EP1977328 - DEVICE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULING BASED ON TRAP MECHANISM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.10.2013 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2015 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU, LU | published on 19.08.2015 [2015/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LG Electronics Inc. 20 Yoido-dong Yongdungpo-gu Seoul 150-010 / KR | [N/P] |
Former [2008/41] | For all designated states LG Electronics Inc. 20 Yoido-dong Yongdungpo-gu Seoul 150-010 / KR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KIM, Te-Hyun Eunhasu Shinsung Apt. 302-1402 Buheung-Dong, Dongan-Gu, Anyang Gyeonggi-do 431-734 / KR | 02 /
HERNANDEZ, Pablo 533 Hogye-Dong, Dongan-Gu, Anyang Gyeonggi-Do, Rep. of Korea / KR | [2012/51] |
Former [2009/14] | 01 /
KIM, Te-Hyun Eunhasu Shinsung Apt. 302-1402 Buheung-Dong, Dongan-Gu, Anyang Gyeonggi-do 431-734 / KR | ||
02 /
HERNANDEZ, Pablo 533 Hogye-Dong, Dongan-Gu, Anyang Gyeonggi-Do, Rep. of Korea / KR | |||
Former [2008/41] | 01 /
KIM, Te-Hyun Eunhasu Shinsung Apt. 302-1402 Buheung-Dong, Dongan-Gu, Anyang Gyeonggi-do 431-734 / KR | ||
02 /
HERNANDEZ, Pablo 80 rue d'Alesia 75014 Paris / FR | Representative(s) | Urner, Peter Ter Meer Steinmeister & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Mauerkircherstrasse 45 81679 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/51] | Urner, Peter ter Meer Steinmeister & Partner GbR Mauerkircherstrasse 45 81679 München / DE | ||
Former [2008/41] | Urner, Peter TER MEER STEINMEISTER & PARTNER GbR Patentanwälte Mauerkircherstrasse 45 81679 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 07708590.0 | 24.01.2007 | [2008/41] | WO2007KR00428 | Priority number, date | US20060761792P | 25.01.2006 Original published format: US 761792 P | US20060762517P | 27.01.2006 Original published format: US 762517 P | KR20060043154 | 12.05.2006 Original published format: KR 20060043154 | KR20070005820 | 18.01.2007 Original published format: KR 20070005820 | [2008/41] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007086685 | Date: | 02.08.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/31] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1977328 | Date: | 08.10.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.08.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/41] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1977328 | Date: | 19.12.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/51] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 02.08.2007 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.03.2011 | Classification | IPC: | G06F15/00, H04L12/24, H04L12/26 | [2011/14] | CPC: |
G06F15/173 (EP,US);
A43B7/26 (KR);
H04L41/064 (US);
A43B17/16 (KR);
A43B7/145 (KR);
G06Q10/06 (EP,US);
H04L41/06 (EP,US);
H04L41/0681 (US);
H04L43/16 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2008/41] | G06F15/16 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/41] | Title | German: | EINTEILUNG DER EINRICHTUNGSVERWALTUNG AUF DER BASIS EINES FALLENMECHANISMUS | [2008/41] | English: | DEVICE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULING BASED ON TRAP MECHANISM | [2008/41] | French: | PLANIFICATION DE GESTION DE DISPOSITIFS BASÉE SUR UN MÉCANISME DE PIÉGEAGE | [2008/41] | Entry into regional phase | 05.08.2008 | National basic fee paid | 05.08.2008 | Search fee paid | 05.08.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.08.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.08.2008 | Examination requested [2008/41] | 02.08.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 25.10.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 20.04.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.07.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.10.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 30.10.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 25.10.2011 | Opposition(s) | 20.09.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/48] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.08.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.01.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.01.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 24.01.2007 | AT | 19.12.2012 | BE | 19.12.2012 | CY | 19.12.2012 | CZ | 19.12.2012 | EE | 19.12.2012 | FI | 19.12.2012 | IT | 19.12.2012 | LT | 19.12.2012 | LV | 19.12.2012 | NL | 19.12.2012 | PL | 19.12.2012 | RO | 19.12.2012 | SE | 19.12.2012 | SI | 19.12.2012 | SK | 19.12.2012 | TR | 19.12.2012 | IE | 24.01.2013 | LU | 24.01.2013 | CH | 31.01.2013 | LI | 31.01.2013 | MC | 31.01.2013 | FR | 19.02.2013 | BG | 19.03.2013 | GB | 19.03.2013 | GR | 20.03.2013 | ES | 30.03.2013 | IS | 19.04.2013 | PT | 19.04.2013 | [2015/34] |
Former [2015/32] | AT | 19.12.2012 | |
BE | 19.12.2012 | ||
CY | 19.12.2012 | ||
CZ | 19.12.2012 | ||
EE | 19.12.2012 | ||
FI | 19.12.2012 | ||
IT | 19.12.2012 | ||
LT | 19.12.2012 | ||
LV | 19.12.2012 | ||
NL | 19.12.2012 | ||
PL | 19.12.2012 | ||
RO | 19.12.2012 | ||
SE | 19.12.2012 | ||
SI | 19.12.2012 | ||
SK | 19.12.2012 | ||
TR | 19.12.2012 | ||
IE | 24.01.2013 | ||
CH | 31.01.2013 | ||
LI | 31.01.2013 | ||
MC | 31.01.2013 | ||
FR | 19.02.2013 | ||
BG | 19.03.2013 | ||
GB | 19.03.2013 | ||
GR | 20.03.2013 | ||
ES | 30.03.2013 | ||
IS | 19.04.2013 | ||
PT | 19.04.2013 | ||
Former [2014/09] | AT | 19.12.2012 | |
BE | 19.12.2012 | ||
CY | 19.12.2012 | ||
CZ | 19.12.2012 | ||
EE | 19.12.2012 | ||
FI | 19.12.2012 | ||
IT | 19.12.2012 | ||
LT | 19.12.2012 | ||
LV | 19.12.2012 | ||
NL | 19.12.2012 | ||
PL | 19.12.2012 | ||
RO | 19.12.2012 | ||
SE | 19.12.2012 | ||
SI | 19.12.2012 | ||
SK | 19.12.2012 | ||
IE | 24.01.2013 | ||
CH | 31.01.2013 | ||
LI | 31.01.2013 | ||
MC | 31.01.2013 | ||
FR | 19.02.2013 | ||
BG | 19.03.2013 | ||
GB | 19.03.2013 | ||
GR | 20.03.2013 | ||
ES | 30.03.2013 | ||
IS | 19.04.2013 | ||
PT | 19.04.2013 | ||
Former [2014/07] | AT | 19.12.2012 | |
BE | 19.12.2012 | ||
CY | 19.12.2012 | ||
CZ | 19.12.2012 | ||
EE | 19.12.2012 | ||
FI | 19.12.2012 | ||
IT | 19.12.2012 | ||
LT | 19.12.2012 | ||
LV | 19.12.2012 | ||
NL | 19.12.2012 | ||
PL | 19.12.2012 | ||
RO | 19.12.2012 | ||
SE | 19.12.2012 | ||
SI | 19.12.2012 | ||
SK | 19.12.2012 | ||
IE | 24.01.2013 | ||
CH | 31.01.2013 | ||
LI | 31.01.2013 | ||
MC | 31.01.2013 | ||
FR | 19.02.2013 | ||
BG | 19.03.2013 | ||
GR | 20.03.2013 | ||
ES | 30.03.2013 | ||
IS | 19.04.2013 | ||
PT | 19.04.2013 | ||
Former [2014/03] | AT | 19.12.2012 | |
BE | 19.12.2012 | ||
CY | 19.12.2012 | ||
CZ | 19.12.2012 | ||
EE | 19.12.2012 | ||
FI | 19.12.2012 | ||
IT | 19.12.2012 | ||
LT | 19.12.2012 | ||
LV | 19.12.2012 | ||
NL | 19.12.2012 | ||
PL | 19.12.2012 | ||
RO | 19.12.2012 | ||
SE | 19.12.2012 | ||
SI | 19.12.2012 | ||
SK | 19.12.2012 | ||
CH | 31.01.2013 | ||
LI | 31.01.2013 | ||
MC | 31.01.2013 | ||
FR | 19.02.2013 | ||
BG | 19.03.2013 | ||
GR | 20.03.2013 | ||
ES | 30.03.2013 | ||
IS | 19.04.2013 | ||
PT | 19.04.2013 | ||
Former [2013/50] | AT | 19.12.2012 | |
BE | 19.12.2012 | ||
CY | 19.12.2012 | ||
CZ | 19.12.2012 | ||
EE | 19.12.2012 | ||
FI | 19.12.2012 | ||
LT | 19.12.2012 | ||
LV | 19.12.2012 | ||
NL | 19.12.2012 | ||
PL | 19.12.2012 | ||
RO | 19.12.2012 | ||
SE | 19.12.2012 | ||
SI | 19.12.2012 | ||
SK | 19.12.2012 | ||
CH | 31.01.2013 | ||
LI | 31.01.2013 | ||
MC | 31.01.2013 | ||
FR | 19.02.2013 | ||
BG | 19.03.2013 | ||
GR | 20.03.2013 | ||
ES | 30.03.2013 | ||
IS | 19.04.2013 | ||
PT | 19.04.2013 | ||
Former [2013/48] | AT | 19.12.2012 | |
BE | 19.12.2012 | ||
CY | 19.12.2012 | ||
CZ | 19.12.2012 | ||
EE | 19.12.2012 | ||
FI | 19.12.2012 | ||
LT | 19.12.2012 | ||
LV | 19.12.2012 | ||
NL | 19.12.2012 | ||
PL | 19.12.2012 | ||
RO | 19.12.2012 | ||
SE | 19.12.2012 | ||
SI | 19.12.2012 | ||
SK | 19.12.2012 | ||
CH | 31.01.2013 | ||
LI | 31.01.2013 | ||
MC | 31.01.2013 | ||
BG | 19.03.2013 | ||
GR | 20.03.2013 | ||
ES | 30.03.2013 | ||
IS | 19.04.2013 | ||
PT | 19.04.2013 | ||
Former [2013/40] | AT | 19.12.2012 | |
BE | 19.12.2012 | ||
CY | 19.12.2012 | ||
CZ | 19.12.2012 | ||
EE | 19.12.2012 | ||
FI | 19.12.2012 | ||
LT | 19.12.2012 | ||
LV | 19.12.2012 | ||
NL | 19.12.2012 | ||
PL | 19.12.2012 | ||
RO | 19.12.2012 | ||
SE | 19.12.2012 | ||
SI | 19.12.2012 | ||
SK | 19.12.2012 | ||
MC | 31.01.2013 | ||
BG | 19.03.2013 | ||
GR | 20.03.2013 | ||
ES | 30.03.2013 | ||
IS | 19.04.2013 | ||
PT | 19.04.2013 | ||
Former [2013/37] | AT | 19.12.2012 | |
BE | 19.12.2012 | ||
CY | 19.12.2012 | ||
CZ | 19.12.2012 | ||
EE | 19.12.2012 | ||
FI | 19.12.2012 | ||
LT | 19.12.2012 | ||
LV | 19.12.2012 | ||
NL | 19.12.2012 | ||
PL | 19.12.2012 | ||
RO | 19.12.2012 | ||
SE | 19.12.2012 | ||
SI | 19.12.2012 | ||
SK | 19.12.2012 | ||
MC | 31.01.2013 | ||
BG | 19.03.2013 | ||
GR | 20.03.2013 | ||
ES | 30.03.2013 | ||
IS | 19.04.2013 | ||
Former [2013/36] | AT | 19.12.2012 | |
BE | 19.12.2012 | ||
CY | 19.12.2012 | ||
CZ | 19.12.2012 | ||
EE | 19.12.2012 | ||
FI | 19.12.2012 | ||
LT | 19.12.2012 | ||
LV | 19.12.2012 | ||
PL | 19.12.2012 | ||
SE | 19.12.2012 | ||
SI | 19.12.2012 | ||
SK | 19.12.2012 | ||
BG | 19.03.2013 | ||
GR | 20.03.2013 | ||
ES | 30.03.2013 | ||
IS | 19.04.2013 | ||
Former [2013/35] | BE | 19.12.2012 | |
CY | 19.12.2012 | ||
CZ | 19.12.2012 | ||
EE | 19.12.2012 | ||
FI | 19.12.2012 | ||
LT | 19.12.2012 | ||
LV | 19.12.2012 | ||
SE | 19.12.2012 | ||
SI | 19.12.2012 | ||
SK | 19.12.2012 | ||
BG | 19.03.2013 | ||
GR | 20.03.2013 | ||
ES | 30.03.2013 | ||
IS | 19.04.2013 | ||
Former [2013/34] | BE | 19.12.2012 | |
FI | 19.12.2012 | ||
LT | 19.12.2012 | ||
LV | 19.12.2012 | ||
SE | 19.12.2012 | ||
SI | 19.12.2012 | ||
BG | 19.03.2013 | ||
GR | 20.03.2013 | ||
ES | 30.03.2013 | ||
IS | 19.04.2013 | ||
Former [2013/33] | BE | 19.12.2012 | |
FI | 19.12.2012 | ||
LT | 19.12.2012 | ||
LV | 19.12.2012 | ||
SE | 19.12.2012 | ||
SI | 19.12.2012 | ||
GR | 20.03.2013 | ||
ES | 30.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/26] | FI | 19.12.2012 | |
LT | 19.12.2012 | ||
LV | 19.12.2012 | ||
SE | 19.12.2012 | ||
SI | 19.12.2012 | ||
GR | 20.03.2013 | ||
ES | 30.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/24] | FI | 19.12.2012 | |
LT | 19.12.2012 | ||
LV | 19.12.2012 | ||
SE | 19.12.2012 | ||
GR | 20.03.2013 | ||
ES | 30.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/23] | FI | 19.12.2012 | |
LT | 19.12.2012 | ||
LV | 19.12.2012 | ||
SE | 19.12.2012 | ||
ES | 30.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/22] | FI | 19.12.2012 | |
LT | 19.12.2012 | ||
SE | 19.12.2012 | ||
ES | 30.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/21] | LT | 19.12.2012 | |
SE | 19.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/20] | LT | 19.12.2012 | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]WO2006006803 (LG ELECTRONICS INC [KR], et al) [X] 1-5,8-15 * the whole document *[I] 6,7 | International search | [A]JPH1139165 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD); | [A]EP1170664 (IBM [US]); | [A]US6788429 (CLOUGH JAMES [US], et al); | [A]US6970923 (MUKAIYAMA MASANORI [JP], et al) | by applicant | WO2006006803 |