EP1976725 - INFLATABLE ELEMENT FOR INTERNAL USE IN THE CONTAINER OF A TRANSPORT OR STORAGE DEVICE; METHOD FOR INFLATING THE ELEMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.03.2018 Database last updated on 01.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 14.04.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 08.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.06.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY | published on 29.07.2020 [2020/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Accede B.V. Josink Esweg 31 7545 PN Enschede / NL | [2013/17] |
Former [2008/41] | For all designated states Eenkhoorn, Erik, Jeroen Paul Pellastraat 52 7558 HG Hengelo OV / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Eenkhoorn, Erik Jeroen 52 Paul Pellastraat 7558 HG Hengelo OV / NL | [2017/20] |
Former [2013/17] | 01 /
Eenkhoorn, Erik Jeroen Paul Pellastraat 52 7558 HG Hengelo OV / NL | ||
Former [2008/41] | 01 /
see applicant ... | Representative(s) | Klooster, Jan Hanri Muller & Eilbracht B.V. Binckhorstlaan 287/2 2516 BC Den Haag / NL | [2017/20] |
Former [2008/41] | Klooster, Jan Hanri Muller & Eilbracht P.O. Box 1080 2260 BB Leidschendam / NL | Application number, filing date | 07709128.8 | 10.01.2007 | [2008/41] | WO2007NL00009 | Priority number, date | NL20061030882 | 10.01.2006 Original published format: NL 1030882 | [2008/41] | Filing language | NL | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2007081201 | Date: | 19.07.2007 | Language: | NL | [2007/29] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1976725 | Date: | 08.10.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/41] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1976725 | Date: | 17.05.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/20] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 25.10.2007 | Classification | IPC: | B60P3/22 | [2008/41] | CPC: |
B65D90/52 (EP,US);
B60P3/2235 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2017/20] |
Former [2008/41] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | AUFBLASBARES ELEMENT ZUR INNEREN VERWENDUNG IM BEHÄLTER EINER TRANSPORT- ODER LAGERUNGSVORRICHTUNG, VERFAHREN ZUM AUFBLASEN DES ELEMENTS | [2008/41] | English: | INFLATABLE ELEMENT FOR INTERNAL USE IN THE CONTAINER OF A TRANSPORT OR STORAGE DEVICE; METHOD FOR INFLATING THE ELEMENT | [2008/41] | French: | ELEMENT GONFLABLE A UTILISER A L'INTERIEUR DU CONTENANT D'UN DISPOSITIF DE TRANSPORT OU DE STOCKAGE ET PROCEDE POUR GONFLER LEDIT ELEMENT | [2008/41] | Entry into regional phase | 19.07.2007 | Translation filed | 11.08.2008 | National basic fee paid | 11.08.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.08.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.08.2008 | Examination requested [2008/41] | 07.09.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 12.03.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.02.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.06.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.09.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.01.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.04.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.07.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.12.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.04.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 06.04.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 06.04.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 07.09.2009 | Opposition(s) | 20.02.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/17] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.02.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 01.02.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.01.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.01.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 31.01.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 02.02.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 01.02.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 31.01.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 10.01.2007 | CY | 17.05.2017 | CZ | 17.05.2017 | DK | 17.05.2017 | EE | 17.05.2017 | ES | 17.05.2017 | FI | 17.05.2017 | LT | 17.05.2017 | LV | 17.05.2017 | MC | 17.05.2017 | PL | 17.05.2017 | PT | 17.05.2017 | RO | 17.05.2017 | SE | 17.05.2017 | SI | 17.05.2017 | SK | 17.05.2017 | TR | 17.05.2017 | BG | 17.08.2017 | GR | 18.08.2017 | IS | 17.09.2017 | IE | 10.01.2018 | LU | 10.01.2018 | [2020/31] |
Former [2020/27] | HU | 10.01.2007 | |
CZ | 17.05.2017 | ||
DK | 17.05.2017 | ||
EE | 17.05.2017 | ||
ES | 17.05.2017 | ||
FI | 17.05.2017 | ||
LT | 17.05.2017 | ||
LV | 17.05.2017 | ||
MC | 17.05.2017 | ||
PL | 17.05.2017 | ||
PT | 17.05.2017 | ||
RO | 17.05.2017 | ||
SE | 17.05.2017 | ||
SI | 17.05.2017 | ||
SK | 17.05.2017 | ||
TR | 17.05.2017 | ||
BG | 17.08.2017 | ||
GR | 18.08.2017 | ||
IS | 17.09.2017 | ||
IE | 10.01.2018 | ||
LU | 10.01.2018 | ||
Former [2020/15] | CZ | 17.05.2017 | |
DK | 17.05.2017 | ||
EE | 17.05.2017 | ||
ES | 17.05.2017 | ||
FI | 17.05.2017 | ||
LT | 17.05.2017 | ||
LV | 17.05.2017 | ||
MC | 17.05.2017 | ||
PL | 17.05.2017 | ||
RO | 17.05.2017 | ||
SE | 17.05.2017 | ||
SI | 17.05.2017 | ||
SK | 17.05.2017 | ||
TR | 17.05.2017 | ||
BG | 17.08.2017 | ||
GR | 18.08.2017 | ||
IS | 17.09.2017 | ||
IE | 10.01.2018 | ||
LU | 10.01.2018 | ||
Former [2019/30] | CZ | 17.05.2017 | |
DK | 17.05.2017 | ||
EE | 17.05.2017 | ||
ES | 17.05.2017 | ||
FI | 17.05.2017 | ||
LT | 17.05.2017 | ||
LV | 17.05.2017 | ||
MC | 17.05.2017 | ||
PL | 17.05.2017 | ||
RO | 17.05.2017 | ||
SE | 17.05.2017 | ||
SI | 17.05.2017 | ||
SK | 17.05.2017 | ||
BG | 17.08.2017 | ||
GR | 18.08.2017 | ||
IS | 17.09.2017 | ||
IE | 10.01.2018 | ||
LU | 10.01.2018 | ||
Former [2019/09] | CZ | 17.05.2017 | |
DK | 17.05.2017 | ||
EE | 17.05.2017 | ||
ES | 17.05.2017 | ||
FI | 17.05.2017 | ||
LT | 17.05.2017 | ||
LV | 17.05.2017 | ||
PL | 17.05.2017 | ||
RO | 17.05.2017 | ||
SE | 17.05.2017 | ||
SI | 17.05.2017 | ||
SK | 17.05.2017 | ||
BG | 17.08.2017 | ||
GR | 18.08.2017 | ||
IS | 17.09.2017 | ||
IE | 10.01.2018 | ||
LU | 10.01.2018 | ||
Former [2018/47] | CZ | 17.05.2017 | |
DK | 17.05.2017 | ||
EE | 17.05.2017 | ||
ES | 17.05.2017 | ||
FI | 17.05.2017 | ||
LT | 17.05.2017 | ||
LV | 17.05.2017 | ||
PL | 17.05.2017 | ||
RO | 17.05.2017 | ||
SE | 17.05.2017 | ||
SI | 17.05.2017 | ||
SK | 17.05.2017 | ||
BG | 17.08.2017 | ||
GR | 18.08.2017 | ||
IS | 17.09.2017 | ||
LU | 10.01.2018 | ||
Former [2018/25] | CZ | 17.05.2017 | |
DK | 17.05.2017 | ||
EE | 17.05.2017 | ||
ES | 17.05.2017 | ||
FI | 17.05.2017 | ||
LT | 17.05.2017 | ||
LV | 17.05.2017 | ||
PL | 17.05.2017 | ||
RO | 17.05.2017 | ||
SE | 17.05.2017 | ||
SI | 17.05.2017 | ||
SK | 17.05.2017 | ||
BG | 17.08.2017 | ||
GR | 18.08.2017 | ||
IS | 17.09.2017 | ||
Former [2018/10] | CZ | 17.05.2017 | |
DK | 17.05.2017 | ||
EE | 17.05.2017 | ||
ES | 17.05.2017 | ||
FI | 17.05.2017 | ||
LT | 17.05.2017 | ||
LV | 17.05.2017 | ||
PL | 17.05.2017 | ||
RO | 17.05.2017 | ||
SE | 17.05.2017 | ||
SK | 17.05.2017 | ||
BG | 17.08.2017 | ||
GR | 18.08.2017 | ||
IS | 17.09.2017 | ||
Former [2018/09] | DK | 17.05.2017 | |
EE | 17.05.2017 | ||
ES | 17.05.2017 | ||
FI | 17.05.2017 | ||
LT | 17.05.2017 | ||
LV | 17.05.2017 | ||
PL | 17.05.2017 | ||
SE | 17.05.2017 | ||
BG | 17.08.2017 | ||
GR | 18.08.2017 | ||
IS | 17.09.2017 | ||
Former [2017/50] | ES | 17.05.2017 | |
FI | 17.05.2017 | ||
LT | 17.05.2017 | ||
LV | 17.05.2017 | ||
PL | 17.05.2017 | ||
SE | 17.05.2017 | ||
BG | 17.08.2017 | ||
GR | 18.08.2017 | ||
IS | 17.09.2017 | ||
Former [2017/49] | ES | 17.05.2017 | |
FI | 17.05.2017 | ||
LT | 17.05.2017 | ||
GR | 18.08.2017 | ||
IS | 17.09.2017 | Cited in | International search | [X]LU38593 (VANLAER) [X] 1-4,14,15 * figure -; claim - *; | [A]FR900012 (BONNECHAUX); | [X]FR945320 (ROATTA) [X] 1 * the whole document *; | [X]GB2110192 (MOBILCRAFT, et al) [X] 1,4,5,7-10,14-16 * page 1, line 114 - page 2, line 10 * * page 2, line 20 - line 29; figure - *; | [A]US4483454 (ROGERS THELMER A [US], et al); | [X]DE19744359 (GRENZENDORF DANIEL [DE]) [X] 1-5,7,10,14,15 * the whole document *; | [Y]EP1386859 (ILLINOIS TOOL WORKS [US]) [Y] 10 * paragraphs [0016] , [0017] , [0020] , [0021] *; | [XAY]DE10251966 (ENDERS MARKUS [DE]) [X] 1-3,14,15 * the whole document * [A] 16,17 [Y] 10 | by applicant | DE10251966 |