EP1976852 - METHODS AND COMPOSITIONS FOR THE PRODUCTION OF HIGH CONCENTRATION ALLOXAZINE SOLUTIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 29.01.2016 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.01.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 02.03.2016 [2016/09] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Terumo BCT Biotechnologies, LLC 1215 Quail Street Lakewood CO 80215 / US | [2012/26] |
Former [2008/41] | For all designated states CaridianBCT Biotechnologies, LLC 1215 Quail Street Lakewood CO 80215 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HANSEN, Eric, T. 11691 Elizabeth Place Thornton, Colorado 80233 / US | 02 /
GOODRICH, Raymond, P. 2132 South Parfet Drive Lakewood, Colorado 80215 / US | [2008/41] | Representative(s) | Simons, Amanda Louise, et al J A Kemp 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | [2014/42] |
Former [2014/15] | Duckworth, Timothy John, et al J A Kemp 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | ||
Former [2008/41] | McCluskie, Gail Wilson J.A. Kemp & Co. 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 07709867.1 | 24.01.2007 | [2008/41] | WO2007US02054 | Priority number, date | US20060762684P | 27.01.2006 Original published format: US 762684 P | [2008/41] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007089538 | Date: | 09.08.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/32] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1976852 | Date: | 08.10.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.08.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/41] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 09.08.2007 | Classification | IPC: | C07D475/14, A61L2/10 | [2008/41] | CPC: |
C07D475/14 (EP,KR,US);
A61K31/525 (EP,KR,US);
A01N1/02 (EP,US);
A01N1/0226 (EP,US);
A01N43/90 (EP,US);
A61L2/00 (KR);
A61L2/10 (KR);
A61P31/00 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
| C-Set: |
A01N43/90, A01N2300/00 (US,EP);
A01N43/90, A01N25/02, A01N59/04 (EP,US) | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/41] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN ZUR HERSTELLUNG HOCHKONZENTRIERTER ALLOXAZIN-LÖSUNGEN | [2008/41] | English: | METHODS AND COMPOSITIONS FOR THE PRODUCTION OF HIGH CONCENTRATION ALLOXAZINE SOLUTIONS | [2008/41] | French: | MÉTHODES ET PRÉPARATIONS POUR LA PRODUCTION DE SOLUTIONS D'ALLOXAZINE DE CONCENTRATION ÉLEVÉE | [2008/41] | Entry into regional phase | 28.03.2008 | National basic fee paid | 28.03.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.03.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.03.2008 | Examination requested [2008/41] | 21.07.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 17.01.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.07.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 04.02.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.03.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 24.09.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2016/09] | 22.10.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2016/09] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 21.07.2010 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.01.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.01.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 06.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 06.01.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 08.01.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 08.01.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 08.01.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Rights in Rem or Legal Means of Execution | ID: | 01 | For: | AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LT LU LV MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR | Date: | 25.06.2009 | [2009/36] | Cited in | International search | [XA]WO0243485 (GAMBRO INC [US]) [X] 9,14 * Page 13, 1st paragraph. * * claims 1-22 * [A] 15-17,19,20; | [X]WO2004018471 (GAMBRO INC [US]) [X] 9-11,14 * Page 8, 3rd paragraph;; example 1; claims 1-23 *; | [X]WO2005014594 (DSM IP ASSETS BV [NL], et al) [X] 1-8,15,16,21,22* the whole document * | Examination | US2438880 | - Hans Selye, "THE ROLE PLAYED BY THE GASTROINTESTINAL TRACT IN THE ABSORPTION AND EXCRETION OF RIBOFLAVIN", J. Nutr., (19430101), vol. 25, pages 137 - 142, XP055129965 | by applicant | US2005112021 |