EP1997780 - HIGH-PURITY SODIUM HYDROGEN CARBONATE CRYSTAL GRAIN AND PROCESS FOR PRODUCING THE SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 21.01.2011 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.01.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 23.02.2011 [2011/08] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Asahi Glass Company, Limited 12-1 Yurakucho 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8405 / JP | [2008/49] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HIRANO, Hachirou c/o Asahi Glass Company, Limited 12-1, Yurakucho1-chome Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 100-8405 / JP | 02 /
ARIMA, Hisakazu c/o Asahi Glass Company, Limited 12-1, Yurakucho1-chome Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 100-8405 / JP | 03 /
KIKUCHI, Shintarou c/o Asahi Glass Company, Limited 12-1, Yurakucho1-chome Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 100-8405 / JP | 04 /
NAKASHIMA, Fumiaki c/o Asahi Glass Company, Limited 12-1, Yurakucho1-chome Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 100-8405 / JP | 05 /
SAKURAI, Shigeru c/o Asahi Glass Company, Limited 12-1, Yurakucho1-chome Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 100-8405 / JP | [2008/49] | Representative(s) | Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte PartG mbB Friedenheimer Brücke 21 80639 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/49] | Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte Grafinger Strasse 2 81671 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 07707832.7 | 31.01.2007 | [2008/49] | WO2007JP51646 | Priority number, date | JP20060071191 | 15.03.2006 Original published format: JP 2006071191 | [2008/49] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007108236 | Date: | 27.09.2007 | Language: | JA | [2007/39] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1997780 | Date: | 03.12.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/49] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 27.09.2007 | Classification | IPC: | C01D7/42 | [2008/49] | CPC: |
C01D7/42 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [2009/16] |
Former [2008/49] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | HOCHREINES NATRIUMHYDROGENCARBONATKRISTALLKORN UND HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN DAFÜR | [2008/49] | English: | HIGH-PURITY SODIUM HYDROGEN CARBONATE CRYSTAL GRAIN AND PROCESS FOR PRODUCING THE SAME | [2008/49] | French: | GRAIN CRISTALLIN DE BICARBONATE DE SODIUM DE HAUTE PURETE ET SON PROCEDE DE FABRICATION | [2008/49] | Entry into regional phase | 18.09.2008 | Translation filed | 25.09.2008 | National basic fee paid | 25.09.2008 | Search fee paid | 25.09.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.09.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.09.2008 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 25.09.2008 | Examination requested [2008/49] | 16.10.2008 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 24.11.2008 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, IS, LT, LU, LV, MC, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 02.08.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2011/08] | 16.09.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2011/08] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.09.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.2010 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]JPH02275714 (KAO CORP); | [A]JP2003104722 (TOSOH CORP); | [X]WO2006004003 (ASAHI GLASS CO LTD [JP], et al) | by applicant | JP2003104722 | JP2006071191 | - Funryutai Keisoku Handbook, NIKKAN KOGYO SHIMBUN LTD., (19810510), pages 197 - 199 | - H RUMPF, Agglomeration, INTERSCIENCE, (1962), pages 379 - 417 | - CHEMIE-ING.-TECHN., (1970), vol. 42, no. 8, page 538 | - TAKEO OZAWA, "A New Method of Analyzing Thermogravimetric Data", BULL. CHEM. SOC. JAPAN, (1965), vol. 38, page 1881 | - JAPAN SODA INDUSTRY ASSOCIATION, (19750130), pages 105 - 106 | - "Manufacture of Refined Sodium Bicarbonate", MANUFACTURE OF SODA, REINHOLD PUBLISHING, (1942), page 282 |