EP1984710 - DEVICE AND METHOD FOR SPECTROMETRIC SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 28.01.2011 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.01.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 02.03.2011 [2011/09] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states AstraZeneca AB 151 85 Södertälje / SE | [2008/44] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FOSTER, Stephen AstraZeneca Hurdsfield Industrial Estate Macclesfield Cheshire SK10 2NA / GB | 02 /
FREEDMAN, Karl AstraZeneca Hurdsfield Industrial Estate Macclesfield Cheshire SK10 2NA / GB | [2008/44] | Representative(s) | Wahlström, Christer AstraZeneca Global Intellectual Property 151 85 Södertälje / SE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/44] | Wahlström, Stig Christer Gunnar AstraZeneca Global Intellectual Property 151 85 Södertälje / SE | Application number, filing date | 07709325.0 | 06.02.2007 | [2008/44] | WO2007SE00109 | Priority number, date | SE20060000271 | 07.02.2006 Original published format: SE 0600271 | [2008/44] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007091949 | Date: | 16.08.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/33] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1984710 | Date: | 29.10.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.08.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/44] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 16.08.2007 | Classification | IPC: | G01J3/02, G01N21/25, G01N21/27 | [2008/44] | CPC: |
G01N21/274 (EP,US);
G01N21/4738 (EP,US);
G01N21/8507 (EP,US);
G01N2021/4709 (EP,US);
G01N2021/4742 (EP,US);
G01N2021/4769 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/44] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | EINRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN FÜR EIN SPEKTROMETRISCHES SYSTEM | [2008/44] | English: | DEVICE AND METHOD FOR SPECTROMETRIC SYSTEM | [2008/44] | French: | DISPOSITIF ET PROCEDE POUR UN SYSTEME SPRECTROMÉTRIQUE | [2008/44] | Entry into regional phase | 08.09.2008 | National basic fee paid | 08.09.2008 | Search fee paid | 08.09.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.09.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.08.2008 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.09.2008 | Examination requested [2008/44] | 01.09.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2011/09] | 13.10.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2011/09] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 28.02.2010 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]EP0296259 (PACIFIC SCIENTIFIC CO [US]); | [A]US2001035957 (CLERMONT TODD R [US], et al) |