613 | Priority number, date | US20060367220 | 03.03.2006 Original published format: US 367220 | [2008/47] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007099493 | Date: | 07.09.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/36] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1991188 | Date: | 19.11.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.09.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/47] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 07.09.2007 | Classification | IPC: | A61F13/15 | [2008/47] | CPC: |
A61F13/496 (EP,US);
A41B9/12 (KR);
A41B9/00 (KR);
A61F13/49019 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [2009/13] |
Former [2008/47] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ENG AM KÖRPER ANLIEGENDE, HÖSCHENARTIGE SAUGFÄHIGE EINWEGUNTERBEKLEIDUNG | [2008/47] | English: | A DISPOSABLE PANT-LIKE ABSORBENT UNDERGARMENT THAT PROVIDES CLOSE TO THE BODY FIT | [2008/47] | French: | SOUS-VETEMENT ABSORBANT DE TYPE CULOTTE JETABLE A COUPE PRES DU CORPS | [2008/47] | Entry into regional phase | 10.09.2008 | National basic fee paid | 10.09.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.09.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.09.2008 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 10.09.2008 | Examination requested [2008/47] | 07.10.2008 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 07.11.2008 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, IS, LT, LU, LV, MC, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 15.12.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 26.06.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2009/51] | 30.07.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2009/51] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.02.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]EP0753292 (UNI CHARM CORP [JP]) [Y] 1-15 * column 1, line 2 - line 6 * * column 1, line 47 - line 49 * * column 1, line 55 - line 58 * * column 2, line 1 - line 8 * * column 3, line 21 - line 51 * * figure 1 *; | [A]EP0787474 (UNI CHARM CORP [JP]) [A] 1 * column 2, line 30 - line 47 * * column 3, line 2 - line 4 * * figures 1-4 *; | [XY]WO9925296 (KIMBERLY CLARK CO [US]) [X] 1-20 * abstract * * page 3, line 31 - line 36 * * page 6 * * page 20, line 2 - line 34 * * page 19, line 16 - line 31 * * figures 1-3 * [Y] 1-15; | [A]EP1174103 (UNI CHARM CORP [JP]) [A] 1 * column 1, paragraph 1 * * column 2, paragraph 13 * * column 3, line 52 - line 57 * * column 5, paragraph 27 ** figure 5 *; | [X]EP1208827 (UNI CHARM CORP [JP]) [X] 1-3,5,6 * abstract * * column 1, paragraph 1 * * column 2, paragraph 7 * * column 2, paragraph 9 * * column 5, paragraph 22 * * figures 1,2 *; | [X]US2003135189 (UMEBAYASHI TOYOSHI [JP]) [X] 1 * page 1, paragraph 6 - paragraph 7 * * page 3, paragraph 39 * * figures 1-3 *; | [X]EP1541098 (HAKUJUJI KABUSHIKI KAISHA [JP]) [X] 1,5-7 * column 1, paragraph 1 * * column 2, line 14 - line 26 * * column 2, line 34 - line 55 * * column 8, line 15 - line 16 * * column 9, paragraph 36 * * figure 1 * |