EP1985640 - RESIN COMPOSITION AND OPTICAL MEMBER USING CURED PRODUCT OF SUCH RESIN COMPOSITION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 22.04.2011 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.04.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 25.05.2011 [2011/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hitachi Chemical Co., Ltd. 1-1, Nishi-Shinjuku 2-chome Shinjuku-ku Tokyo 163-0449 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2008/44] | For all designated states Hitachi Chemical Co., Ltd. 1-1, Nishi-Shinjuku 2-chome, Shinjuku-ku Tokyo 163-0449 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KOBAYASHI, Shingo c/o Hitachi Chemical Co., Ltd. 48, Wadai, Tsukuba-shi Ibaraki 300-4247 / JP | 02 /
TOMIYAMA, Takeo c/o Hitachi Chemical Co., Ltd. 48, Wadai, Tsukuba-shi Ibaraki 300-4247 / JP | 03 /
YOSHIDA, Akihiro c/o Hitachi Chemical Co., Ltd. 48, Wadai, Tsukuba-shi Ibaraki 300-4247 / JP | 04 /
TANAKA, Syouko c/o Hitachi Chemical Co., Ltd. 48, Wadai, Tsukuba-shi Ibaraki 300-4247 / JP | [2008/45] |
Former [2008/44] | 01 /
KOBAYASHI, Shingo - - / JP | ||
02 /
TOMIYAMA, Takeo - - / JP | |||
03 /
YOSHIDA, Akihiro - - / JP | |||
04 /
TANAKA, Syouko - - / JP | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastrasse 30 81925 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/44] | HOFFMANN EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 07707092.8 | 19.01.2007 | [2008/44] | WO2007JP50804 | Priority number, date | JP20060013038 | 20.01.2006 Original published format: JP 2006013038 | [2008/44] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007083749 | Date: | 26.07.2007 | Language: | JA | [2007/30] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1985640 | Date: | 29.10.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/44] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 26.07.2007 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.02.2010 | Classification | IPC: | C08F290/12, G02B1/04 | [2008/44] | CPC: |
C08F265/06 (EP,KR,US);
C08F290/12 (EP,KR,US);
C08F220/325 (KR);
C08F265/00 (EP,US);
C08F265/04 (EP,US);
C08F283/10 (EP,KR,US);
| C-Set: |
C08L51/003, C08L2666/02 (EP,US);
C08L51/003, C08L2666/04 (US,EP) | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/44] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | HARZZUSAMMENSETZUNG UND OPTISCHES ELEMENT UNTER VERWENDUNG DES GEHÄRTETEN PRODUKTS EINER DERARTIGEN HARZZUSAMMENSETZUNG | [2008/44] | English: | RESIN COMPOSITION AND OPTICAL MEMBER USING CURED PRODUCT OF SUCH RESIN COMPOSITION | [2008/44] | French: | COMPOSITION DE RÉSINE ET ÉLÉMENT OPTIQUE UTILISANT UN PRODUIT DURCI D'UNE TELLE COMPOSITION DE RÉSINE | [2008/44] | Entry into regional phase | 06.08.2008 | Translation filed | 06.08.2008 | National basic fee paid | 06.08.2008 | Search fee paid | 06.08.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.08.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.08.2008 | Examination requested [2008/44] | 26.05.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 07.12.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2011/21] | 10.01.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2011/21] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 26.05.2010 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.01.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.01.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.2011 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]EP0714916 (ATOCHEM ELF SA [FR]) [X] 1-4 * examples 27, 29-35, 37-40 * [I] 1-5; | [XI]WO03070833 (PPG IND OHIO INC [US]) [X] 1-2,4 * Coatings A, B, C *;; examples 1-3 * [I] 1-5 | International search | [X]JPH11209443 (TOAGOSEI CO LTD); | [X]JPS6381301 (ASAHI CHEMICAL IND); | [X]JPH08225708 (ATOCHEM ELF SA); | [X]JPH04366178 (HITACHI CHEMICAL CO LTD); | [X]JP2004123780 (DAINIPPON INK & CHEMICALS); | [X]JP2002302522 (HITACHI CHEMICAL CO LTD); | [X]JPH10204327 (KANSAI PAINT CO LTD); | [X]JPH10204326 (KANSAI PAINT CO LTD); | [X]JPS58118873 (HITACHI CHEMICAL CO LTD); | [X]JPH11100418 (HITACHI CHEMICAL CO LTD); | [A]JPH0491152 (MITSUI TOATSU CHEMICALS) |