EP1982650 - SURGERY SUPPORT DEVICE, METHOD, AND PROGRAM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.11.2015 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.11.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 16.12.2015 [2015/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nat. University Corp. Hamamatsu University School of Medicine 20-1, Handayama 1-chome Higashi-ku Hamamatsu-shi Shizuoka 431-3192 / JP | [2008/43] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
YAMAMOTO, Seiji 302, Surpass Koyamachi, 300-20, Koyamachi, Naka-ku Hamamatsu-shi, Shizuoka 4300938 / JP | 02 /
TERAKAWA, Susumu 45-6, Handayama 3-chome Higashi-ku. Hamamatsu-shi, Shizuoka 4313125 / JP | 03 /
TAKAI, Toshihisa c/o PULSTEC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD., 90-3, Higashimikata-cho, Kita-ku Hamamatsu-shi, Shizuoka 4338510 / JP | 04 /
SATO, Katsuhiro c/o PULSTEC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD., 90-3, Higashimikata-cho, Kita-ku Hamamatsu-shi, Shizuoka 4338510 / JP | [2015/02] |
Former [2008/43] | 01 /
YAMAMOTO, Seiji 302, Surpass Koyamachi, 300-20, Koyamachi, Naka-ku Hamamatsu-shi, Shizuoka 4300938 / JP | ||
02 /
TERAKAWA, Susumu 45-6, Handayama 3-chome Higashi-ku. Hamamatsu-shi, Shizuoka 4313125 / JP | |||
03 /
TAKAI, Toshihisa c/o PULSTEC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD., 90-3, Higashimikata-cho, Kita-ku Hamamatsu-shi, Shizuoka 4338510 / JP | |||
04 /
SATO, Katsuhiro c/o PULSTEC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD., 90-3, Higashimikata-cho, Kita-ku Hamamatsu-shi, Shizuoka 4338510 / JP | Representative(s) | Trinks, Ole, et al Meissner Bolte Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Widenmayerstrasse 47 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2015/02] | Trinks, Ole, et al Meissner, Bolte & Partner GbR Widenmayerstrasse 47 80538 München / DE | ||
Former [2008/43] | Trinks, Ole, et al Meissner, Bolte & Partner GbR Widenmayerstrasse 48 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 07707789.9 | 31.01.2007 | [2008/43] | WO2007JP51603 | Priority number, date | JP20060032605 | 09.02.2006 Original published format: JP 2006032605 | [2008/43] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007091464 | Date: | 16.08.2007 | Language: | JA | [2007/33] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1982650 | Date: | 22.10.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/43] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1982650 | Date: | 07.01.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/02] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 16.08.2007 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.03.2010 | Classification | IPC: | A61B17/00, A61B19/00 | [2014/28] | CPC: |
A61B90/36 (EP,US);
A61B34/20 (EP,US);
A61B2017/00057 (EP,US);
A61B2034/101 (EP,US);
A61B2034/102 (EP,US);
A61B2034/105 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2008/43] | A61B5/055, A61B19/00 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, NL [2009/10] |
Former [2008/43] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | OPERATIONSUNTERSTÜTZENDE VORRICHTUNG, VERFAHREN UND PROGRAMM | [2008/43] | English: | SURGERY SUPPORT DEVICE, METHOD, AND PROGRAM | [2008/43] | French: | DISPOSITIF D'ASSISTANCE CHIRURGICALE, PROCEDE ET PROGRAMME | [2008/43] | Entry into regional phase | 11.08.2008 | Translation filed | 11.08.2008 | National basic fee paid | 11.08.2008 | Search fee paid | 11.08.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.08.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.09.2007 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: JP | 11.08.2008 | Examination requested [2008/43] | 16.10.2008 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 29.12.2008 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 16.06.2010 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.06.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 21.12.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.08.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.11.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 26.11.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 26.11.2014 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 14.06.2012 | Opposition(s) | 08.10.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit [2015/51] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.08.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.01.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.01.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.01.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 30.01.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO9424933 (UNIV ST LOUIS [US]) [A] 2 * abstract * * page 18, line 13 - page 18, line 26 *; | [XY]US2003000535 (GALLOWAY ROBERT L [US], et al) [X] 8 * abstract * * figure 3 * * claims 1,10,18,19,22,24 * * paragraph [0003] * * paragraph [0022] * * paragraph [0034] * * paragraph [0038] * * paragraph [0042] * * paragraph [0063] * * paragraph [0069] * * paragraph [0014] * [Y] 1-6; | [A]DE10242953 (LUEHN MICHAEL [DE]) [A] 5-6 * abstract * * claim 1 *; | [Y]US2004138556 (COSMAN ERIC R [US]) [Y] 1-6 * abstract * * figures 1,5,6 * * claims 1,9 * * paragraph [0038] *; | [A] - WESTERMANN B ET AL, "Non-invasive 3-D patient registration for image-guided skull base surgery", COMPUTERS AND GRAPHICS, ELSEVIER, GB, (19961101), vol. 20, no. 6, ISSN 0097-8493, pages 793 - 799, XP004729274 [A] 1-6,8 * figure 2 * * Section: The Principles * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0097-8493(96)00049-0 | International search | [Y]JPS5552749 (ALOKA CO LTD); | [Y]US5617857 (CHADER MARTIN D [US], et al); | [Y]JPH09511430 ; | [A]JP2005518854 | by applicant | JPH09511430 | - "StealthStation", MEDTRONIC SNT, (20050902), URL: http//wwwstealthstation.com/physician/neuro/library/treonjsp> | - "SonoNav", MEDTRONIC SNT, (20050902), URL: http//www.stealthstation.com/physician/neuro/library/sononav.jsp> |