EP1980979 - ADVICE APPARATUS, ADVICE METHOD, ADVICE PROGRAM AND COMPUTER READABLE RECORDING MEDIUM STORING THE ADVICE PROGRAM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 16.09.2011 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.09.2011 | Withdrawal of application | published on 19.10.2011 [2011/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Panasonic Corporation 1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi Osaka 571-8501 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2008/47] | For all designated states Panasonic Corporation 1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi Osaka 571-8501 / JP | ||
Former [2008/42] | For all designated states Matsushita Electric Industrial Co., Ltd. 1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi Osaka 571-8501 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NODA, Makiko c/o Matsushita Electric Industrial Co Ltd Intellectual Property Rights Operations Company IP Development Center c/o 7F Twin 21 OBP Panasonic Tower 2-1-61 Shiromi Chuo-ku, Osaka-shi, Osaka 540-6207 / JP | 02 /
NAGAMITSU, Sachio c/o Matsushita Electric Industrial Co Ltd Intellectual Property Rights Operations Company IP Development Center, 7F Twin 21 OBP Panasonic Tower 2-1-61, Shiromi Chuo-ku, Osaka-shi, Osaka 540-6207 / JP | [2008/42] | Representative(s) | SSM Sandmair Patentanwälte Rechtsanwalt Partnerschaft mbB Joseph-Wild-Straße 20 81829 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/42] | Schwabe - Sandmair - Marx Patentanwälte Stuntzstrasse 16 81677 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 07707513.3 | 26.01.2007 | [2008/42] | WO2007JP51281 | Priority number, date | JP20060022305 | 31.01.2006 Original published format: JP 2006022305 | [2008/42] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007088791 | Date: | 09.08.2007 | Language: | JA | [2007/32] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1980979 | Date: | 15.10.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/42] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 09.08.2007 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.06.2011 | Classification | IPC: | G06Q10/00, G09B19/00 | [2008/42] | CPC: |
G06Q50/12 (EP,US);
G06Q10/10 (EP,US);
G06Q50/01 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR [2009/09] |
Former [2008/42] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | BERATUNGSVORRICHTUNG, BERATUNGSVERFAHREN UND COMPUTERLESBARES AUFZEICHNUNGSMEDIUM ZUM SPEICHERN DES BERATUNGSPROGRAMMS | [2008/42] | English: | ADVICE APPARATUS, ADVICE METHOD, ADVICE PROGRAM AND COMPUTER READABLE RECORDING MEDIUM STORING THE ADVICE PROGRAM | [2008/42] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE CONSEIL, MÉTHODE DE CONSEIL, PROGRAMME DE CONSEIL ET SUPPORT D'ENREGISTREMENT LISIBLE PAR ORDINATEUR COMPORTANT LE PROGRAMME DE CONSEIL | [2008/42] | Entry into regional phase | 29.07.2008 | Translation filed | 29.07.2008 | National basic fee paid | 29.07.2008 | Search fee paid | 29.07.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.07.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.07.2008 | Examination requested [2008/42] | 02.09.2008 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 10.10.2008 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, FI, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 09.09.2011 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2011/42] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.01.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.01.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [L] - The technical aspects identified in the present application (Art. 92 EPC) are considered part of common general knowledge. Due to their notoriety no documentary evidence is found to be required. For further details see the accompanying Opinion. [L] 1-11 | International search | [Y]JP2003046980 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD); | [Y] - YAMAKATA Y. ET AL., "Assistant agent tono Onsei Taiwa ni yoru Chori Contents no Jido Seisei / automatic cooking archiving with spoken dialogue with assistant agent", TECHNICAL REPORT OF IEICE (MVE2005-55), (20051117), pages 55 - 60, XP003016603 | [Y] - YAMAKATA Y. ET AL., "Kansoku Data ni Motozuku Seisan Kako Katsudo Ninshiki no Tame no Buttai Sosa Mokutekijoho no Togo Riyo / objects, operations, and target recognition based on the constraints between objects and operation", TECHNICAL REPORT OF IEICE (PRMU2003-300), (20040312), pages 95 - 100, XP003016604 | [Y] - TAKAZAWA J. ET AL., "Taiwagata Eiga no Tame no Kaiwa Seiseiho / generating conversations for interactive movies", TECHNICAL REPORT OF IEICE (HIP203-34), (20030627), pages 29 - 34, XP003016605 | by applicant | JP2004021121 | JP2004310034 |