EP1983664 - UPLINK AND DOWNLINK CHANNEL CONFIGURATION METHOD IN RADIO COMMUNICATION SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.05.2017 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.03.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 08.04.2020 [2020/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NTT DOCOMO, INC. 11-1, Nagatacho 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-6150 / JP | [2016/28] |
Former [2008/43] | For all designated states NTT DoCoMo, Inc. 11-1 Nagatacho 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-6150 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HIGUCHI, Kenichi Intellectual Property Department NTT DOCOMO, Inc., SANNO PARK TOWER, 11-1 Nagatacho 2-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 1006150 / JP | 02 /
SAWAHASHI, Mamoru Intellectual Property Department NTT DOCOMO, Inc., SANNO PARK TOWER 11-1, Nagatacho 2-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 1006150 / JP | 03 /
ATARASHI, Hiroyuki Intellectual Property Department NTT DOCOMO, Inc., SANNO PARK TOWER 11-1, Nagatacho 2-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 1006150 / JP | [2016/13] |
Former [2008/43] | 01 /
HIGUCHI, Kenichi Intellectual Property Department NTT DoCoMo, Inc., SANNO PARK TOWER, 11-1 Nagatacho 2-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 1006150 / JP | ||
02 /
SAWAHASHI, Mamoru Intellectual Property Department NTT DoCoMo, Inc., SANNO PARK TOWER 11-1, Nagatacho 2-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 1006150 / JP | |||
03 /
ATARASHI, Hiroyuki Intellectual Property Department NTT DoCoMo, Inc., SANNO PARK TOWER 11-1, Nagatacho 2-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 1006150 / JP | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | [2016/28] |
Former [2008/43] | HOFFMANN EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 07708102.4 | 06.02.2007 | [2008/43] | WO2007JP52002 | Priority number, date | JP20060031745 | 08.02.2006 Original published format: JP 2006031745 | [2008/43] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007091546 | Date: | 16.08.2007 | Language: | JA | [2007/33] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1983664 | Date: | 22.10.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/43] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1983664 | Date: | 13.07.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/28] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 16.08.2007 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.07.2013 | Classification | IPC: | H04B7/26, H04J13/00 | [2008/43] | CPC: |
H04W48/12 (EP,KR,US);
H04L5/003 (KR);
H04W68/00 (EP,KR,US);
H04W72/30 (EP,KR,US);
H04W74/00 (EP,KR,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2016/28] |
Former [2008/43] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | AUFWÄRTSSTRECKEN- UND ABWÄRTSSTRECKEN-KANALKONFIGURATIONSVERFAHREN IN EINEM FUNKKOMMUNIKATIONSSYSTEM | [2008/43] | English: | UPLINK AND DOWNLINK CHANNEL CONFIGURATION METHOD IN RADIO COMMUNICATION SYSTEM | [2008/43] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE CONFIGURATION DE CANAUX DE LIAISON MONTANTE ET DE LIAISON DESCENDANTE, DANS UN SYSTÈME DE COMMUNICATION RADIO | [2008/43] | Entry into regional phase | 14.08.2008 | Translation filed | 14.08.2008 | National basic fee paid | 14.08.2008 | Search fee paid | 14.08.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.08.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.08.2008 | Examination requested [2008/43] | 23.08.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 05.11.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.02.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.05.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.09.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.11.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.02.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.01.2016 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 11.02.2016 | 11.02.2016 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 03.03.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.05.2016 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 24.05.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 24.05.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 07.06.2016 | Information about intention to grant a patent | 07.06.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP13181673.8 / EP2670066 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 05.11.2013 | Opposition(s) | 18.04.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/25] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.02.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.02.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.02.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.02.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 20.02.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 18.02.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 18.02.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 24.02.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 13.07.2016 | BE | 13.07.2016 | CY | 13.07.2016 | CZ | 13.07.2016 | DK | 13.07.2016 | EE | 13.07.2016 | FI | 13.07.2016 | LT | 13.07.2016 | LV | 13.07.2016 | MC | 13.07.2016 | NL | 13.07.2016 | PL | 13.07.2016 | RO | 13.07.2016 | SE | 13.07.2016 | SI | 13.07.2016 | SK | 13.07.2016 | TR | 13.07.2016 | BG | 13.10.2016 | IS | 13.11.2016 | PT | 14.11.2016 | IE | 06.02.2017 | LU | 06.02.2017 | CH | 28.02.2017 | LI | 28.02.2017 | [2020/15] |
Former [2019/46] | AT | 13.07.2016 | |
BE | 13.07.2016 | ||
CY | 13.07.2016 | ||
CZ | 13.07.2016 | ||
DK | 13.07.2016 | ||
EE | 13.07.2016 | ||
FI | 13.07.2016 | ||
LT | 13.07.2016 | ||
LV | 13.07.2016 | ||
MC | 13.07.2016 | ||
NL | 13.07.2016 | ||
PL | 13.07.2016 | ||
RO | 13.07.2016 | ||
SE | 13.07.2016 | ||
SI | 13.07.2016 | ||
SK | 13.07.2016 | ||
BG | 13.10.2016 | ||
IS | 13.11.2016 | ||
PT | 14.11.2016 | ||
IE | 06.02.2017 | ||
LU | 06.02.2017 | ||
CH | 28.02.2017 | ||
LI | 28.02.2017 | ||
Former [2018/13] | AT | 13.07.2016 | |
BE | 13.07.2016 | ||
CZ | 13.07.2016 | ||
DK | 13.07.2016 | ||
EE | 13.07.2016 | ||
FI | 13.07.2016 | ||
LT | 13.07.2016 | ||
LV | 13.07.2016 | ||
MC | 13.07.2016 | ||
NL | 13.07.2016 | ||
PL | 13.07.2016 | ||
RO | 13.07.2016 | ||
SE | 13.07.2016 | ||
SI | 13.07.2016 | ||
SK | 13.07.2016 | ||
BG | 13.10.2016 | ||
IS | 13.11.2016 | ||
PT | 14.11.2016 | ||
IE | 06.02.2017 | ||
LU | 06.02.2017 | ||
CH | 28.02.2017 | ||
LI | 28.02.2017 | ||
Former [2018/04] | AT | 13.07.2016 | |
BE | 13.07.2016 | ||
CZ | 13.07.2016 | ||
DK | 13.07.2016 | ||
EE | 13.07.2016 | ||
FI | 13.07.2016 | ||
LT | 13.07.2016 | ||
LV | 13.07.2016 | ||
MC | 13.07.2016 | ||
NL | 13.07.2016 | ||
PL | 13.07.2016 | ||
RO | 13.07.2016 | ||
SE | 13.07.2016 | ||
SI | 13.07.2016 | ||
SK | 13.07.2016 | ||
BG | 13.10.2016 | ||
IS | 13.11.2016 | ||
PT | 14.11.2016 | ||
LU | 06.02.2017 | ||
CH | 28.02.2017 | ||
LI | 28.02.2017 | ||
Former [2017/51] | AT | 13.07.2016 | |
BE | 13.07.2016 | ||
CZ | 13.07.2016 | ||
DK | 13.07.2016 | ||
EE | 13.07.2016 | ||
FI | 13.07.2016 | ||
LT | 13.07.2016 | ||
LV | 13.07.2016 | ||
MC | 13.07.2016 | ||
NL | 13.07.2016 | ||
PL | 13.07.2016 | ||
RO | 13.07.2016 | ||
SE | 13.07.2016 | ||
SI | 13.07.2016 | ||
SK | 13.07.2016 | ||
BG | 13.10.2016 | ||
IS | 13.11.2016 | ||
PT | 14.11.2016 | ||
CH | 28.02.2017 | ||
LI | 28.02.2017 | ||
Former [2017/45] | AT | 13.07.2016 | |
BE | 13.07.2016 | ||
CZ | 13.07.2016 | ||
DK | 13.07.2016 | ||
EE | 13.07.2016 | ||
FI | 13.07.2016 | ||
LT | 13.07.2016 | ||
LV | 13.07.2016 | ||
MC | 13.07.2016 | ||
NL | 13.07.2016 | ||
PL | 13.07.2016 | ||
RO | 13.07.2016 | ||
SE | 13.07.2016 | ||
SI | 13.07.2016 | ||
SK | 13.07.2016 | ||
BG | 13.10.2016 | ||
IS | 13.11.2016 | ||
PT | 14.11.2016 | ||
Former [2017/37] | AT | 13.07.2016 | |
BE | 13.07.2016 | ||
CZ | 13.07.2016 | ||
DK | 13.07.2016 | ||
EE | 13.07.2016 | ||
FI | 13.07.2016 | ||
LT | 13.07.2016 | ||
LV | 13.07.2016 | ||
NL | 13.07.2016 | ||
PL | 13.07.2016 | ||
RO | 13.07.2016 | ||
SE | 13.07.2016 | ||
SI | 13.07.2016 | ||
SK | 13.07.2016 | ||
BG | 13.10.2016 | ||
IS | 13.11.2016 | ||
PT | 14.11.2016 | ||
Former [2017/31] | AT | 13.07.2016 | |
BE | 13.07.2016 | ||
CZ | 13.07.2016 | ||
DK | 13.07.2016 | ||
EE | 13.07.2016 | ||
FI | 13.07.2016 | ||
LT | 13.07.2016 | ||
LV | 13.07.2016 | ||
NL | 13.07.2016 | ||
PL | 13.07.2016 | ||
RO | 13.07.2016 | ||
SE | 13.07.2016 | ||
SK | 13.07.2016 | ||
BG | 13.10.2016 | ||
IS | 13.11.2016 | ||
PT | 14.11.2016 | ||
Former [2017/13] | AT | 13.07.2016 | |
BE | 13.07.2016 | ||
FI | 13.07.2016 | ||
LT | 13.07.2016 | ||
LV | 13.07.2016 | ||
NL | 13.07.2016 | ||
PL | 13.07.2016 | ||
SE | 13.07.2016 | ||
IS | 13.11.2016 | ||
PT | 14.11.2016 | ||
Former [2017/11] | AT | 13.07.2016 | |
BE | 13.07.2016 | ||
FI | 13.07.2016 | ||
LT | 13.07.2016 | ||
NL | 13.07.2016 | ||
PL | 13.07.2016 | ||
SE | 13.07.2016 | ||
IS | 13.11.2016 | ||
PT | 14.11.2016 | ||
Former [2017/10] | BE | 13.07.2016 | |
FI | 13.07.2016 | ||
LT | 13.07.2016 | ||
NL | 13.07.2016 | ||
PL | 13.07.2016 | ||
SE | 13.07.2016 | ||
IS | 13.11.2016 | ||
Former [2017/09] | FI | 13.07.2016 | |
LT | 13.07.2016 | ||
NL | 13.07.2016 | ||
Former [2017/07] | LT | 13.07.2016 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2001043576 (TERRY STEPHEN E [US]) [X] 1,2,4,5 * paragraph [0016] * * paragraph [0028] - paragraph [0034] * * figure 4 *; | [X]US2004116139 (YI SEUNG JUNE [KR], et al) [X] 1,2,9,10 * paragraph [0002] * * paragraph [0031] - paragraph [0033] * * paragraph [0037] - paragraph [0039] * * paragraph [0051] * * paragraph [0055] ** paragraph [0063] - paragraph [0082] * | International search | [Y]JP2002518960 ; | [Y]WO2004013978 (INTERDIGITAL TECH CORP [US]); | [X]JP2004135292 (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD); | [Y]WO2004054135 (INTERDIGITAL TECH CORP [US]); | [Y]WO2005018269 (LG ELECTRONICS INC [KR], et al); | [Y] - NTT DOCOMO ET AL., "L1/L2 Control Channel Structure for E-UTRA Downlink", 3GPP TSG-RAN WG1 LTE AD HOC MEETING HELSINKI, vol. R1-060032, (20060123), URL: http://www.3gpp.org/ftp/tsg_ran/WG1_RL1/TSGR1_AH/LTE_AH_January-06/Docs/R1-060032.zip, XP003017010 | Examination | - NOKIA, "OFDMA Downlink L1/L2 control signaling - text proposal", 3GPP DRAFT; R1-060186, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, (20060119), vol. RAN WG1, no. Helsinki, Finland; 20060123, XP050417542 | - NTT DOCOMO ET AL, "Paging Channel Structure for E-UTRA Downlink", 3GPP DRAFT; R1-060034 DL PAGING CHANNEL, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, (20060119), vol. RAN WG1, no. Helsinki, Finland; 20060123, XP050417421 |