EP2103525 - FILM FEEDING DEVICE AND FILLING/PACKAGING SYSTEM WITH THE FILM FEEDING DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.02.2020 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 08.03.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 14.10.2018 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 17.11.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.06.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY, HU | published on 27.07.2022 [2022/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Orihiro Engineering Co., Ltd. 5-20, Midoricho 4-chome Takasaki-shi Gunma 370-0073 / JP | [2009/39] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TSURUTA, Orihiro c/o Orihiro Engineering Co. Ltd. 5-20 Midoricho 4-chome Takasaki-shi Gunma 370-0073 / JP | 02 /
YAMADA, Shunji c/o Orihiro Engineering Co. Ltd. 5-20 Midoricho 4-chome Takasaki-shi Gunma 370-0073 / JP | [2019/15] |
Former [2009/39] | 01 /
TSURUTA, Orihiro c/o Orihiro Engineering Co. Ltd. 5-20 Midoricho 4-chome Takasaki-shi Gunma 370-0073 / JP | ||
02 /
YAMADA, Shunji c/o Orihiro Engineering Co. Ltd. 5-20 Midoricho 4-chome Takasaki-shi Gunma 370-0073 / JP | Representative(s) | Oppermann, Frank, et al OANDO Oppermann & Oppermann Wilhelminenstrasse 1a 65193 Wiesbaden / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2019/15] | Oppermann, Frank, et al OANDO Oppermann & Oppermann LLP Wilhelminenstrasse 1a 65193 Wiesbaden / DE | ||
Former [2012/12] | Oppermann, Frank, et al Oppermann & Oppermann LLP John-F.-Kennedy-Straße 4 65189 Wiesbaden / DE | ||
Former [2009/39] | Luderschmidt, Schüler & Partner Patentanwälte John-F.-Kennedy-Strasse 4 65189 Wiesbaden / DE | Application number, filing date | 07706837.7 | 16.01.2007 | [2009/39] | WO2007JP50510 | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2008087711 | Date: | 24.07.2008 | Language: | JA | [2008/30] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2103525 | Date: | 23.09.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/39] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2103525 | Date: | 10.04.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/15] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 24.07.2008 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.05.2011 | Classification | IPC: | B65B41/12, B65B9/20, B65H19/18, B65B41/16, B65B55/10 | [2018/36] | CPC: |
B65B41/16 (EP,US);
B65B41/12 (KR);
B65B51/10 (KR);
B65B55/103 (EP,US);
B65B9/20 (EP,KR,US);
B65H19/18 (KR);
B65H19/1852 (EP,US);
B65H2301/46172 (EP,US);
B65H2301/46174 (EP,US);
B65H2301/4621 (EP,US);
B65H2301/4634 (EP,US);
B65H2301/46412 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2009/39] | B65B41/12, B65B9/20, B65H19/18 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2019/15] |
Former [2009/39] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | FOLIENZUFÜHRUNGSVORRICHTUNG UND FÜLL-/VERPACKUNGSSYSTEM MIT DER FOLIENZUFÜHRUNGSVORRICHTUNG | [2009/39] | English: | FILM FEEDING DEVICE AND FILLING/PACKAGING SYSTEM WITH THE FILM FEEDING DEVICE | [2009/39] | French: | DISPOSITIF D'AVANCEMENT DE FILMS ET SYSTÈME D'ENSACHAGE ÉQUIPÉ DE CE DISPOSITIF | [2009/39] | Entry into regional phase | 09.07.2009 | Translation filed | 09.07.2009 | National basic fee paid | 09.07.2009 | Search fee paid | 09.07.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.07.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.07.2009 | Examination requested [2009/39] | 02.12.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.11.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.03.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.10.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.02.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 15.02.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 19.02.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 20.11.2017 | Opposition(s) | 13.01.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2020/12] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.07.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.01.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.01.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 11.12.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 18.12.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 30.12.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 15.12.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 30.11.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 05.01.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 14.01.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 13 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 16.01.2007 | AT | 10.04.2019 | CY | 10.04.2019 | CZ | 10.04.2019 | DK | 10.04.2019 | EE | 10.04.2019 | ES | 10.04.2019 | FI | 10.04.2019 | LT | 10.04.2019 | LV | 10.04.2019 | MC | 10.04.2019 | NL | 10.04.2019 | PL | 10.04.2019 | RO | 10.04.2019 | SE | 10.04.2019 | SI | 10.04.2019 | SK | 10.04.2019 | TR | 10.04.2019 | BG | 10.07.2019 | GR | 11.07.2019 | IS | 10.08.2019 | PT | 10.09.2019 | [2022/27] |
Former [2020/39] | AT | 10.04.2019 | |
CZ | 10.04.2019 | ||
DK | 10.04.2019 | ||
EE | 10.04.2019 | ||
ES | 10.04.2019 | ||
FI | 10.04.2019 | ||
LT | 10.04.2019 | ||
LV | 10.04.2019 | ||
MC | 10.04.2019 | ||
NL | 10.04.2019 | ||
PL | 10.04.2019 | ||
RO | 10.04.2019 | ||
SE | 10.04.2019 | ||
SI | 10.04.2019 | ||
SK | 10.04.2019 | ||
TR | 10.04.2019 | ||
BG | 10.07.2019 | ||
GR | 11.07.2019 | ||
IS | 10.08.2019 | ||
PT | 10.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/26] | AT | 10.04.2019 | |
CZ | 10.04.2019 | ||
DK | 10.04.2019 | ||
EE | 10.04.2019 | ||
ES | 10.04.2019 | ||
FI | 10.04.2019 | ||
LT | 10.04.2019 | ||
LV | 10.04.2019 | ||
NL | 10.04.2019 | ||
PL | 10.04.2019 | ||
RO | 10.04.2019 | ||
SE | 10.04.2019 | ||
SI | 10.04.2019 | ||
SK | 10.04.2019 | ||
TR | 10.04.2019 | ||
BG | 10.07.2019 | ||
GR | 11.07.2019 | ||
IS | 10.08.2019 | ||
PT | 10.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/17] | AT | 10.04.2019 | |
CZ | 10.04.2019 | ||
DK | 10.04.2019 | ||
EE | 10.04.2019 | ||
ES | 10.04.2019 | ||
FI | 10.04.2019 | ||
LT | 10.04.2019 | ||
LV | 10.04.2019 | ||
NL | 10.04.2019 | ||
PL | 10.04.2019 | ||
RO | 10.04.2019 | ||
SE | 10.04.2019 | ||
SK | 10.04.2019 | ||
TR | 10.04.2019 | ||
BG | 10.07.2019 | ||
GR | 11.07.2019 | ||
IS | 10.08.2019 | ||
PT | 10.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/11] | AT | 10.04.2019 | |
CZ | 10.04.2019 | ||
DK | 10.04.2019 | ||
EE | 10.04.2019 | ||
ES | 10.04.2019 | ||
FI | 10.04.2019 | ||
LT | 10.04.2019 | ||
LV | 10.04.2019 | ||
NL | 10.04.2019 | ||
PL | 10.04.2019 | ||
RO | 10.04.2019 | ||
SE | 10.04.2019 | ||
SK | 10.04.2019 | ||
BG | 10.07.2019 | ||
GR | 11.07.2019 | ||
IS | 10.08.2019 | ||
PT | 10.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/10] | AT | 10.04.2019 | |
CZ | 10.04.2019 | ||
DK | 10.04.2019 | ||
ES | 10.04.2019 | ||
FI | 10.04.2019 | ||
LT | 10.04.2019 | ||
LV | 10.04.2019 | ||
NL | 10.04.2019 | ||
PL | 10.04.2019 | ||
RO | 10.04.2019 | ||
SE | 10.04.2019 | ||
BG | 10.07.2019 | ||
GR | 11.07.2019 | ||
IS | 10.08.2019 | ||
PT | 10.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/09] | AT | 10.04.2019 | |
CZ | 10.04.2019 | ||
DK | 10.04.2019 | ||
ES | 10.04.2019 | ||
FI | 10.04.2019 | ||
LT | 10.04.2019 | ||
LV | 10.04.2019 | ||
NL | 10.04.2019 | ||
PL | 10.04.2019 | ||
SE | 10.04.2019 | ||
BG | 10.07.2019 | ||
GR | 11.07.2019 | ||
IS | 10.08.2019 | ||
PT | 10.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/04] | AT | 10.04.2019 | |
ES | 10.04.2019 | ||
FI | 10.04.2019 | ||
LT | 10.04.2019 | ||
LV | 10.04.2019 | ||
NL | 10.04.2019 | ||
PL | 10.04.2019 | ||
SE | 10.04.2019 | ||
BG | 10.07.2019 | ||
GR | 11.07.2019 | ||
IS | 10.08.2019 | ||
PT | 10.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/03] | AT | 10.04.2019 | |
ES | 10.04.2019 | ||
FI | 10.04.2019 | ||
LT | 10.04.2019 | ||
LV | 10.04.2019 | ||
NL | 10.04.2019 | ||
PL | 10.04.2019 | ||
SE | 10.04.2019 | ||
BG | 10.07.2019 | ||
GR | 11.07.2019 | ||
PT | 10.09.2019 | ||
Former [2019/52] | ES | 10.04.2019 | |
FI | 10.04.2019 | ||
LT | 10.04.2019 | ||
LV | 10.04.2019 | ||
NL | 10.04.2019 | ||
PL | 10.04.2019 | ||
SE | 10.04.2019 | ||
BG | 10.07.2019 | ||
GR | 11.07.2019 | ||
PT | 10.09.2019 | ||
Former [2019/51] | ES | 10.04.2019 | |
FI | 10.04.2019 | ||
LT | 10.04.2019 | ||
LV | 10.04.2019 | ||
NL | 10.04.2019 | ||
SE | 10.04.2019 | ||
BG | 10.07.2019 | ||
GR | 11.07.2019 | ||
PT | 10.09.2019 | ||
Former [2019/48] | ES | 10.04.2019 | |
FI | 10.04.2019 | ||
LT | 10.04.2019 | ||
NL | 10.04.2019 | ||
SE | 10.04.2019 | ||
PT | 10.09.2019 | ||
Former [2019/47] | ES | 10.04.2019 | |
FI | 10.04.2019 | ||
LT | 10.04.2019 | ||
NL | 10.04.2019 | ||
Former [2019/44] | NL | 10.04.2019 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US4219378 (MARSCHKE CARL R [US]) [Y] 1-10 * abstract * * column 4, lines 9-61 *; | [Y]EP0780331 (EASTMAN KODAK CO [US]) [Y] 3* abstract *; | [Y]US2006026926 (TRIEL MANFRED V [DE], et al) [Y] 1-10 * abstract * * paragraph [0004] - paragraph [0007] * * paragraph [0037] * * paragraph [0043] * | International search | [A]JPS6355027 (ASAHI CHEMICAL IND); | [Y]JP2003166164 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC WORKS LTD, et al); | [Y]JP2005145559 (NIPPON SEIKI CO LTD); | [Y]JP2006256674 (TETRA PAK JAPAN) |