EP2122797 - TAPPING POWER FROM A HVDC TRANSMISSION SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.09.2021 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 25.09.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 25.05.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.06.2023 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 05.07.2023 [2023/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ABB Power Grids Switzerland AG Bruggerstrasse 72 5400 Baden / CH | [2020/30] |
Former [2017/15] | For all designated states ABB Schweiz AG Brown Boveri Strasse 6 5400 Baden / CH | ||
Former [2009/48] | For all designated states ABB Technology Ltd Affolternstrasse 44 8050 Zürich / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ASPLUND, Gunnar Wiboms väg 21 SE-171 60 Solna / SE | [2020/44] |
Former [2009/48] | 01 /
ASPLUND, Gunnar Vasagatan 15 S-771 32 Ludvika / SE | Representative(s) | AWA Sweden AB Box 45086 104 30 Stockholm / SE | [N/P] |
Former [2020/44] | AWA Sweden AB P.O. Box 45086 104 30 Stockholm / SE | ||
Former [2009/48] | Kock, Ina ABB AB Intellectual Property Ingenjör Bååths Gata 11 721 83 Västerås / SE | Application number, filing date | 07709434.0 | 29.01.2007 | [2009/48] | WO2007SE50041 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2008094086 | Date: | 07.08.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/32] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2122797 | Date: | 25.11.2009 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.08.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/48] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2122797 | Date: | 28.10.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/44] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 07.08.2008 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.04.2014 | Classification | IPC: | H02J3/36 | [2009/48] | CPC: |
H02J3/36 (EP,US);
Y02E60/60 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2020/44] |
Former [2009/48] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | STROMANZAPFUNG AUS EINEM HVDC-ÜBERTRAGUNGSSYSTEM | [2009/48] | English: | TAPPING POWER FROM A HVDC TRANSMISSION SYSTEM | [2009/48] | French: | PRÉLÈVEMENT DE COURANT À PARTIR D'UN SYSTÈME DE TRANSMISSION DE COURANT CONTINU À HAUTE TENSION | [2009/48] | Entry into regional phase | 07.10.2009 | National basic fee paid | 07.10.2009 | Search fee paid | 07.10.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.10.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.10.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: filing fee / search fee not paid in time | 07.10.2009 | Examination requested [2009/48] | 04.11.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 26.05.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.09.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 22.09.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 22.09.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 26.05.2020 | Opposition(s) | 29.07.2021 | No opposition filed within time limit [2021/40] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of the search fee | 07.10.2009 | Request for further processing filed | 07.10.2009 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of the filing fee | 07.10.2009 | Request for further processing filed | 07.10.2009 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of the examination fee | 07.10.2009 | Request for further processing filed | 07.10.2009 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of designation fees TR, SK, SI, SE, RO, PT, PL, NL, MC, LV, LU, LT, IT, IS, IE, HU, GR, GB, FR, FI, ES, EE, DK, DE, CZ, CY, CH, BG, BE, AT | 07.10.2009 | Request for further processing filed | 07.10.2009 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.10.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.01.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 11.01.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 10.01.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 30.01.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 23.01.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 27.01.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 20.01.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 26.01.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 22.01.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 23.01.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 29.08.2009 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   07.10.2009 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 29.01.2007 | AT | 28.10.2020 | CY | 28.10.2020 | CZ | 28.10.2020 | DK | 28.10.2020 | EE | 28.10.2020 | ES | 28.10.2020 | FI | 28.10.2020 | IT | 28.10.2020 | LT | 28.10.2020 | LV | 28.10.2020 | MC | 28.10.2020 | NL | 28.10.2020 | PL | 28.10.2020 | RO | 28.10.2020 | SE | 28.10.2020 | SI | 28.10.2020 | SK | 28.10.2020 | BG | 28.01.2021 | GR | 29.01.2021 | IE | 29.01.2021 | LU | 29.01.2021 | BE | 31.01.2021 | CH | 31.01.2021 | LI | 31.01.2021 | IS | 28.02.2021 | PT | 01.03.2021 | [2023/27] |
Former [2023/24] | AT | 28.10.2020 | |
CY | 28.10.2020 | ||
CZ | 28.10.2020 | ||
DK | 28.10.2020 | ||
EE | 28.10.2020 | ||
ES | 28.10.2020 | ||
FI | 28.10.2020 | ||
IT | 28.10.2020 | ||
LT | 28.10.2020 | ||
LV | 28.10.2020 | ||
MC | 28.10.2020 | ||
NL | 28.10.2020 | ||
PL | 28.10.2020 | ||
RO | 28.10.2020 | ||
SE | 28.10.2020 | ||
SI | 28.10.2020 | ||
SK | 28.10.2020 | ||
BG | 28.01.2021 | ||
GR | 29.01.2021 | ||
IE | 29.01.2021 | ||
LU | 29.01.2021 | ||
BE | 31.01.2021 | ||
CH | 31.01.2021 | ||
LI | 31.01.2021 | ||
IS | 28.02.2021 | ||
PT | 01.03.2021 | ||
Former [2022/34] | AT | 28.10.2020 | |
CZ | 28.10.2020 | ||
DK | 28.10.2020 | ||
EE | 28.10.2020 | ||
ES | 28.10.2020 | ||
FI | 28.10.2020 | ||
IT | 28.10.2020 | ||
LT | 28.10.2020 | ||
LV | 28.10.2020 | ||
MC | 28.10.2020 | ||
NL | 28.10.2020 | ||
PL | 28.10.2020 | ||
RO | 28.10.2020 | ||
SE | 28.10.2020 | ||
SI | 28.10.2020 | ||
SK | 28.10.2020 | ||
BG | 28.01.2021 | ||
GR | 29.01.2021 | ||
IE | 29.01.2021 | ||
LU | 29.01.2021 | ||
BE | 31.01.2021 | ||
CH | 31.01.2021 | ||
LI | 31.01.2021 | ||
IS | 28.02.2021 | ||
PT | 01.03.2021 | ||
Former [2022/23] | AT | 28.10.2020 | |
CZ | 28.10.2020 | ||
DK | 28.10.2020 | ||
EE | 28.10.2020 | ||
ES | 28.10.2020 | ||
FI | 28.10.2020 | ||
IT | 28.10.2020 | ||
LT | 28.10.2020 | ||
LV | 28.10.2020 | ||
MC | 28.10.2020 | ||
NL | 28.10.2020 | ||
PL | 28.10.2020 | ||
RO | 28.10.2020 | ||
SE | 28.10.2020 | ||
SI | 28.10.2020 | ||
SK | 28.10.2020 | ||
BG | 28.01.2021 | ||
GR | 29.01.2021 | ||
IE | 29.01.2021 | ||
LU | 29.01.2021 | ||
CH | 31.01.2021 | ||
LI | 31.01.2021 | ||
IS | 28.02.2021 | ||
PT | 01.03.2021 | ||
Former [2022/10] | AT | 28.10.2020 | |
CZ | 28.10.2020 | ||
DK | 28.10.2020 | ||
EE | 28.10.2020 | ||
ES | 28.10.2020 | ||
FI | 28.10.2020 | ||
IT | 28.10.2020 | ||
LT | 28.10.2020 | ||
LV | 28.10.2020 | ||
MC | 28.10.2020 | ||
NL | 28.10.2020 | ||
PL | 28.10.2020 | ||
RO | 28.10.2020 | ||
SE | 28.10.2020 | ||
SI | 28.10.2020 | ||
SK | 28.10.2020 | ||
BG | 28.01.2021 | ||
GR | 29.01.2021 | ||
IE | 29.01.2021 | ||
LU | 29.01.2021 | ||
CH | 31.01.2021 | ||
LI | 31.01.2021 | ||
PT | 01.03.2021 | ||
Former [2022/07] | AT | 28.10.2020 | |
CZ | 28.10.2020 | ||
DK | 28.10.2020 | ||
EE | 28.10.2020 | ||
ES | 28.10.2020 | ||
FI | 28.10.2020 | ||
IT | 28.10.2020 | ||
LT | 28.10.2020 | ||
LV | 28.10.2020 | ||
MC | 28.10.2020 | ||
NL | 28.10.2020 | ||
PL | 28.10.2020 | ||
RO | 28.10.2020 | ||
SE | 28.10.2020 | ||
SI | 28.10.2020 | ||
SK | 28.10.2020 | ||
BG | 28.01.2021 | ||
GR | 29.01.2021 | ||
IE | 29.01.2021 | ||
LU | 29.01.2021 | ||
CH | 31.01.2021 | ||
LI | 31.01.2021 | ||
IS | 28.02.2021 | ||
PT | 01.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/52] | AT | 28.10.2020 | |
CZ | 28.10.2020 | ||
DK | 28.10.2020 | ||
EE | 28.10.2020 | ||
ES | 28.10.2020 | ||
FI | 28.10.2020 | ||
IT | 28.10.2020 | ||
LT | 28.10.2020 | ||
LV | 28.10.2020 | ||
MC | 28.10.2020 | ||
NL | 28.10.2020 | ||
PL | 28.10.2020 | ||
RO | 28.10.2020 | ||
SE | 28.10.2020 | ||
SI | 28.10.2020 | ||
SK | 28.10.2020 | ||
BG | 28.01.2021 | ||
GR | 29.01.2021 | ||
LU | 29.01.2021 | ||
CH | 31.01.2021 | ||
LI | 31.01.2021 | ||
IS | 28.02.2021 | ||
PT | 01.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/50] | AT | 28.10.2020 | |
CZ | 28.10.2020 | ||
DK | 28.10.2020 | ||
EE | 28.10.2020 | ||
ES | 28.10.2020 | ||
FI | 28.10.2020 | ||
IT | 28.10.2020 | ||
LT | 28.10.2020 | ||
LV | 28.10.2020 | ||
MC | 28.10.2020 | ||
NL | 28.10.2020 | ||
PL | 28.10.2020 | ||
RO | 28.10.2020 | ||
SE | 28.10.2020 | ||
SI | 28.10.2020 | ||
SK | 28.10.2020 | ||
BG | 28.01.2021 | ||
GR | 29.01.2021 | ||
LU | 29.01.2021 | ||
IS | 28.02.2021 | ||
PT | 01.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/48] | AT | 28.10.2020 | |
CZ | 28.10.2020 | ||
DK | 28.10.2020 | ||
EE | 28.10.2020 | ||
ES | 28.10.2020 | ||
FI | 28.10.2020 | ||
IT | 28.10.2020 | ||
LT | 28.10.2020 | ||
LV | 28.10.2020 | ||
MC | 28.10.2020 | ||
NL | 28.10.2020 | ||
PL | 28.10.2020 | ||
RO | 28.10.2020 | ||
SE | 28.10.2020 | ||
SK | 28.10.2020 | ||
BG | 28.01.2021 | ||
GR | 29.01.2021 | ||
LU | 29.01.2021 | ||
IS | 28.02.2021 | ||
PT | 01.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/43] | AT | 28.10.2020 | |
CZ | 28.10.2020 | ||
DK | 28.10.2020 | ||
EE | 28.10.2020 | ||
ES | 28.10.2020 | ||
FI | 28.10.2020 | ||
LT | 28.10.2020 | ||
LV | 28.10.2020 | ||
MC | 28.10.2020 | ||
NL | 28.10.2020 | ||
PL | 28.10.2020 | ||
RO | 28.10.2020 | ||
SE | 28.10.2020 | ||
SK | 28.10.2020 | ||
BG | 28.01.2021 | ||
GR | 29.01.2021 | ||
LU | 29.01.2021 | ||
IS | 28.02.2021 | ||
PT | 01.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/40] | AT | 28.10.2020 | |
CZ | 28.10.2020 | ||
DK | 28.10.2020 | ||
EE | 28.10.2020 | ||
ES | 28.10.2020 | ||
FI | 28.10.2020 | ||
LT | 28.10.2020 | ||
LV | 28.10.2020 | ||
MC | 28.10.2020 | ||
NL | 28.10.2020 | ||
PL | 28.10.2020 | ||
RO | 28.10.2020 | ||
SE | 28.10.2020 | ||
SK | 28.10.2020 | ||
BG | 28.01.2021 | ||
GR | 29.01.2021 | ||
IS | 28.02.2021 | ||
PT | 01.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/37] | AT | 28.10.2020 | |
CZ | 28.10.2020 | ||
DK | 28.10.2020 | ||
EE | 28.10.2020 | ||
ES | 28.10.2020 | ||
FI | 28.10.2020 | ||
LT | 28.10.2020 | ||
LV | 28.10.2020 | ||
NL | 28.10.2020 | ||
PL | 28.10.2020 | ||
RO | 28.10.2020 | ||
SE | 28.10.2020 | ||
SK | 28.10.2020 | ||
BG | 28.01.2021 | ||
GR | 29.01.2021 | ||
IS | 28.02.2021 | ||
PT | 01.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/36] | AT | 28.10.2020 | |
CZ | 28.10.2020 | ||
EE | 28.10.2020 | ||
ES | 28.10.2020 | ||
FI | 28.10.2020 | ||
LT | 28.10.2020 | ||
LV | 28.10.2020 | ||
NL | 28.10.2020 | ||
PL | 28.10.2020 | ||
RO | 28.10.2020 | ||
SE | 28.10.2020 | ||
SK | 28.10.2020 | ||
BG | 28.01.2021 | ||
GR | 29.01.2021 | ||
IS | 28.02.2021 | ||
PT | 01.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/35] | AT | 28.10.2020 | |
CZ | 28.10.2020 | ||
ES | 28.10.2020 | ||
FI | 28.10.2020 | ||
LT | 28.10.2020 | ||
LV | 28.10.2020 | ||
NL | 28.10.2020 | ||
PL | 28.10.2020 | ||
RO | 28.10.2020 | ||
SE | 28.10.2020 | ||
SK | 28.10.2020 | ||
BG | 28.01.2021 | ||
GR | 29.01.2021 | ||
IS | 28.02.2021 | ||
PT | 01.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/34] | AT | 28.10.2020 | |
CZ | 28.10.2020 | ||
ES | 28.10.2020 | ||
FI | 28.10.2020 | ||
LT | 28.10.2020 | ||
LV | 28.10.2020 | ||
NL | 28.10.2020 | ||
PL | 28.10.2020 | ||
SE | 28.10.2020 | ||
BG | 28.01.2021 | ||
GR | 29.01.2021 | ||
IS | 28.02.2021 | ||
PT | 01.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/33] | AT | 28.10.2020 | |
ES | 28.10.2020 | ||
FI | 28.10.2020 | ||
LT | 28.10.2020 | ||
LV | 28.10.2020 | ||
NL | 28.10.2020 | ||
PL | 28.10.2020 | ||
SE | 28.10.2020 | ||
BG | 28.01.2021 | ||
GR | 29.01.2021 | ||
IS | 28.02.2021 | ||
PT | 01.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/25] | AT | 28.10.2020 | |
ES | 28.10.2020 | ||
FI | 28.10.2020 | ||
LV | 28.10.2020 | ||
NL | 28.10.2020 | ||
PL | 28.10.2020 | ||
SE | 28.10.2020 | ||
BG | 28.01.2021 | ||
GR | 29.01.2021 | ||
IS | 28.02.2021 | ||
PT | 01.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/24] | AT | 28.10.2020 | |
FI | 28.10.2020 | ||
LV | 28.10.2020 | ||
NL | 28.10.2020 | ||
SE | 28.10.2020 | ||
BG | 28.01.2021 | ||
GR | 29.01.2021 | ||
PT | 01.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/23] | FI | 28.10.2020 | |
LV | 28.10.2020 | ||
NL | 28.10.2020 | ||
SE | 28.10.2020 | ||
GR | 29.01.2021 | ||
PT | 01.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/21] | FI | 28.10.2020 | |
NL | 28.10.2020 | ||
PT | 01.03.2021 | ||
Former [2021/20] | FI | 28.10.2020 | Documents cited: | Search | [I]US3526780 (UHLMANN ERICH, et al) [I] 1-10 * column 2, line 66 - column 3, line 4 * * column 4, line 59 - column 5, line 14; figure 1 *; | [I]US4019115 (LIPS HANS-PETER) [I] 1-10 * column 1, line 5 - column 2, line 66; figures 1,2 *; | [I]DE10131226 (ABB RESEARCH LTD [CH]) [I] 1-10 * abstract * * column 4, paragraph 20 - column 6, paragraph 29 *; | [A]US2004218318 (BIJLENGA BO [SE], et al) [A] 1-10 * abstract * * page 1, paragraph 1 - paragraph 3 ** page 3, paragraph 24 - page 6, paragraph 50 *; | [A] - SCHETTLER F ET AL, "HVDC transmission systems using voltage sourced converters design and applications", POWER ENGINEERING SOCIETY SUMMER MEETING, 2000. IEEE 16 - 20 JULY 2000, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA,IEEE, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA, (20000716), vol. 2, doi:10.1109/PESS.2000.867439, ISBN 978-0-7803-6420-2, pages 715 - 720, XP010510729 [A] 1-10 * page 716, paragraph 2.1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/PESS.2000.867439 | [A] - YUKIO TOKIWA ET AL, "Novel Control Strategies for HVDC System with Self-Contained Converter", ELECTRICAL ENGINEERING IN JAPAN, (19930101), vol. 113, no. 5, doi:10.1002/eej.4391130501, pages 1 - 13, XP055001349 [A] 1-10 * page 2, paragraph 2.1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/eej.4391130501 | [A] - BAHRMAN M ET AL, "INTEGRATION OF SMALL TAPS INTO (EXISTING) HVDC LINKS", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON POWER DELIVERY, IEEE SERVICE CENTER, NEW YORK, NY, US, (19950701), vol. 10, no. 3, doi:10.1109/61.400959, ISSN 0885-8977, pages 1699 - 1706, XP000557367 [A] 1-10 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/61.400959 | International search | [A]US5187651 (EKSTROEM AAKE [SE]); | [A]WO9515605 (ASEA BROWN BOVERI [SE], et al); | [A] - CHETTY L. ET AL., "Parallel-Cascaded Tapping Station", 2004 INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON POWER SYSTEM TECHNOLOGY - POWERCON (IEEE CAT. NO. 04EX902), 2004, IEEE, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA, (2004), vol. 2, pages 1874 - 1879, XP008109852 |