EP1977039 - SIZING COMPOSITION, METHOD FOR THE PRODUCTION OF SIZED PAPER OR PAPERBOARD AND SIZED PAPER OR PAPERBOARD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.05.2015 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.10.2017 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): BG, HU, TR | published on 15.11.2017 [2017/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Stora Enso AB 791 80 Falun / SE | [2008/41] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HAKANSSON, Philip Vinterv. 9 S-294 37 Sölvesborg / SE | [2008/41] | Application number, filing date | 07709431.6 | 24.01.2007 | [2008/41] | WO2007SE50038 | Priority number, date | US20060761952P | 25.01.2006 Original published format: US 761952 P | [2008/41] | Filing language | SV | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007086803 | Date: | 02.08.2007 | Language: | SV | [2007/31] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1977039 | Date: | 08.10.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/41] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1977039 | Date: | 25.06.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/26] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 02.08.2007 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.07.2012 | Classification | IPC: | D21H17/28, D21H17/29, D21H21/16, C08L3/00 | [2008/41] | CPC: |
D21H21/16 (EP,US);
C08L3/02 (EP,US);
C08L3/04 (EP,US);
C08L3/08 (EP,US);
D21H17/16 (EP,US);
D21H17/17 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/41] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | GRÖSSENEINSTELLUNGSVORRICHTUNG, VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON PAPIER ODER PAPPE MIT EINGESTELLTER GRÖSSE UND PAPIER ODER PAPPE MIT EINGESTELLTER GRÖSSE | [2008/41] | English: | SIZING COMPOSITION, METHOD FOR THE PRODUCTION OF SIZED PAPER OR PAPERBOARD AND SIZED PAPER OR PAPERBOARD | [2008/41] | French: | FORMULE DE COLLE, MÉTHODE DE PRODUCTION DE PAPIER OU DE CARTON COLLÉ ET PAPIER OU CARTON COLLÉ | [2008/41] | Entry into regional phase | 24.01.2007 | Translation filed | 16.06.2008 | National basic fee paid | 16.06.2008 | Search fee paid | 16.06.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.06.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.11.2007 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: SE | 16.06.2008 | Examination requested [2008/41] | 28.06.2013 | Observations by third parties | 14.01.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.05.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 13.05.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 13.05.2014 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 14.01.2014 | Opposition(s) | 26.03.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit [2015/23] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.06.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 01.02.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.01.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.01.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 31.01.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 24.01.2007 | BE | 25.06.2014 | BG | 25.06.2014 | CY | 25.06.2014 | CZ | 25.06.2014 | DK | 25.06.2014 | EE | 25.06.2014 | ES | 25.06.2014 | IT | 25.06.2014 | LT | 25.06.2014 | LV | 25.06.2014 | MC | 25.06.2014 | NL | 25.06.2014 | PL | 25.06.2014 | RO | 25.06.2014 | SE | 25.06.2014 | SI | 25.06.2014 | SK | 25.06.2014 | TR | 25.06.2014 | GR | 26.09.2014 | IS | 25.10.2014 | GB | 24.01.2015 | IE | 24.01.2015 | LU | 24.01.2015 | CH | 31.01.2015 | LI | 31.01.2015 | FR | 02.02.2015 | [2017/39] |
Former [2016/07] | BE | 25.06.2014 | |
CY | 25.06.2014 | ||
CZ | 25.06.2014 | ||
DK | 25.06.2014 | ||
EE | 25.06.2014 | ||
ES | 25.06.2014 | ||
IT | 25.06.2014 | ||
LT | 25.06.2014 | ||
LV | 25.06.2014 | ||
MC | 25.06.2014 | ||
NL | 25.06.2014 | ||
PL | 25.06.2014 | ||
RO | 25.06.2014 | ||
SE | 25.06.2014 | ||
SI | 25.06.2014 | ||
SK | 25.06.2014 | ||
GR | 26.09.2014 | ||
IS | 25.10.2014 | ||
GB | 24.01.2015 | ||
IE | 24.01.2015 | ||
LU | 24.01.2015 | ||
CH | 31.01.2015 | ||
LI | 31.01.2015 | ||
FR | 02.02.2015 | ||
Former [2015/50] | BE | 25.06.2014 | |
CY | 25.06.2014 | ||
CZ | 25.06.2014 | ||
DK | 25.06.2014 | ||
EE | 25.06.2014 | ||
ES | 25.06.2014 | ||
IT | 25.06.2014 | ||
LT | 25.06.2014 | ||
LV | 25.06.2014 | ||
MC | 25.06.2014 | ||
NL | 25.06.2014 | ||
PL | 25.06.2014 | ||
RO | 25.06.2014 | ||
SE | 25.06.2014 | ||
SI | 25.06.2014 | ||
SK | 25.06.2014 | ||
GR | 26.09.2014 | ||
IS | 25.10.2014 | ||
GB | 24.01.2015 | ||
LU | 24.01.2015 | ||
CH | 31.01.2015 | ||
LI | 31.01.2015 | ||
FR | 02.02.2015 | ||
Former [2015/48] | BE | 25.06.2014 | |
CY | 25.06.2014 | ||
CZ | 25.06.2014 | ||
DK | 25.06.2014 | ||
EE | 25.06.2014 | ||
ES | 25.06.2014 | ||
IT | 25.06.2014 | ||
LT | 25.06.2014 | ||
LV | 25.06.2014 | ||
MC | 25.06.2014 | ||
NL | 25.06.2014 | ||
PL | 25.06.2014 | ||
RO | 25.06.2014 | ||
SE | 25.06.2014 | ||
SK | 25.06.2014 | ||
GR | 26.09.2014 | ||
IS | 25.10.2014 | ||
GB | 24.01.2015 | ||
LU | 24.01.2015 | ||
CH | 31.01.2015 | ||
LI | 31.01.2015 | ||
Former [2015/47] | BE | 25.06.2014 | |
CY | 25.06.2014 | ||
CZ | 25.06.2014 | ||
DK | 25.06.2014 | ||
EE | 25.06.2014 | ||
ES | 25.06.2014 | ||
IT | 25.06.2014 | ||
LT | 25.06.2014 | ||
LV | 25.06.2014 | ||
MC | 25.06.2014 | ||
NL | 25.06.2014 | ||
PL | 25.06.2014 | ||
RO | 25.06.2014 | ||
SE | 25.06.2014 | ||
SK | 25.06.2014 | ||
GR | 26.09.2014 | ||
IS | 25.10.2014 | ||
LU | 24.01.2015 | ||
CH | 31.01.2015 | ||
LI | 31.01.2015 | ||
Former [2015/43] | BE | 25.06.2014 | |
CY | 25.06.2014 | ||
CZ | 25.06.2014 | ||
DK | 25.06.2014 | ||
EE | 25.06.2014 | ||
ES | 25.06.2014 | ||
IT | 25.06.2014 | ||
LT | 25.06.2014 | ||
LV | 25.06.2014 | ||
MC | 25.06.2014 | ||
NL | 25.06.2014 | ||
PL | 25.06.2014 | ||
RO | 25.06.2014 | ||
SE | 25.06.2014 | ||
SK | 25.06.2014 | ||
GR | 26.09.2014 | ||
IS | 25.10.2014 | ||
LU | 24.01.2015 | ||
Former [2015/39] | BE | 25.06.2014 | |
CY | 25.06.2014 | ||
CZ | 25.06.2014 | ||
DK | 25.06.2014 | ||
EE | 25.06.2014 | ||
ES | 25.06.2014 | ||
IT | 25.06.2014 | ||
LT | 25.06.2014 | ||
LV | 25.06.2014 | ||
NL | 25.06.2014 | ||
PL | 25.06.2014 | ||
RO | 25.06.2014 | ||
SE | 25.06.2014 | ||
SK | 25.06.2014 | ||
GR | 26.09.2014 | ||
IS | 25.10.2014 | ||
LU | 24.01.2015 | ||
Former [2015/30] | BE | 25.06.2014 | |
CY | 25.06.2014 | ||
CZ | 25.06.2014 | ||
DK | 25.06.2014 | ||
EE | 25.06.2014 | ||
ES | 25.06.2014 | ||
IT | 25.06.2014 | ||
LT | 25.06.2014 | ||
LV | 25.06.2014 | ||
NL | 25.06.2014 | ||
PL | 25.06.2014 | ||
RO | 25.06.2014 | ||
SE | 25.06.2014 | ||
SK | 25.06.2014 | ||
GR | 26.09.2014 | ||
IS | 25.10.2014 | ||
Former [2015/22] | CY | 25.06.2014 | |
CZ | 25.06.2014 | ||
DK | 25.06.2014 | ||
EE | 25.06.2014 | ||
ES | 25.06.2014 | ||
IT | 25.06.2014 | ||
LT | 25.06.2014 | ||
LV | 25.06.2014 | ||
NL | 25.06.2014 | ||
PL | 25.06.2014 | ||
RO | 25.06.2014 | ||
SE | 25.06.2014 | ||
SK | 25.06.2014 | ||
GR | 26.09.2014 | ||
IS | 25.10.2014 | ||
Former [2015/12] | CY | 25.06.2014 | |
CZ | 25.06.2014 | ||
EE | 25.06.2014 | ||
ES | 25.06.2014 | ||
LT | 25.06.2014 | ||
LV | 25.06.2014 | ||
NL | 25.06.2014 | ||
PL | 25.06.2014 | ||
RO | 25.06.2014 | ||
SE | 25.06.2014 | ||
SK | 25.06.2014 | ||
GR | 26.09.2014 | ||
IS | 25.10.2014 | ||
Former [2015/11] | CY | 25.06.2014 | |
CZ | 25.06.2014 | ||
EE | 25.06.2014 | ||
ES | 25.06.2014 | ||
LT | 25.06.2014 | ||
LV | 25.06.2014 | ||
PL | 25.06.2014 | ||
RO | 25.06.2014 | ||
SE | 25.06.2014 | ||
SK | 25.06.2014 | ||
GR | 26.09.2014 | ||
Former [2015/10] | CY | 25.06.2014 | |
CZ | 25.06.2014 | ||
EE | 25.06.2014 | ||
ES | 25.06.2014 | ||
LT | 25.06.2014 | ||
LV | 25.06.2014 | ||
SE | 25.06.2014 | ||
SK | 25.06.2014 | ||
GR | 26.09.2014 | ||
Former [2014/50] | CY | 25.06.2014 | |
LT | 25.06.2014 | ||
LV | 25.06.2014 | ||
SE | 25.06.2014 | ||
GR | 26.09.2014 | ||
Former [2014/48] | CY | 25.06.2014 | |
LT | 25.06.2014 | ||
Former [2014/47] | CY | 25.06.2014 | Documents cited: | Search | [ ] - No further relevant documents disclosed | International search | [A]US4964915 (BLIXT TONY [SE], et al); | [Y]EP0824161 (SUEDZUCKER AG [DE]); | [A]US6585859 (HAAKANSSON PHILIP [SE]); | [Y]SE520881 (STORA KOPPARBERGS BERGSLAGS AB [SE]); | [A]WO2004029097 (VALTION TEKNILLINEN [FI], et al); | [A]US2005277768 (BUWALDA PIETER L [NL], et al); | [Y] - KWEON M.R. ET AL., "Cationization of Waxy and Normal Corn and Barley Starches by an Aqueous Alcohol Process", STARCH/STORKE, (1997), vol. 49, no. 2, pages 59 - 66, XP003011307 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/star.19970490205 | other | EP0353212 | EP0824161 | US6596860 | SE520881 | US2003173045 | SE532570 | - KWEON M.R. ET AL, "Cationization of Waxy and Normal Corn and Barley Starches by an Aqueous Alcohol Process", STARKE - STARCH, (1997), vol. 49, no. 2, pages 59 - 66, XP003011307 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/star.19970490205 |