EP1977924 - IN-WHEEL MOTOR SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 19.11.2010 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.11.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 22.12.2010 [2010/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kabushiki Kaisha Bridgestone 10-1, Kyobashi 1-chome Chuo-ku Tokyo 104-8340 / JP | [2008/41] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
IWANO, Haruo, KABUSHIKI KAISHA BRIDGESTONE TECHNICAL CENTER 1-1, Ogawahigashi-cho 3-chome Kodaira-shi Tokyo 1878531 / JP | [2008/41] | Representative(s) | Whalley, Kevin Marks & Clerk LLP 90 Long Acre London WC2E 9RA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2008/41] | Whalley, Kevin Marks & Clerk 90 Long Acre London WC2E 9RA / GB | Application number, filing date | 07707197.5 | 23.01.2007 | [2008/41] | WO2007JP50934 | Priority number, date | JP20060013863 | 23.01.2006 Original published format: JP 2006013863 | [2008/41] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007083800 | Date: | 26.07.2007 | Language: | JA | [2007/30] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1977924 | Date: | 08.10.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/41] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 26.07.2007 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.10.2009 | Classification | IPC: | B60G13/18, B60K7/00, F16F15/02, H02K7/14, F16F7/116, F16F7/104 | [2009/47] | CPC: |
H02K7/14 (EP,US);
B60G7/008 (EP,US);
B60K7/0007 (EP,US);
F16F7/116 (EP,US);
B60G2200/142 (EP,US);
B60G2200/144 (EP,US);
B60G2200/422 (EP,US);
B60G2200/44 (EP,US);
B60G2202/312 (EP,US);
B60G2204/30 (EP,US);
B60G2300/50 (EP,US);
B60K17/046 (EP,US);
B60K2007/0038 (EP,US);
B60K2007/0092 (EP,US);
B60L2220/44 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2008/41] | B60K7/00, B60G13/16, F16F15/02, H02K7/14 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2009/08] |
Former [2008/41] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | IN EIN RAD INTEGRIERTES MOTORSYSTEM | [2008/41] | English: | IN-WHEEL MOTOR SYSTEM | [2008/41] | French: | SYSTÈME DE MOTEUR-ROUE | [2008/41] | Entry into regional phase | 24.07.2008 | Translation filed | 23.07.2008 | National basic fee paid | 23.07.2008 | Search fee paid | 23.07.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.07.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.07.2008 | Examination requested [2008/41] | 26.08.2008 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 30.09.2008 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, IS, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 12.02.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.06.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2010/51] | 29.07.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2010/51] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.01.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.01.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JP2005335467 (TOYOTA MOTOR CORP) [X] 1-3 * An automated computer translation of this Japanese publication can be found on the website of the Japanese Patent Office: http://www.ipdl.inpit.go.jp/homepg_e.ipdl at: http://dossier1.ipdl.inpit.go.jp/AIPN/odse_top_fwi.ipdl?N0000=7401; paragraphs [0026] - [0028]; figure 1 * * paragraphs [0040] - [0050]; figures 2,3 * * the whole document *; | [X]US2005257970 (KAKINAMI TAKUMA [JP], et al) [X] 1,2 * abstract *; | [A]US2005056471 (KURATA FUMITO [JP]) [A] 2,3 * abstract *; | [A]WO2004101304 (TOYOTA MOTOR CO LTD [JP], et al) [A] 2 * abstract *; | [A]JP2005329911 (BRIDGESTONE CORP) [A] 3 * abstract * | International search | [X]JP2005335467 (TOYOTA MOTOR CORP); | [A]JP2005324606 (TOYOTA MOTOR CORP) |