EP1987610 - METHOD FOR OPERATING ENHANCED RLC ENTITY AND RNC ENTITY FOR WCDMA AND SYSTEM THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.04.2015 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.10.2017 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): BG, HU, TR | published on 15.11.2017 [2017/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LG Electronics Inc. 20 Yoido-dong Yongdungpo-gu Seoul 150-010 / KR | [N/P] |
Former [2008/45] | For all designated states LG Electronics Inc. 20 Yoido-dong Yongdungpo-gu Seoul 150-010 / KR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CHUN, Sung-Duck Saetbyeol Hanyang Apt. 601-1004 Daran-dong, Dongan-gu, Anyang Gyeonggi-do, 431-773 / KR | 02 /
LEE, Young-Dae 337-7 Seohyeon-dong, Bundang-gu, Seongnam Gyeonggi-do, 463-818 / KR | 03 /
PARK, Sung-Jun Goldenville Officetel 921 724, Gojan-dong, Danwon-gu, Ansan Gyeonggi-do, 425-021 / KR | [2014/23] |
Former [2008/45] | 01 /
CHUN, Sung-Duck Saetbyeol Hanyang Apt. 601-1004 Daran-dong, Dongan-gu, Anyang Gyeonggi-do, 431-773 / KR | ||
02 /
LEE, Young-Dae 337-7 Seohyeon-dong, Bundang-gu, Seongnam Gyeonggi-do, 463-818 / KR | |||
03 /
PARK, Sung-Jun Goldenville Officetel 921 724, Gojan-dong, Danwon-gu, Ansan Gyeonggi-do, 425-021 / KR | Representative(s) | Plasseraud IP 66, rue de la Chaussée d'Antin 75440 Paris Cedex 09 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2014/23] | Cabinet Plasseraud 52, rue de la Victoire 75440 Paris Cedex 09 / FR | ||
Former [2008/45] | Cabinet Plasseraud 52 rue de la Victoire 75440 Paris Cedex 09 / FR | Application number, filing date | 07708815.1 | 07.02.2007 | [2008/45] | WO2007KR00665 | Priority number, date | US20060771305P | 07.02.2006 Original published format: US 771305 P | KR20070002721 | 10.01.2007 Original published format: KR 20070002721 | [2008/45] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007091840 | Date: | 16.08.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/33] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1987610 | Date: | 05.11.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.08.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/45] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1987610 | Date: | 04.06.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/23] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 16.08.2007 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.09.2012 | Classification | IPC: | H04W28/06 | [2012/43] | CPC: |
H04W28/06 (EP,KR,US);
H04W72/02 (EP,KR,US);
H04W72/21 (EP,KR,US);
H04W74/006 (EP,KR,US);
H04W74/02 (EP,KR,US);
H04W74/0833 (EP,KR,US);
|
Former IPC [2008/45] | H04B7/26 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/45] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUM BETRIEB EINER ERWEITERTEN RLC-ENTITÄT UND RNC-ENTITÄT FÜR WCDMA UND SYSTEM DAFÜR | [2008/45] | English: | METHOD FOR OPERATING ENHANCED RLC ENTITY AND RNC ENTITY FOR WCDMA AND SYSTEM THEREOF | [2008/45] | French: | PROCÉDÉ D'EXPLOITATION D'ENTITÉ RLC ET D'ENTITÉ RNC AMÉLIORÉES POUR WCDMA ET SYSTÈME ASSOCIÉ | [2008/45] | Entry into regional phase | 04.09.2008 | National basic fee paid | 04.09.2008 | Search fee paid | 04.09.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.09.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.09.2008 | Examination requested [2008/45] | 06.02.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 16.01.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.04.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 25.04.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 25.04.2014 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 16.01.2014 | Opposition(s) | 05.03.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit [2015/20] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.01.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.01.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.01.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 21.02.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 20.02.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 07.02.2007 | AT | 04.06.2014 | BE | 04.06.2014 | BG | 04.06.2014 | CY | 04.06.2014 | CZ | 04.06.2014 | DK | 04.06.2014 | EE | 04.06.2014 | ES | 04.06.2014 | FI | 04.06.2014 | IT | 04.06.2014 | LT | 04.06.2014 | LV | 04.06.2014 | MC | 04.06.2014 | NL | 04.06.2014 | PL | 04.06.2014 | RO | 04.06.2014 | SE | 04.06.2014 | SI | 04.06.2014 | SK | 04.06.2014 | TR | 04.06.2014 | GR | 05.09.2014 | IS | 04.10.2014 | PT | 06.10.2014 | IE | 07.02.2015 | LU | 07.02.2015 | CH | 28.02.2015 | LI | 28.02.2015 | FR | 02.03.2015 | [2017/39] |
Former [2016/12] | AT | 04.06.2014 | |
BE | 04.06.2014 | ||
CY | 04.06.2014 | ||
CZ | 04.06.2014 | ||
DK | 04.06.2014 | ||
EE | 04.06.2014 | ||
ES | 04.06.2014 | ||
FI | 04.06.2014 | ||
IT | 04.06.2014 | ||
LT | 04.06.2014 | ||
LV | 04.06.2014 | ||
MC | 04.06.2014 | ||
NL | 04.06.2014 | ||
PL | 04.06.2014 | ||
RO | 04.06.2014 | ||
SE | 04.06.2014 | ||
SI | 04.06.2014 | ||
SK | 04.06.2014 | ||
GR | 05.09.2014 | ||
IS | 04.10.2014 | ||
PT | 06.10.2014 | ||
IE | 07.02.2015 | ||
LU | 07.02.2015 | ||
CH | 28.02.2015 | ||
LI | 28.02.2015 | ||
FR | 02.03.2015 | ||
Former [2016/07] | AT | 04.06.2014 | |
BE | 04.06.2014 | ||
CY | 04.06.2014 | ||
CZ | 04.06.2014 | ||
DK | 04.06.2014 | ||
EE | 04.06.2014 | ||
ES | 04.06.2014 | ||
FI | 04.06.2014 | ||
IT | 04.06.2014 | ||
LT | 04.06.2014 | ||
LV | 04.06.2014 | ||
MC | 04.06.2014 | ||
NL | 04.06.2014 | ||
PL | 04.06.2014 | ||
RO | 04.06.2014 | ||
SE | 04.06.2014 | ||
SI | 04.06.2014 | ||
SK | 04.06.2014 | ||
GR | 05.09.2014 | ||
IS | 04.10.2014 | ||
PT | 06.10.2014 | ||
IE | 07.02.2015 | ||
LU | 07.02.2015 | ||
CH | 28.02.2015 | ||
LI | 28.02.2015 | ||
Former [2015/47] | AT | 04.06.2014 | |
BE | 04.06.2014 | ||
CY | 04.06.2014 | ||
CZ | 04.06.2014 | ||
DK | 04.06.2014 | ||
EE | 04.06.2014 | ||
ES | 04.06.2014 | ||
FI | 04.06.2014 | ||
IT | 04.06.2014 | ||
LT | 04.06.2014 | ||
LV | 04.06.2014 | ||
MC | 04.06.2014 | ||
NL | 04.06.2014 | ||
PL | 04.06.2014 | ||
RO | 04.06.2014 | ||
SE | 04.06.2014 | ||
SI | 04.06.2014 | ||
SK | 04.06.2014 | ||
GR | 05.09.2014 | ||
IS | 04.10.2014 | ||
PT | 06.10.2014 | ||
LU | 07.02.2015 | ||
CH | 28.02.2015 | ||
LI | 28.02.2015 | ||
Former [2015/46] | AT | 04.06.2014 | |
BE | 04.06.2014 | ||
CY | 04.06.2014 | ||
CZ | 04.06.2014 | ||
DK | 04.06.2014 | ||
EE | 04.06.2014 | ||
ES | 04.06.2014 | ||
FI | 04.06.2014 | ||
IT | 04.06.2014 | ||
LT | 04.06.2014 | ||
LV | 04.06.2014 | ||
MC | 04.06.2014 | ||
NL | 04.06.2014 | ||
PL | 04.06.2014 | ||
RO | 04.06.2014 | ||
SE | 04.06.2014 | ||
SI | 04.06.2014 | ||
SK | 04.06.2014 | ||
GR | 05.09.2014 | ||
IS | 04.10.2014 | ||
PT | 06.10.2014 | ||
LU | 07.02.2015 | ||
Former [2015/44] | AT | 04.06.2014 | |
BE | 04.06.2014 | ||
CY | 04.06.2014 | ||
CZ | 04.06.2014 | ||
DK | 04.06.2014 | ||
EE | 04.06.2014 | ||
ES | 04.06.2014 | ||
FI | 04.06.2014 | ||
IT | 04.06.2014 | ||
LT | 04.06.2014 | ||
LV | 04.06.2014 | ||
NL | 04.06.2014 | ||
PL | 04.06.2014 | ||
RO | 04.06.2014 | ||
SE | 04.06.2014 | ||
SI | 04.06.2014 | ||
SK | 04.06.2014 | ||
GR | 05.09.2014 | ||
IS | 04.10.2014 | ||
PT | 06.10.2014 | ||
LU | 07.02.2015 | ||
Former [2015/36] | AT | 04.06.2014 | |
BE | 04.06.2014 | ||
CY | 04.06.2014 | ||
CZ | 04.06.2014 | ||
DK | 04.06.2014 | ||
EE | 04.06.2014 | ||
ES | 04.06.2014 | ||
FI | 04.06.2014 | ||
IT | 04.06.2014 | ||
LT | 04.06.2014 | ||
LV | 04.06.2014 | ||
NL | 04.06.2014 | ||
PL | 04.06.2014 | ||
RO | 04.06.2014 | ||
SE | 04.06.2014 | ||
SI | 04.06.2014 | ||
SK | 04.06.2014 | ||
GR | 05.09.2014 | ||
IS | 04.10.2014 | ||
PT | 06.10.2014 | ||
Former [2015/30] | AT | 04.06.2014 | |
BE | 04.06.2014 | ||
CY | 04.06.2014 | ||
CZ | 04.06.2014 | ||
DK | 04.06.2014 | ||
EE | 04.06.2014 | ||
ES | 04.06.2014 | ||
FI | 04.06.2014 | ||
IT | 04.06.2014 | ||
LT | 04.06.2014 | ||
LV | 04.06.2014 | ||
NL | 04.06.2014 | ||
PL | 04.06.2014 | ||
RO | 04.06.2014 | ||
SE | 04.06.2014 | ||
SK | 04.06.2014 | ||
GR | 05.09.2014 | ||
IS | 04.10.2014 | ||
PT | 06.10.2014 | ||
Former [2015/22] | AT | 04.06.2014 | |
CY | 04.06.2014 | ||
CZ | 04.06.2014 | ||
DK | 04.06.2014 | ||
EE | 04.06.2014 | ||
ES | 04.06.2014 | ||
FI | 04.06.2014 | ||
IT | 04.06.2014 | ||
LT | 04.06.2014 | ||
LV | 04.06.2014 | ||
NL | 04.06.2014 | ||
PL | 04.06.2014 | ||
RO | 04.06.2014 | ||
SE | 04.06.2014 | ||
SK | 04.06.2014 | ||
GR | 05.09.2014 | ||
IS | 04.10.2014 | ||
PT | 06.10.2014 | ||
Former [2015/12] | AT | 04.06.2014 | |
CY | 04.06.2014 | ||
CZ | 04.06.2014 | ||
EE | 04.06.2014 | ||
ES | 04.06.2014 | ||
FI | 04.06.2014 | ||
LT | 04.06.2014 | ||
LV | 04.06.2014 | ||
NL | 04.06.2014 | ||
PL | 04.06.2014 | ||
RO | 04.06.2014 | ||
SE | 04.06.2014 | ||
SK | 04.06.2014 | ||
GR | 05.09.2014 | ||
IS | 04.10.2014 | ||
PT | 06.10.2014 | ||
Former [2015/11] | AT | 04.06.2014 | |
CY | 04.06.2014 | ||
CZ | 04.06.2014 | ||
EE | 04.06.2014 | ||
ES | 04.06.2014 | ||
FI | 04.06.2014 | ||
LT | 04.06.2014 | ||
LV | 04.06.2014 | ||
PL | 04.06.2014 | ||
RO | 04.06.2014 | ||
SE | 04.06.2014 | ||
SK | 04.06.2014 | ||
GR | 05.09.2014 | ||
PT | 06.10.2014 | ||
Former [2015/10] | AT | 04.06.2014 | |
CY | 04.06.2014 | ||
CZ | 04.06.2014 | ||
EE | 04.06.2014 | ||
ES | 04.06.2014 | ||
FI | 04.06.2014 | ||
LT | 04.06.2014 | ||
LV | 04.06.2014 | ||
SE | 04.06.2014 | ||
SK | 04.06.2014 | ||
GR | 05.09.2014 | ||
Former [2014/51] | AT | 04.06.2014 | |
CY | 04.06.2014 | ||
FI | 04.06.2014 | ||
LT | 04.06.2014 | ||
LV | 04.06.2014 | ||
SE | 04.06.2014 | ||
GR | 05.09.2014 | ||
Former [2014/50] | CY | 04.06.2014 | |
FI | 04.06.2014 | ||
LT | 04.06.2014 | ||
LV | 04.06.2014 | ||
SE | 04.06.2014 | ||
GR | 05.09.2014 | ||
Former [2014/49] | CY | 04.06.2014 | |
FI | 04.06.2014 | ||
LT | 04.06.2014 | ||
Former [2014/48] | CY | 04.06.2014 | |
LT | 04.06.2014 | ||
Former [2014/47] | CY | 04.06.2014 | Documents cited: | Search | [XAY]US2002021714 (SEGUIN LAURE [FR]) [X] 1-8 * abstract * * paragraphs [0006] - [0008] - [0015] , [0026] - [0033] - [0039] , [0040] * [A] 10-15 [Y] 9; | [A]US2004057387 (YI SEUNG-JUNE [KR], et al) [A] 1-15 * paragraphs [0011] , [0014] , [0015] *; | [XAYI]US2005185608 (LEE KANG-GYU [KR], et al) [X] 10,11,14,15 * abstract * * paragraphs [0014] - [0026] - [0030] - [0033] - [0061] - [0069] * [A] 1-8 [Y] 9 [I] 12,13; | [A]US2005265301 (HEO YOUN-HYOUNG [KR], et al) [A] 1-15* paragraphs [0048] - [0053] *; | [XI] - QUALCOMM, "Max number of MAC-hs header extensions", 3GPP DRAFT; R2-042023 MAC-HS HEADER EXTENSIONS, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, (20040929), vol. RAN WG2, no. Sophia Antipolis, France; 20040929, XP050126646 [X] 1-3,10,14,15 * the whole document * [I] 4-9,11-13 | International search | [A]US2003147371 (CHOI SUNG-HO [KR], et al); | [A]US2004028078 (BECKMANN MARK [DE], et al); | [X]WO2005055472 (LG ELECTRONICS INC [KR], et al); | [X]US2005185608 (LEE KANG-GYU [KR], et al); | [A]US6950420 (SARKKINEN SINIKKA [FI], et al) |