EP1983874 - NOZZLE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 03.08.2012 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.08.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 05.09.2012 [2012/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Tanasescu, Ovidiu C. Ateljévägen 10 17279 Sundbyberg / SE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/44] | For all designated states Tanasescu, Ovidu, C. Ateljévägen 10 17279 Sundbyberg / SE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2008/44] | Representative(s) | Eriksson, Kjell Norrtelje Patentbyra AB P.O.B. 38 761 21 Norrtälje / SE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/44] | Eriksson, Kjell Norrtelje Patentbyra AB, P.O.B. 38 761 21 Norrtälje / SE | Application number, filing date | 07709342.5 | 13.02.2007 | [2008/44] | WO2007SE00126 | Priority number, date | SE20060000314 | 14.02.2006 Original published format: SE 0600314 | [2008/44] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007094716 | Date: | 23.08.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/34] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1983874 | Date: | 29.10.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.08.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/44] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 23.08.2007 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.11.2010 | Classification | IPC: | A47L9/04, A47L11/30 | [2008/44] | CPC: |
A47L9/04 (EP,SE,US);
A47L11/302 (SE);
A47L11/305 (EP,US);
A47L11/4036 (EP,US);
A47L11/4094 (EP,US);
A47L9/0472 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/44] | Title | German: | DÜSE | [2008/44] | English: | NOZZLE | [2008/44] | French: | BUSE | [2008/44] | Entry into regional phase | 13.08.2008 | National basic fee paid | 13.08.2008 | Search fee paid | 13.08.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.08.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.08.2008 | Examination requested [2008/44] | 27.12.2010 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 31.10.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.03.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2012/36] | 17.04.2012 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2012/36] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 31.10.2011 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.08.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.02.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.02.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 29.02.2012 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPS49126369U ; | [A]US4589161 (KOCHTE WERNER W [US], et al); | [AD]SE516943 (TANASESCU OVIDIU C [SE]) | International search | [A]SE516943 (TANASESCU OVIDIU C [SE]) | by applicant | SE516943 |