EP1982716 - NOVEL HISTIDINE DERIVATIVE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.02.2014 Database last updated on 15.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.07.2016 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 17.08.2016 [2016/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NIPPON ZOKI PHARMACEUTICAL CO. LTD. 1-2, Hiranomachi 2-chome, Chuo-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 541-0046 / JP | [2008/43] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NAKAMURA, Ko c/o NIPPON ZOKI PHARMACEUTICAL CO., LTD. Institute of Bio-Active Science, 442-1, Kawakitayama Kinashi, Kato-shi, Hyogo, 673-1461 / JP | 02 /
NAKAZAWA, Yoshitaka c/o NIPPON ZOKI PHARMACEUTICAL CO., LTD. Institute of Bio-Active Science, 442-1, Kawakitayama Kinashi, Kato-shi, Hyogo, 673-1461 / JP | 03 /
KAWAMURA, Minoru c/o NIPPON ZOKI PHARMACEUTICAL CO., LTD. Institute of Bio-Active Science, 442-1, Kawakitayama Kinashi, Kato-shi, Hyogo, 673-1461 / JP | 04 /
HIGASHIURA, Kunihiko c/o NIPPON ZOKI PHARMACEUTICAL CO., LTD. Institute of Bio-Active Science, 442-1, Kawakitayama Kinashi, Kato-shi, Hyogo, 673-1461 / JP | 05 /
MIURA, Tomoshi c/o NIPPON ZOKI PHARMACEUTICAL CO., LTD Institute of Bio-Active Science, 442-1, Kawakitayama Kinashi, Kato-shi, Hyogo, 673-1461 / JP | [2013/23] |
Former [2013/17] | 01 /
NAKAMURA, Ko c/o NIPPON ZOKI PHARMACEUTICAL CO., LTD. Institute e of Bio-Active Science, 442-1, Kawakitayama Kinashi, Kato-shi, Hyogo, 673-1461 / JP | ||
02 /
NAKAZAWA, Yoshitaka c/o NIPPON ZOKI PHARMACEUTICAL CO., LTD. Institute e of Bio-Active Science, 442-1, Kawakitayama Kinashi, Kato-shi, Hyogo, 673-1461 / JP | |||
03 /
KAWAMURA, Minoru c/o NIPPON ZOKI PHARMACEUTICAL CO., LTD. Institute e of Bio-Active Science, 442-1, Kawakitayama Kinashi, Kato-shi, Hyogo, 673-1461 / JP | |||
04 /
HIGASHIURA, Kunihiko c/o NIPPON ZOKI PHARMACEUTICAL CO., LTD. Institute e of Bio-Active Science, 442-1, Kawakitayama Kinashi, Kato-shi, Hyogo, 673-1461 / JP | |||
05 /
MIURA, Tomoshi c/o NIPPON ZOKI PHARMACEUTICAL CO., LTD Institute e of Bio-Active Science, 442-1, Kawakitayama Kinashi, Kato-shi, Hyogo, 673-1461 / JP | |||
Former [2013/14] | 01 /
NAKAMURA, Ko c/o NIPPON ZOKI PHARMACEUTICAL CO., LTD. Institut e of Bio-Active Science, 442-1, Kawakitayama Kinashi, Kato-shi, Hyogo, 673-1461 / JP | ||
02 /
NAKAZAWA, Yoshitaka c/o NIPPON ZOKI PHARMACEUTICAL CO., LTD. Institut e of Bio-Active Science, 442-1, Kawakitayama Kinashi, Kato-shi, Hyogo, 673-1461 / JP | |||
03 /
KAWAMURA, Minoru c/o NIPPON ZOKI PHARMACEUTICAL CO., LTD. Institut e of Bio-Active Science, 442-1, Kawakitayama Kinashi, Kato-shi, Hyogo, 673-1461 / JP | |||
04 /
HIGASHIURA, Kunihiko c/o NIPPON ZOKI PHARMACEUTICAL CO., LTD. Institut e of Bio-Active Science, 442-1, Kawakitayama Kinashi, Kato-shi, Hyogo, 673-1461 / JP | |||
05 /
MIURA, Tomoshi c/o NIPPON ZOKI PHARMACEUTICAL CO., LTD Institut e of Bio-Active Science, 442-1, Kawakitayama Kinashi, Kato-shi, Hyogo, 673-1461 / JP | |||
Former [2008/43] | 01 /
NAKAMURA, Ko c/o NIPPON ZOKI PHARMACEUTICAL CO., LTD. Institut e of Bio-Active Science, 442-1, Kawakitayama Kinashi, Kato-shi, Hyogo, 673-1461 / JP | ||
02 /
NAKAZAWA, Yoshitaka c/o NIPPON ZOKI PHARMACEUTICAL CO., LTD. Institut e of Bio-Active Science, 442-1, Kawakitayama Kinashi, Kato-shi, Hyogo, 673-1461 / JP | |||
03 /
KAWAMURA, Minoru c/o NIPPON ZOKI PHARMACEUTICAL CO., LTD. Institut e of Bio-Active Science, 442-1, Kawakitayama Kinashi, Kato-shi, Hyogo, 673-1461 / JP | |||
04 /
HIGASHIURA, Kunihiko c/o NIPPON ZOKI PHARMACEUTICAL CO., LTD. Institut e of Bio-Active Science, 442-1, Kawakitayama Kinashi, Kato-shi, Hyogo, 673-1461 / JP | |||
05 /
MIURA, Tomoshi c/o NIPPON ZOKI PHARMACEUTICAL CO., LTD Institut e of Bio-Active Science, 442-1, Kawakitayama Kinashi, Kato-shi, Hyogo, 673-1461 / JP | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastrasse 30 81925 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/14] | HOFFMANN EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | ||
Former [2008/43] | HOFFMANN EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 07707205.6 | 23.01.2007 | [2008/43] | WO2007JP50942 | Priority number, date | JP20060014656 | 24.01.2006 Original published format: JP 2006014656 | [2008/43] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007086354 | Date: | 02.08.2007 | Language: | JA | [2007/31] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1982716 | Date: | 22.10.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/43] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1982716 | Date: | 03.04.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/14] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 02.08.2007 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.02.2010 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/4172, A61P25/04, C07D233/64 | [2008/43] | CPC: |
C07D233/64 (EP,KR,US);
A61K31/4172 (EP,KR,US);
A61P25/04 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/43] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | NEUES HISTIDINDERIVAT | [2008/43] | English: | NOVEL HISTIDINE DERIVATIVE | [2008/43] | French: | NOUVEAU DÉRIVÉ D'HISTIDINE | [2008/43] | Entry into regional phase | 12.08.2008 | Translation filed | 12.08.2008 | National basic fee paid | 12.08.2008 | Search fee paid | 12.08.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.08.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.08.2008 | Examination requested [2008/43] | 11.05.2010 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.07.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.11.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.10.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.02.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 15.02.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 18.07.2011 | Opposition(s) | 06.01.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/11] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.01.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.01.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.01.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 18.01.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 23.01.2007 | AT | 03.04.2013 | BE | 03.04.2013 | CY | 03.04.2013 | CZ | 03.04.2013 | DK | 03.04.2013 | EE | 03.04.2013 | FI | 03.04.2013 | IT | 03.04.2013 | LT | 03.04.2013 | LV | 03.04.2013 | MC | 03.04.2013 | NL | 03.04.2013 | PL | 03.04.2013 | RO | 03.04.2013 | SE | 03.04.2013 | SI | 03.04.2013 | SK | 03.04.2013 | TR | 03.04.2013 | BG | 03.07.2013 | GR | 04.07.2013 | ES | 14.07.2013 | IS | 03.08.2013 | PT | 05.08.2013 | [2016/33] |
Former [2016/32] | HU | 23.01.2007 | |
AT | 03.04.2013 | ||
BE | 03.04.2013 | ||
CY | 03.04.2013 | ||
CZ | 03.04.2013 | ||
DK | 03.04.2013 | ||
EE | 03.04.2013 | ||
FI | 03.04.2013 | ||
IT | 03.04.2013 | ||
LT | 03.04.2013 | ||
LV | 03.04.2013 | ||
MC | 03.04.2013 | ||
NL | 03.04.2013 | ||
PL | 03.04.2013 | ||
RO | 03.04.2013 | ||
SE | 03.04.2013 | ||
SI | 03.04.2013 | ||
SK | 03.04.2013 | ||
BG | 03.07.2013 | ||
GR | 04.07.2013 | ||
ES | 14.07.2013 | ||
IS | 03.08.2013 | ||
PT | 05.08.2013 | ||
Former [2014/38] | AT | 03.04.2013 | |
BE | 03.04.2013 | ||
CY | 03.04.2013 | ||
CZ | 03.04.2013 | ||
DK | 03.04.2013 | ||
EE | 03.04.2013 | ||
FI | 03.04.2013 | ||
IT | 03.04.2013 | ||
LT | 03.04.2013 | ||
LV | 03.04.2013 | ||
MC | 03.04.2013 | ||
NL | 03.04.2013 | ||
PL | 03.04.2013 | ||
RO | 03.04.2013 | ||
SE | 03.04.2013 | ||
SI | 03.04.2013 | ||
SK | 03.04.2013 | ||
BG | 03.07.2013 | ||
GR | 04.07.2013 | ||
ES | 14.07.2013 | ||
IS | 03.08.2013 | ||
PT | 05.08.2013 | ||
Former [2014/11] | AT | 03.04.2013 | |
BE | 03.04.2013 | ||
CY | 03.04.2013 | ||
CZ | 03.04.2013 | ||
DK | 03.04.2013 | ||
EE | 03.04.2013 | ||
FI | 03.04.2013 | ||
IT | 03.04.2013 | ||
LT | 03.04.2013 | ||
LV | 03.04.2013 | ||
NL | 03.04.2013 | ||
PL | 03.04.2013 | ||
RO | 03.04.2013 | ||
SE | 03.04.2013 | ||
SI | 03.04.2013 | ||
SK | 03.04.2013 | ||
BG | 03.07.2013 | ||
GR | 04.07.2013 | ||
ES | 14.07.2013 | ||
IS | 03.08.2013 | ||
PT | 05.08.2013 | ||
Former [2014/10] | AT | 03.04.2013 | |
BE | 03.04.2013 | ||
CY | 03.04.2013 | ||
CZ | 03.04.2013 | ||
DK | 03.04.2013 | ||
EE | 03.04.2013 | ||
FI | 03.04.2013 | ||
LT | 03.04.2013 | ||
LV | 03.04.2013 | ||
NL | 03.04.2013 | ||
PL | 03.04.2013 | ||
SE | 03.04.2013 | ||
SI | 03.04.2013 | ||
SK | 03.04.2013 | ||
BG | 03.07.2013 | ||
GR | 04.07.2013 | ||
ES | 14.07.2013 | ||
IS | 03.08.2013 | ||
PT | 05.08.2013 | ||
Former [2014/09] | AT | 03.04.2013 | |
BE | 03.04.2013 | ||
CY | 03.04.2013 | ||
DK | 03.04.2013 | ||
EE | 03.04.2013 | ||
FI | 03.04.2013 | ||
LT | 03.04.2013 | ||
LV | 03.04.2013 | ||
NL | 03.04.2013 | ||
PL | 03.04.2013 | ||
SE | 03.04.2013 | ||
SI | 03.04.2013 | ||
BG | 03.07.2013 | ||
GR | 04.07.2013 | ||
ES | 14.07.2013 | ||
IS | 03.08.2013 | ||
PT | 05.08.2013 | ||
Former [2013/52] | AT | 03.04.2013 | |
BE | 03.04.2013 | ||
CY | 03.04.2013 | ||
FI | 03.04.2013 | ||
LT | 03.04.2013 | ||
LV | 03.04.2013 | ||
NL | 03.04.2013 | ||
PL | 03.04.2013 | ||
SE | 03.04.2013 | ||
SI | 03.04.2013 | ||
BG | 03.07.2013 | ||
GR | 04.07.2013 | ||
ES | 14.07.2013 | ||
IS | 03.08.2013 | ||
PT | 05.08.2013 | ||
Former [2013/50] | AT | 03.04.2013 | |
BE | 03.04.2013 | ||
FI | 03.04.2013 | ||
LT | 03.04.2013 | ||
LV | 03.04.2013 | ||
NL | 03.04.2013 | ||
PL | 03.04.2013 | ||
SE | 03.04.2013 | ||
SI | 03.04.2013 | ||
BG | 03.07.2013 | ||
GR | 04.07.2013 | ||
ES | 14.07.2013 | ||
IS | 03.08.2013 | ||
PT | 05.08.2013 | ||
Former [2013/49] | AT | 03.04.2013 | |
BE | 03.04.2013 | ||
FI | 03.04.2013 | ||
LT | 03.04.2013 | ||
NL | 03.04.2013 | ||
SE | 03.04.2013 | ||
SI | 03.04.2013 | ||
GR | 04.07.2013 | ||
ES | 14.07.2013 | ||
IS | 03.08.2013 | ||
PT | 05.08.2013 | ||
Former [2013/48] | AT | 03.04.2013 | |
LT | 03.04.2013 | ||
NL | 03.04.2013 | ||
SI | 03.04.2013 | ||
ES | 14.07.2013 | ||
IS | 03.08.2013 | ||
PT | 05.08.2013 | ||
Former [2013/47] | LT | 03.04.2013 | |
SI | 03.04.2013 | ||
PT | 05.08.2013 | ||
Former [2013/37] | SI | 03.04.2013 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPS604172 (HAMARI YAKUHIN KOGYO KK) [A] 1-14 * abstract *; | [A]US2004242491 (CHANG WILLIAM T H [TW]) [A] 1-14 * abstract ** claims 1-29 *; | [A] - ZHAO M ET AL, "New agents for cutaneous photoprotection: derivatives of alpha-amino acids, 4-aminobenzoic and 4-methoxycinnamic acids", EUROPEAN JOURNAL OF MEDICINAL CHEMISTRY, EDITIONS SCIENTIFIQUE ELSEVIER, PARIS, FR, vol. 28, no. 12, ISSN 0223-5234, (19930101), pages 949 - 954, (19930101), XP023870830 [A] 1-14 * page 950; table I; compound 8 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0223-5234(93)90050-O | [A] - GARIPCAN B ET AL, "A novel affinity support material for the separation of immunoglobulin G from human plasma", MACROMOLECULAR BIOSCIENCE, WILEY VCH VERLAG, WEINHEIM, DE, vol. 2, no. 3, ISSN 1616-5187, (20020401), pages 135 - 144, (20020320), XP002509544 [A] 1-14 * page 139; figure 3 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/1616-5195(20020401)2:3<135::AID-MABI135>3.0.CO;2-8 | [A] - BENTOLILA A ET AL, "SYNTHESIS AND HEPARIN-LIKE BIOLOGICAL ACTIVITY OF AMINO ACID-BASED POLYMERS", POLYMERS FOR ADVANCED TECHNOLOGIES, WILEY & SONS, BOGNOR REGIS, GB, (20000801), vol. 11, no. 8-12, ISSN 1042-7147, pages 377 - 387, XP000977310 [A] 1-14 * page 381; compound 2g * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/1099-1581(200008/12)11:8/12<377::AID-PAT985>3.0.CO;2-D | International search | [A]JPS59216597 (MICROBIAL CHEM RES FOUND); | [A]JPH10298197 (ASAHI GLASS CO LTD); | [AP]JP2006232685 (TOAGOSEI CO LTD); | [X] - OHKUBO K. ET AL., "Catalytic activities of novel L-histidyl group-introduced polymers imprinted by a transition state analog in the hydrolysis of amino acid ester", JOURNAL OF MOLECULAR CATALYSIS A: CHEMICAL, (1995), vol. 101, no. 2, pages L111 - L114, XP002082390 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/1381-1169(95)00097-6 | [X] - BENTOLILA A. ET AL., "Poly (N-acryl amino acids): A New Class of Biologically Active Polyanions", JOURNAL OF MEDICINAL CHEMISTRY, (2000), vol. 43, no. 13, pages 2591 - 2600, XP003016044 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/jm000089j | [X] - CHO I. ET AL., "Hydrophobic and ionic interactions in the ester hydrolysis by imidazole-containing polymers", BULLETIN OF THE KOREAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY, (1982), vol. 3, no. 1, pages 34 - 36, XP003016045 | [X] - ZHAO M.J. ET AL., "New agents for cutaneous photoprotection: derivatives of alpha-amino acids, 4-aminobenzoic and 4-methoxycinnamic acids", EUROPEAN JOURNAL OF MEDICINAL CHEMISTRY, (1993), vol. 28, no. 12, pages 949 - 954, XP003016046 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0223-5234(93)90050-O | by applicant | JPH0641411B | JPH0797323 | JPH0920660 | JPH0920661 | JP2939301B | WO0191762 | JP2003267992 | - BROWN, J. H. JONES; J. D. RICHARDS, J. CHEM. SOC. PERKIN TRANS. I, (1982), page 1533 | - KITA ET AL., NIPPON YAKURIGAKU ZASSHI, (1975), vol. 71, pages 195 - 210 | - NIPPON YAKURIGAKU ZASSHI, (1976), vol. 72, pages 573 - 584 | - KIM; CHUNG, PAIN, (1992), vol. 50, pages 355 - 363 | - CHAPLAN ET AL., J. NEUROSá. METHOD, (1994), vol. 53, pages 55 - 63 | - LEE ET AL., J NEUROPHYSIOL., (1999), vol. 81, pages 2226 - 2233 |