EP1981617 - AIR DRYER FOR A BRAKE SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.05.2016 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.08.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): BG | published on 19.09.2018 [2018/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states New York Air Brake Corporation 748 Starbuck Avenue Watertown New York 13601 / US | [2008/43] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WRIGHT, Eric 26156 County Rt. 16 Evans Mill, NY 13637 / US | 02 /
KOHAR, Richard 650 Sussex Boulevard Kingston, Ontario, K7M 5A8 / CA | [2008/43] | Representative(s) | Strehl Schübel-Hopf & Partner Maximilianstrasse 54 80538 München / DE | [2015/29] |
Former [2008/43] | Strehl Schübel-Hopf & Partner Maximilianstrasse 54 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 07710364.6 | 29.01.2007 | [2008/43] | WO2007US61225 | Priority number, date | US20060763913P | 01.02.2006 Original published format: US 763913 P | US20060829042P | 11.10.2006 Original published format: US 829042 P | [2008/43] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2007090085 | Date: | 09.08.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/32] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1981617 | Date: | 22.10.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.08.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/43] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1981617 | Date: | 15.07.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/29] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 27.12.2007 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.02.2010 | Classification | IPC: | B01D53/26, B60T17/00, B01D63/02 | [2015/10] | CPC: |
B60T17/004 (EP,US);
B01D53/268 (EP,US);
B01D63/02 (EP,US);
B01D2311/13 (EP,US);
B01D2313/18 (EP,US);
B01D2313/901 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2008/43] | B01D53/22, B60T7/20 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2015/29] |
Former [2008/43] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | LUFTTROCKNER FÜR BREMSSYSTEM | [2008/43] | English: | AIR DRYER FOR A BRAKE SYSTEM | [2008/43] | French: | DESSICCATEUR D'AIR POUR SYSTEME DE FREINAGE | [2008/43] | Entry into regional phase | 29.08.2008 | National basic fee paid | 29.08.2008 | Search fee paid | 29.08.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.08.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.08.2008 | Examination requested [2008/43] | 26.04.2010 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.03.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.07.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.01.2015 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 27.01.2015 | 27.01.2015 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 11.02.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.05.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | 03.06.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 03.06.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 20.03.2013 | Opposition(s) | 18.04.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/25] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.01.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.01.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.01.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.01.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.01.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 27.01.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 29.01.2007 | AT | 15.07.2015 | BE | 15.07.2015 | BG | 15.07.2015 | CY | 15.07.2015 | CZ | 15.07.2015 | DK | 15.07.2015 | EE | 15.07.2015 | ES | 15.07.2015 | FI | 15.07.2015 | IS | 15.07.2015 | IT | 15.07.2015 | LT | 15.07.2015 | LV | 15.07.2015 | MC | 15.07.2015 | NL | 15.07.2015 | PL | 15.07.2015 | RO | 15.07.2015 | SE | 15.07.2015 | SI | 15.07.2015 | SK | 15.07.2015 | TR | 15.07.2015 | GR | 16.10.2015 | PT | 16.11.2015 | IE | 29.01.2016 | LU | 29.01.2016 | CH | 31.01.2016 | LI | 31.01.2016 | [2018/38] |
Former [2018/33] | HU | 29.01.2007 | |
AT | 15.07.2015 | ||
BE | 15.07.2015 | ||
CY | 15.07.2015 | ||
CZ | 15.07.2015 | ||
DK | 15.07.2015 | ||
EE | 15.07.2015 | ||
ES | 15.07.2015 | ||
FI | 15.07.2015 | ||
IS | 15.07.2015 | ||
IT | 15.07.2015 | ||
LT | 15.07.2015 | ||
LV | 15.07.2015 | ||
MC | 15.07.2015 | ||
NL | 15.07.2015 | ||
PL | 15.07.2015 | ||
RO | 15.07.2015 | ||
SE | 15.07.2015 | ||
SI | 15.07.2015 | ||
SK | 15.07.2015 | ||
TR | 15.07.2015 | ||
GR | 16.10.2015 | ||
PT | 16.11.2015 | ||
IE | 29.01.2016 | ||
LU | 29.01.2016 | ||
CH | 31.01.2016 | ||
LI | 31.01.2016 | ||
Former [2018/28] | HU | 29.01.2007 | |
AT | 15.07.2015 | ||
BE | 15.07.2015 | ||
CY | 15.07.2015 | ||
CZ | 15.07.2015 | ||
DK | 15.07.2015 | ||
EE | 15.07.2015 | ||
ES | 15.07.2015 | ||
FI | 15.07.2015 | ||
IS | 15.07.2015 | ||
IT | 15.07.2015 | ||
LT | 15.07.2015 | ||
LV | 15.07.2015 | ||
MC | 15.07.2015 | ||
NL | 15.07.2015 | ||
PL | 15.07.2015 | ||
RO | 15.07.2015 | ||
SE | 15.07.2015 | ||
SI | 15.07.2015 | ||
SK | 15.07.2015 | ||
GR | 16.10.2015 | ||
PT | 16.11.2015 | ||
IE | 29.01.2016 | ||
LU | 29.01.2016 | ||
CH | 31.01.2016 | ||
LI | 31.01.2016 | ||
Former [2017/40] | AT | 15.07.2015 | |
BE | 15.07.2015 | ||
CZ | 15.07.2015 | ||
DK | 15.07.2015 | ||
EE | 15.07.2015 | ||
ES | 15.07.2015 | ||
FI | 15.07.2015 | ||
IS | 15.07.2015 | ||
IT | 15.07.2015 | ||
LT | 15.07.2015 | ||
LV | 15.07.2015 | ||
MC | 15.07.2015 | ||
NL | 15.07.2015 | ||
PL | 15.07.2015 | ||
RO | 15.07.2015 | ||
SE | 15.07.2015 | ||
SI | 15.07.2015 | ||
SK | 15.07.2015 | ||
GR | 16.10.2015 | ||
PT | 16.11.2015 | ||
IE | 29.01.2016 | ||
LU | 29.01.2016 | ||
CH | 31.01.2016 | ||
LI | 31.01.2016 | ||
Former [2017/07] | AT | 15.07.2015 | |
BE | 15.07.2015 | ||
CZ | 15.07.2015 | ||
DK | 15.07.2015 | ||
EE | 15.07.2015 | ||
ES | 15.07.2015 | ||
FI | 15.07.2015 | ||
IS | 15.07.2015 | ||
IT | 15.07.2015 | ||
LT | 15.07.2015 | ||
LV | 15.07.2015 | ||
MC | 15.07.2015 | ||
PL | 15.07.2015 | ||
RO | 15.07.2015 | ||
SE | 15.07.2015 | ||
SI | 15.07.2015 | ||
SK | 15.07.2015 | ||
GR | 16.10.2015 | ||
PT | 16.11.2015 | ||
IE | 29.01.2016 | ||
LU | 29.01.2016 | ||
CH | 31.01.2016 | ||
LI | 31.01.2016 | ||
Former [2017/03] | AT | 15.07.2015 | |
BE | 15.07.2015 | ||
CZ | 15.07.2015 | ||
DK | 15.07.2015 | ||
EE | 15.07.2015 | ||
ES | 15.07.2015 | ||
FI | 15.07.2015 | ||
IS | 15.07.2015 | ||
IT | 15.07.2015 | ||
LT | 15.07.2015 | ||
LV | 15.07.2015 | ||
MC | 15.07.2015 | ||
PL | 15.07.2015 | ||
RO | 15.07.2015 | ||
SE | 15.07.2015 | ||
SI | 15.07.2015 | ||
SK | 15.07.2015 | ||
GR | 16.10.2015 | ||
PT | 16.11.2015 | ||
LU | 29.01.2016 | ||
CH | 31.01.2016 | ||
LI | 31.01.2016 | ||
Former [2016/46] | AT | 15.07.2015 | |
CZ | 15.07.2015 | ||
DK | 15.07.2015 | ||
EE | 15.07.2015 | ||
ES | 15.07.2015 | ||
FI | 15.07.2015 | ||
IS | 15.07.2015 | ||
IT | 15.07.2015 | ||
LT | 15.07.2015 | ||
LV | 15.07.2015 | ||
MC | 15.07.2015 | ||
PL | 15.07.2015 | ||
RO | 15.07.2015 | ||
SE | 15.07.2015 | ||
SI | 15.07.2015 | ||
SK | 15.07.2015 | ||
GR | 16.10.2015 | ||
PT | 16.11.2015 | ||
LU | 29.01.2016 | ||
BE | 31.01.2016 | ||
CH | 31.01.2016 | ||
LI | 31.01.2016 | ||
Former [2016/42] | AT | 15.07.2015 | |
CZ | 15.07.2015 | ||
DK | 15.07.2015 | ||
EE | 15.07.2015 | ||
ES | 15.07.2015 | ||
FI | 15.07.2015 | ||
IS | 15.07.2015 | ||
IT | 15.07.2015 | ||
LT | 15.07.2015 | ||
LV | 15.07.2015 | ||
MC | 15.07.2015 | ||
PL | 15.07.2015 | ||
RO | 15.07.2015 | ||
SE | 15.07.2015 | ||
SI | 15.07.2015 | ||
SK | 15.07.2015 | ||
GR | 16.10.2015 | ||
PT | 16.11.2015 | ||
LU | 29.01.2016 | ||
BE | 31.01.2016 | ||
Former [2016/39] | AT | 15.07.2015 | |
CZ | 15.07.2015 | ||
DK | 15.07.2015 | ||
EE | 15.07.2015 | ||
ES | 15.07.2015 | ||
FI | 15.07.2015 | ||
IS | 15.07.2015 | ||
IT | 15.07.2015 | ||
LT | 15.07.2015 | ||
LV | 15.07.2015 | ||
PL | 15.07.2015 | ||
RO | 15.07.2015 | ||
SE | 15.07.2015 | ||
SI | 15.07.2015 | ||
SK | 15.07.2015 | ||
GR | 16.10.2015 | ||
PT | 16.11.2015 | ||
LU | 29.01.2016 | ||
BE | 31.01.2016 | ||
Former [2016/36] | AT | 15.07.2015 | |
CZ | 15.07.2015 | ||
DK | 15.07.2015 | ||
EE | 15.07.2015 | ||
ES | 15.07.2015 | ||
FI | 15.07.2015 | ||
IS | 15.07.2015 | ||
IT | 15.07.2015 | ||
LT | 15.07.2015 | ||
LV | 15.07.2015 | ||
PL | 15.07.2015 | ||
RO | 15.07.2015 | ||
SE | 15.07.2015 | ||
SI | 15.07.2015 | ||
SK | 15.07.2015 | ||
GR | 16.10.2015 | ||
PT | 16.11.2015 | ||
BE | 31.01.2016 | ||
Former [2016/31] | AT | 15.07.2015 | |
CZ | 15.07.2015 | ||
DK | 15.07.2015 | ||
EE | 15.07.2015 | ||
ES | 15.07.2015 | ||
FI | 15.07.2015 | ||
IS | 15.07.2015 | ||
IT | 15.07.2015 | ||
LT | 15.07.2015 | ||
LV | 15.07.2015 | ||
PL | 15.07.2015 | ||
RO | 15.07.2015 | ||
SE | 15.07.2015 | ||
SK | 15.07.2015 | ||
GR | 16.10.2015 | ||
PT | 16.11.2015 | ||
BE | 31.01.2016 | ||
Former [2016/24] | AT | 15.07.2015 | |
CZ | 15.07.2015 | ||
DK | 15.07.2015 | ||
EE | 15.07.2015 | ||
ES | 15.07.2015 | ||
FI | 15.07.2015 | ||
IT | 15.07.2015 | ||
LT | 15.07.2015 | ||
LV | 15.07.2015 | ||
PL | 15.07.2015 | ||
RO | 15.07.2015 | ||
SE | 15.07.2015 | ||
SK | 15.07.2015 | ||
GR | 16.10.2015 | ||
PT | 16.11.2015 | ||
BE | 31.01.2016 | ||
Former [2016/23] | AT | 15.07.2015 | |
CZ | 15.07.2015 | ||
DK | 15.07.2015 | ||
EE | 15.07.2015 | ||
ES | 15.07.2015 | ||
FI | 15.07.2015 | ||
IT | 15.07.2015 | ||
LT | 15.07.2015 | ||
LV | 15.07.2015 | ||
PL | 15.07.2015 | ||
RO | 15.07.2015 | ||
SE | 15.07.2015 | ||
SK | 15.07.2015 | ||
GR | 16.10.2015 | ||
PT | 16.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/22] | AT | 15.07.2015 | |
CZ | 15.07.2015 | ||
DK | 15.07.2015 | ||
EE | 15.07.2015 | ||
ES | 15.07.2015 | ||
FI | 15.07.2015 | ||
IT | 15.07.2015 | ||
LT | 15.07.2015 | ||
LV | 15.07.2015 | ||
PL | 15.07.2015 | ||
SE | 15.07.2015 | ||
GR | 16.10.2015 | ||
PT | 16.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/21] | AT | 15.07.2015 | |
DK | 15.07.2015 | ||
ES | 15.07.2015 | ||
FI | 15.07.2015 | ||
IT | 15.07.2015 | ||
LT | 15.07.2015 | ||
LV | 15.07.2015 | ||
PL | 15.07.2015 | ||
SE | 15.07.2015 | ||
GR | 16.10.2015 | ||
PT | 16.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/20] | AT | 15.07.2015 | |
DK | 15.07.2015 | ||
ES | 15.07.2015 | ||
FI | 15.07.2015 | ||
LT | 15.07.2015 | ||
LV | 15.07.2015 | ||
PL | 15.07.2015 | ||
SE | 15.07.2015 | ||
GR | 16.10.2015 | ||
PT | 16.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/11] | AT | 15.07.2015 | |
ES | 15.07.2015 | ||
FI | 15.07.2015 | ||
LT | 15.07.2015 | ||
LV | 15.07.2015 | ||
PL | 15.07.2015 | ||
SE | 15.07.2015 | ||
GR | 16.10.2015 | ||
PT | 16.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/10] | ES | 15.07.2015 | |
FI | 15.07.2015 | ||
LT | 15.07.2015 | ||
LV | 15.07.2015 | ||
PL | 15.07.2015 | ||
SE | 15.07.2015 | ||
GR | 16.10.2015 | ||
PT | 16.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/09] | FI | 15.07.2015 | |
LT | 15.07.2015 | ||
LV | 15.07.2015 | ||
GR | 16.10.2015 | ||
Former [2016/07] | LT | 15.07.2015 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US5411662 (NICOLAS JR PATRICK S [US], et al); | [XD]US5525143 (MORGAN WILLIAM H [US], et al) | International search | [X]US6128825 (CUNKELMAN BRIAN L [US]); | [Y]US6776820 (BIKSON BENJAMIN [US], et al) | Examination | US3735558 | by applicant | US5375620 | US5411662 | US5525143 | US6128825 | US6719825 |