EP1981346 - COOLING APPARATUS FOR COOLING DOUGH PRODUCTS AND METHOD FOR COOLING DOUGH PRODUCTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.01.2013 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2015 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 19.08.2015 [2015/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Conway Exploitatie en Beheer B.V. Odijkerweg 1 3972 NE Driebergen-Rijsenburg / NL | [2008/43] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
VAN CAPELLEVEEN, Pieter Tabaksweg 70 NL-3921 CM Elst / NL | [2008/43] | Representative(s) | Hatzmann, Martin, et al V.O. Johan de Wittlaan 7 2517 JR Den Haag / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2012/10] | Hatzmann, Martin, et al Vereenigde Johan de Wittlaan 7 2517 JR Den Haag / NL | ||
Former [2008/43] | Hatzmann, Martin, et al Vereenigde Johan de Wittlaan 7 2517 JR Den Haag / NL | Application number, filing date | 07709176.7 | 24.01.2007 | [2008/43] | WO2007NL50028 | Priority number, date | NL20061030996 | 25.01.2006 Original published format: NL 1030996 | [2008/43] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007086741 | Date: | 02.08.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/31] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1981346 | Date: | 22.10.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.08.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/43] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1981346 | Date: | 07.03.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/10] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 02.08.2007 | Classification | IPC: | A21C15/00, F25D13/06 | [2008/43] | CPC: |
F25D13/067 (EP);
A21C15/00 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/43] | Title | German: | KÜHLVORRICHTUNG ZUM KÜHLEN VON TEIGPRODUKTEN UND VERFAHREN ZUM KÜHLEN VON TEIGPRODUKTEN | [2008/43] | English: | COOLING APPARATUS FOR COOLING DOUGH PRODUCTS AND METHOD FOR COOLING DOUGH PRODUCTS | [2008/43] | French: | APPAREIL DE REFROIDISSEMENT DESTINE A REFROIDIR DES PRODUITS A BASE DE PÂTE ET PROCÉDÉ PERMETTANT DE REFROIDIR DES PRODUITS A BASE DE PÂTE | [2008/43] | Entry into regional phase | 22.08.2008 | National basic fee paid | 22.08.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.08.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.11.2007 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 22.08.2008 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.08.2008 | Examination requested [2008/43] | 15.02.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 24.08.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.09.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.01.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 27.01.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 15.02.2011 | Opposition(s) | 10.12.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/07] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.01.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.01.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 17.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 16.01.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 24.01.2007 | AT | 07.03.2012 | BE | 07.03.2012 | CY | 07.03.2012 | DK | 07.03.2012 | EE | 07.03.2012 | LT | 07.03.2012 | LV | 07.03.2012 | PL | 07.03.2012 | RO | 07.03.2012 | SE | 07.03.2012 | SK | 07.03.2012 | TR | 07.03.2012 | BG | 07.06.2012 | GR | 08.06.2012 | IS | 07.07.2012 | PT | 09.07.2012 | [2015/34] |
Former [2015/32] | AT | 07.03.2012 | |
BE | 07.03.2012 | ||
CY | 07.03.2012 | ||
DK | 07.03.2012 | ||
EE | 07.03.2012 | ||
LT | 07.03.2012 | ||
LV | 07.03.2012 | ||
PL | 07.03.2012 | ||
RO | 07.03.2012 | ||
SE | 07.03.2012 | ||
SK | 07.03.2012 | ||
TR | 07.03.2012 | ||
BG | 07.06.2012 | ||
GR | 08.06.2012 | ||
IS | 07.07.2012 | ||
PT | 09.07.2012 | ||
Former [2013/33] | AT | 07.03.2012 | |
BE | 07.03.2012 | ||
CY | 07.03.2012 | ||
DK | 07.03.2012 | ||
EE | 07.03.2012 | ||
LT | 07.03.2012 | ||
LV | 07.03.2012 | ||
PL | 07.03.2012 | ||
RO | 07.03.2012 | ||
SE | 07.03.2012 | ||
SK | 07.03.2012 | ||
BG | 07.06.2012 | ||
GR | 08.06.2012 | ||
IS | 07.07.2012 | ||
PT | 09.07.2012 | ||
Former [2013/08] | AT | 07.03.2012 | |
BE | 07.03.2012 | ||
CY | 07.03.2012 | ||
DK | 07.03.2012 | ||
EE | 07.03.2012 | ||
LT | 07.03.2012 | ||
LV | 07.03.2012 | ||
PL | 07.03.2012 | ||
RO | 07.03.2012 | ||
SE | 07.03.2012 | ||
SK | 07.03.2012 | ||
GR | 08.06.2012 | ||
IS | 07.07.2012 | ||
PT | 09.07.2012 | ||
Former [2013/07] | AT | 07.03.2012 | |
BE | 07.03.2012 | ||
CY | 07.03.2012 | ||
EE | 07.03.2012 | ||
LT | 07.03.2012 | ||
LV | 07.03.2012 | ||
PL | 07.03.2012 | ||
RO | 07.03.2012 | ||
SE | 07.03.2012 | ||
SK | 07.03.2012 | ||
GR | 08.06.2012 | ||
IS | 07.07.2012 | ||
PT | 09.07.2012 | ||
Former [2013/01] | BE | 07.03.2012 | |
CY | 07.03.2012 | ||
EE | 07.03.2012 | ||
LT | 07.03.2012 | ||
LV | 07.03.2012 | ||
PL | 07.03.2012 | ||
RO | 07.03.2012 | ||
SE | 07.03.2012 | ||
SK | 07.03.2012 | ||
GR | 08.06.2012 | ||
IS | 07.07.2012 | ||
PT | 09.07.2012 | ||
Former [2012/50] | BE | 07.03.2012 | |
CY | 07.03.2012 | ||
EE | 07.03.2012 | ||
LT | 07.03.2012 | ||
LV | 07.03.2012 | ||
PL | 07.03.2012 | ||
RO | 07.03.2012 | ||
SE | 07.03.2012 | ||
SK | 07.03.2012 | ||
GR | 08.06.2012 | ||
IS | 07.07.2012 | ||
Former [2012/49] | BE | 07.03.2012 | |
CY | 07.03.2012 | ||
EE | 07.03.2012 | ||
LT | 07.03.2012 | ||
LV | 07.03.2012 | ||
PL | 07.03.2012 | ||
RO | 07.03.2012 | ||
SE | 07.03.2012 | ||
GR | 08.06.2012 | ||
IS | 07.07.2012 | ||
Former [2012/48] | BE | 07.03.2012 | |
CY | 07.03.2012 | ||
EE | 07.03.2012 | ||
LT | 07.03.2012 | ||
LV | 07.03.2012 | ||
SE | 07.03.2012 | ||
GR | 08.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/46] | BE | 07.03.2012 | |
CY | 07.03.2012 | ||
LT | 07.03.2012 | ||
LV | 07.03.2012 | ||
GR | 08.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/41] | CY | 07.03.2012 | |
LT | 07.03.2012 | ||
LV | 07.03.2012 | ||
GR | 08.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/39] | LT | 07.03.2012 | |
LV | 07.03.2012 | ||
GR | 08.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/36] | LT | 07.03.2012 | |
GR | 08.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/33] | LT | 07.03.2012 | Cited in | International search | [Y]US1635406 (GREER JESSE W) [Y] 13-17,30 * the whole document *; | [A]GB478541 (W E LONG COMPANY); | [Y]GB1098784 (WERNER & PFLEIDERER) [Y] 8,27 * the whole document *; | [A]US4196802 (LORENTZEN JORGEN [DK]); | [Y]US4524682 (HAAS SR FRANZ [AT], et al) [Y] 5,24 * the whole document *; | [X]GB2156501 (BAKER PERKINS HOLDINGS PLC) [X] 1-4,9,21-23 * the whole document *; | [Y]EP0216409 (WILLIBRORDUS KAAK STEPHANUS) [Y] 19 * the whole document *; | [A]EP0565098 (SOREMARTEC SA [BE]); | [Y]US5253743 (HAAS SR FRANZ [AT], et al) [Y] 18 * the whole document *; | [X]AT397183B (HAAS FRANZ WAFFELMASCH [AT]) [X] 1-4,12,21-23,29 * the whole document *; | [A]EP0791295 (GOUET S A [FR]); | [Y]EP0954973 (WERNER & PFLEIDERER LEBENSMITT [DE]) [Y] 6,7,25,26 * the whole document *; | [XY]US6082250 (HAAS JUN FRANZ [AT]) [X] 1-4,12,20-23,29,31 * the whole document * [Y] 5-8,10,13-19,24-28,30; | [Y]WO0133967 (KOENIG MASCHINEN GMBH [AT], et al) [Y] 10,28 * the whole document *; | [A]DE10214837 (M & W ZANDER FACILITY ENG GMBH [DE]) [A] 20,31 * the whole document * | by applicant | EP0954973 | US6082250 |