EP1983446 - INFORMATION RECOMMENDATION SYSTEM BASED ON BIOMETRIC INFORMATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 06.02.2015 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.02.2015 | Withdrawal of application | published on 11.03.2015 [2015/11] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sony Corporation 1-7-1 Konan Minato-ku Tokyo 108-0075 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2008/43] | For all designated states Sony Corporation 1-7-1 Konan Minato-ku Tokyo 108-0075 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NAKAMURA, Takatoshi c/o SONY CORPORATION, 7-35, Kitashinagawa 6-chome Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 141-0001 / JP | 02 /
SASAKI, Toru c/o SONY CORPORATION, 7-35, Kitashinagawa 6-chome Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 141-0001 / JP | 03 /
SAKAI, Yuichi c/o SONY CORPORATION, 7-35, Kitashinagawa 6-chome Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 141-0001 / JP | 04 /
SAKO, Yoichiro c/o SONY CORPORATION, 7-35, Kitashinagawa 6-chome Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 141-0001 / JP | 05 /
TERAUCHI, Toshiro c/o SONY CORPORATION, 7-35, Kitashinagawa 6-chome Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 141-0001 / JP | 06 /
TAMORI, Hirofumi c/o SONY CORPORATION, 7-35, Kitashinagawa 6-chome Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 141-0001 / JP | 07 /
INOUE, Makoto c/o SONY CORPORATION, 7-35, Kitashinagawa 6-chome Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 141-0001 / JP | 08 /
SHIRAI, Katsuya c/o SONY CORPORATION, 7-35, Kitashinagawa 6-chome Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 141-0001 / JP | 09 /
TAKAI, Motoyuki c/o SONY CORPORATION, 7-35, Kitashinagawa 6-chome Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 141-0001 / JP | 10 /
MAKINO, Kenichi c/o SONY CORPORATION, 7-35, Kitashinagawa 6-chome Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 141-0001 / JP | 11 /
KOMORI, Akihiro c/o SONY CORPORATION, 7-35, Kitashinagawa 6-chome Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 141-0001 / JP | 12 /
SANO, Akane c/o SONY CORPORATION, 7-35, Kitashinagawa 6-chome Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 141-0001 / JP | 13 /
TAKATSUKA, Susumu c/o SONY CORPORATION, 7-35, Kitashinagawa 6-chome Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 141-0001 / JP | [2008/43] | Representative(s) | Körber, Martin Hans Mitscherlich PartmbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Sonnenstrasse 33 80331 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/43] | Körber, Martin Hans Mitscherlich & Partner Sonnenstrasse 33 80331 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 07707767.5 | 31.01.2007 | [2008/43] | WO2007JP51549 | Priority number, date | JP20060028101 | 06.02.2006 Original published format: JP 2006028101 | [2008/43] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007091456 | Date: | 16.08.2007 | Language: | JA | [2007/33] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1983446 | Date: | 22.10.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/43] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 16.08.2007 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.03.2010 | Classification | IPC: | G06F17/30, G06Q30/00 | [2008/43] | CPC: |
G06Q30/02 (EP,US);
G06F16/903 (EP,US);
G06F16/9535 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2009/10] |
Former [2008/43] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | INFORMATIONSEMPFEHLUNGSSYSTEM AUF DER BASIS VON BIOMETRISCHEN INFORMATIONEN | [2008/43] | English: | INFORMATION RECOMMENDATION SYSTEM BASED ON BIOMETRIC INFORMATION | [2008/43] | French: | SYSTÈME DE RECOMMANDATION D'INFORMATION BASÉ SUR DES INFORMATIONS BIOMÉTRIQUES | [2008/43] | Entry into regional phase | 18.07.2008 | Translation filed | 18.07.2008 | National basic fee paid | 18.07.2008 | Search fee paid | 18.07.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.07.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.07.2008 | Examination requested [2008/43] | 09.09.2008 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 14.10.2008 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 26.05.2010 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 29.01.2015 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2015/11] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.01.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.01.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.01.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.01.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 30.01.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US4776323 (SPECTOR DONALD [US]) [Y] 1-18 * abstract *; | [Y]US4788983 (BRINK LOREN S [US], et al) [Y] 1-18 * abstract *; | [DY]JPH113356 (NIPPON TELEGRAPH & TELEPHONE) [DY] 1-18 * abstract *; | [Y]EP0961209 (SONY FRANCE SA [FR]) [Y] 1-18 * the whole document *; | [Y]EP1244033 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP]) [Y] 1-18 * abstract *; | [X]US2003060728 (MANDIGO LONNIE D [US]) [X] 1-18 * abstract *; | [Y]US2005129253 (CHEN YU-YU [TW]) [Y] 1-18 * abstract *; | [X]EP1609418 (SONY CORP [JP]) [X] 1-18 * abstract *; | [Y] - "Portable audio player combined with physical training measurement unit, detects user exercise rate and heartbeat, relating them to calories consumed and training requirements", WPI/THOMSON,, (20060101), XP008093170 [Y] 1-18 * abstract * | International search | [Y]JP2005301399 (SONY CORP); | [Y] - KAJI K. ET AL., "Jokyo to Shiko ni Kansuru Annotation ni Motozuku On-line Gakkyoku Suisen System", INFORMATION PROCESSING SOCIETY OF JAPAN KENKYU HOKOKU, (20041212), pages 33 - 38, XP003016739 | [Y] - ANDERSON M. ET AL., "RACOFI: A Rule-Applying Collaborative Filtering System", INTERNATIONAL WORKSHOP ON COLLABORATION AGENTS: AUTONOMOUS AGENTS FOR COLLABORATIVE ENVIRONMENTS (COLA'03), (200310), XP003016740 | by applicant | JPH0113356 |