EP1984549 - MACHINE FOR PRODUCING A KNITTED FABRIC FROM FIBROUS MATERIAL, IN PARTICULAR A CIRCULAR KNITTING MACHINE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.05.2013 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2015 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU, LU | published on 19.08.2015 [2015/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states König, Reinhard Albstrasse 2 76275 Ettlingen / DE | [2008/44] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KÖNIG, Reinhard Albstrasse 2 76275 Ettlingen / DE | 02 /
KÖNIG, Georg Albert-Schweitzer-Str 16 76337 Waldbronn / DE | [2012/06] |
Former [2008/50] | 01 /
KÖNIG, Reinhard Albstrasse 2 76275 Ettlingen / DE | ||
02 /
KÖNIG, Georg albert-Schweitzer-Str 16 76337 Waldbronn / DE | |||
Former [2008/44] | 01 /
KÖNIG, Reinhard Albstrasse 2 76275 Ettlingen / DE | ||
02 /
KÖNIG, Georg Neckarstrasse 56 76199 Karlsruhe / DE | Representative(s) | Möbus, Daniela, et al Kohler Schmid Möbus Patentanwälte Kaiserstrasse 85 72764 Reutlingen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/26] | Möbus, Daniela, et al Kohler Schmid Möbus Patentanwälte Kaiserstrasse 85 72764 Reutlingen / DE | ||
Former [2010/28] | Möbus, Daniela, et al Kohler Schmid Möbus Kaiserstrasse 85 72764 Reutingen / DE | ||
Former [2008/44] | Freiherr von Schorlemer, Reinfried Karthäuser Strasse 5A 34117 Kassel / DE | Application number, filing date | 07711190.4 | 13.02.2007 | [2008/44] | WO2007DE00286 | Priority number, date | DE20061006502 | 13.02.2006 Original published format: DE102006006502 | [2008/44] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2007093165 | Date: | 23.08.2007 | Language: | DE | [2007/34] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1984549 | Date: | 29.10.2008 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.08.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/44] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1984549 | Date: | 27.06.2012 | Language: | DE | [2012/26] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 01.11.2007 | Classification | IPC: | D04B9/14 | [2008/44] | CPC: |
D01H5/28 (EP,US);
D01H1/00 (EP,US);
D04B15/94 (EP,US);
D04B35/22 (EP);
D04B9/14 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/44] | Title | German: | MASCHINE ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINER MASCHENWARE AUS FASERMATERIAL, INSBESONDERE RUNDSTRICKMASCHINE | [2008/44] | English: | MACHINE FOR PRODUCING A KNITTED FABRIC FROM FIBROUS MATERIAL, IN PARTICULAR A CIRCULAR KNITTING MACHINE | [2008/44] | French: | MACHINE PERMETTANT DE FABRIQUER DES TISSUS MAILLÉS EN MATIÈRE FIBREUSE, EN PARTICULIER MÉTIER À TRICOTER CIRCULAIRE | [2008/44] | Entry into regional phase | 04.09.2008 | National basic fee paid | 04.09.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.09.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.09.2008 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.09.2008 | Examination requested [2008/44] | 10.01.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.05.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 05.05.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 10.01.2012 | Opposition(s) | 28.03.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/23] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.09.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.02.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.01.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Stay/Interruption | 26.02.2010 | Interruption of proceedings. Reason: representative has died | [2010/17] | 01.07.2010 | Resumption of proceedings | [2010/27] | 26.02.2010 | Interruption of proceedings. Reason: representative has died | [2010/27] | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 13.02.2007 | CY | 27.06.2012 | DK | 27.06.2012 | EE | 27.06.2012 | FI | 27.06.2012 | LT | 27.06.2012 | LV | 27.06.2012 | NL | 27.06.2012 | PL | 27.06.2012 | RO | 27.06.2012 | SE | 27.06.2012 | SI | 27.06.2012 | SK | 27.06.2012 | BG | 27.09.2012 | GR | 28.09.2012 | ES | 08.10.2012 | IS | 27.10.2012 | PT | 29.10.2012 | AT | 13.02.2013 | GB | 13.02.2013 | IE | 13.02.2013 | LU | 13.02.2013 | BE | 28.02.2013 | CH | 28.02.2013 | FR | 28.02.2013 | LI | 28.02.2013 | MC | 28.02.2013 | [2015/34] |
Former [2014/24] | CY | 27.06.2012 | |
DK | 27.06.2012 | ||
EE | 27.06.2012 | ||
FI | 27.06.2012 | ||
LT | 27.06.2012 | ||
LV | 27.06.2012 | ||
NL | 27.06.2012 | ||
PL | 27.06.2012 | ||
RO | 27.06.2012 | ||
SE | 27.06.2012 | ||
SI | 27.06.2012 | ||
SK | 27.06.2012 | ||
BG | 27.09.2012 | ||
GR | 28.09.2012 | ||
ES | 08.10.2012 | ||
IS | 27.10.2012 | ||
PT | 29.10.2012 | ||
AT | 13.02.2013 | ||
GB | 13.02.2013 | ||
IE | 13.02.2013 | ||
BE | 28.02.2013 | ||
CH | 28.02.2013 | ||
FR | 28.02.2013 | ||
LI | 28.02.2013 | ||
MC | 28.02.2013 | ||
Former [2014/09] | CY | 27.06.2012 | |
DK | 27.06.2012 | ||
EE | 27.06.2012 | ||
FI | 27.06.2012 | ||
LT | 27.06.2012 | ||
LV | 27.06.2012 | ||
NL | 27.06.2012 | ||
PL | 27.06.2012 | ||
RO | 27.06.2012 | ||
SE | 27.06.2012 | ||
SI | 27.06.2012 | ||
SK | 27.06.2012 | ||
BG | 27.09.2012 | ||
GR | 28.09.2012 | ||
ES | 08.10.2012 | ||
IS | 27.10.2012 | ||
PT | 29.10.2012 | ||
GB | 13.02.2013 | ||
IE | 13.02.2013 | ||
BE | 28.02.2013 | ||
CH | 28.02.2013 | ||
FR | 28.02.2013 | ||
LI | 28.02.2013 | ||
MC | 28.02.2013 | ||
Former [2014/07] | CY | 27.06.2012 | |
DK | 27.06.2012 | ||
EE | 27.06.2012 | ||
FI | 27.06.2012 | ||
LT | 27.06.2012 | ||
LV | 27.06.2012 | ||
NL | 27.06.2012 | ||
PL | 27.06.2012 | ||
RO | 27.06.2012 | ||
SE | 27.06.2012 | ||
SI | 27.06.2012 | ||
SK | 27.06.2012 | ||
BG | 27.09.2012 | ||
GR | 28.09.2012 | ||
ES | 08.10.2012 | ||
IS | 27.10.2012 | ||
PT | 29.10.2012 | ||
IE | 13.02.2013 | ||
BE | 28.02.2013 | ||
CH | 28.02.2013 | ||
FR | 28.02.2013 | ||
LI | 28.02.2013 | ||
MC | 28.02.2013 | ||
Former [2014/06] | CY | 27.06.2012 | |
DK | 27.06.2012 | ||
EE | 27.06.2012 | ||
FI | 27.06.2012 | ||
LT | 27.06.2012 | ||
LV | 27.06.2012 | ||
NL | 27.06.2012 | ||
PL | 27.06.2012 | ||
RO | 27.06.2012 | ||
SE | 27.06.2012 | ||
SI | 27.06.2012 | ||
SK | 27.06.2012 | ||
BG | 27.09.2012 | ||
GR | 28.09.2012 | ||
ES | 08.10.2012 | ||
IS | 27.10.2012 | ||
PT | 29.10.2012 | ||
BE | 28.02.2013 | ||
CH | 28.02.2013 | ||
LI | 28.02.2013 | ||
MC | 28.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/48] | CY | 27.06.2012 | |
DK | 27.06.2012 | ||
EE | 27.06.2012 | ||
FI | 27.06.2012 | ||
LT | 27.06.2012 | ||
LV | 27.06.2012 | ||
NL | 27.06.2012 | ||
PL | 27.06.2012 | ||
RO | 27.06.2012 | ||
SE | 27.06.2012 | ||
SI | 27.06.2012 | ||
SK | 27.06.2012 | ||
BG | 27.09.2012 | ||
GR | 28.09.2012 | ||
ES | 08.10.2012 | ||
IS | 27.10.2012 | ||
PT | 29.10.2012 | ||
CH | 28.02.2013 | ||
LI | 28.02.2013 | ||
MC | 28.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/46] | CY | 27.06.2012 | |
DK | 27.06.2012 | ||
EE | 27.06.2012 | ||
FI | 27.06.2012 | ||
LT | 27.06.2012 | ||
LV | 27.06.2012 | ||
NL | 27.06.2012 | ||
PL | 27.06.2012 | ||
RO | 27.06.2012 | ||
SE | 27.06.2012 | ||
SI | 27.06.2012 | ||
SK | 27.06.2012 | ||
BG | 27.09.2012 | ||
GR | 28.09.2012 | ||
ES | 08.10.2012 | ||
IS | 27.10.2012 | ||
PT | 29.10.2012 | ||
MC | 28.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/42] | CY | 27.06.2012 | |
DK | 27.06.2012 | ||
EE | 27.06.2012 | ||
FI | 27.06.2012 | ||
LT | 27.06.2012 | ||
LV | 27.06.2012 | ||
NL | 27.06.2012 | ||
PL | 27.06.2012 | ||
RO | 27.06.2012 | ||
SE | 27.06.2012 | ||
SI | 27.06.2012 | ||
SK | 27.06.2012 | ||
BG | 27.09.2012 | ||
GR | 28.09.2012 | ||
IS | 27.10.2012 | ||
PT | 29.10.2012 | ||
MC | 28.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/34] | CY | 27.06.2012 | |
DK | 27.06.2012 | ||
EE | 27.06.2012 | ||
FI | 27.06.2012 | ||
LT | 27.06.2012 | ||
LV | 27.06.2012 | ||
NL | 27.06.2012 | ||
PL | 27.06.2012 | ||
RO | 27.06.2012 | ||
SE | 27.06.2012 | ||
SI | 27.06.2012 | ||
SK | 27.06.2012 | ||
BG | 27.09.2012 | ||
GR | 28.09.2012 | ||
IS | 27.10.2012 | ||
PT | 29.10.2012 | ||
Former [2013/21] | CY | 27.06.2012 | |
DK | 27.06.2012 | ||
EE | 27.06.2012 | ||
FI | 27.06.2012 | ||
LT | 27.06.2012 | ||
LV | 27.06.2012 | ||
NL | 27.06.2012 | ||
PL | 27.06.2012 | ||
RO | 27.06.2012 | ||
SE | 27.06.2012 | ||
SI | 27.06.2012 | ||
SK | 27.06.2012 | ||
GR | 28.09.2012 | ||
IS | 27.10.2012 | ||
PT | 29.10.2012 | ||
Former [2013/15] | CY | 27.06.2012 | |
EE | 27.06.2012 | ||
FI | 27.06.2012 | ||
LT | 27.06.2012 | ||
LV | 27.06.2012 | ||
NL | 27.06.2012 | ||
PL | 27.06.2012 | ||
RO | 27.06.2012 | ||
SE | 27.06.2012 | ||
SI | 27.06.2012 | ||
SK | 27.06.2012 | ||
GR | 28.09.2012 | ||
IS | 27.10.2012 | ||
PT | 29.10.2012 | ||
Former [2013/13] | CY | 27.06.2012 | |
EE | 27.06.2012 | ||
FI | 27.06.2012 | ||
LT | 27.06.2012 | ||
LV | 27.06.2012 | ||
PL | 27.06.2012 | ||
RO | 27.06.2012 | ||
SE | 27.06.2012 | ||
SI | 27.06.2012 | ||
SK | 27.06.2012 | ||
GR | 28.09.2012 | ||
IS | 27.10.2012 | ||
PT | 29.10.2012 | ||
Former [2013/11] | CY | 27.06.2012 | |
EE | 27.06.2012 | ||
FI | 27.06.2012 | ||
LT | 27.06.2012 | ||
LV | 27.06.2012 | ||
PL | 27.06.2012 | ||
RO | 27.06.2012 | ||
SE | 27.06.2012 | ||
SI | 27.06.2012 | ||
SK | 27.06.2012 | ||
GR | 28.09.2012 | ||
IS | 27.10.2012 | ||
Former [2013/10] | CY | 27.06.2012 | |
EE | 27.06.2012 | ||
FI | 27.06.2012 | ||
LT | 27.06.2012 | ||
LV | 27.06.2012 | ||
RO | 27.06.2012 | ||
SE | 27.06.2012 | ||
SI | 27.06.2012 | ||
SK | 27.06.2012 | ||
GR | 28.09.2012 | ||
IS | 27.10.2012 | ||
Former [2013/09] | EE | 27.06.2012 | |
FI | 27.06.2012 | ||
LT | 27.06.2012 | ||
LV | 27.06.2012 | ||
SE | 27.06.2012 | ||
SI | 27.06.2012 | ||
GR | 28.09.2012 | ||
Former [2012/51] | FI | 27.06.2012 | |
LT | 27.06.2012 | ||
LV | 27.06.2012 | ||
SE | 27.06.2012 | ||
SI | 27.06.2012 | ||
GR | 28.09.2012 | ||
Former [2012/50] | FI | 27.06.2012 | |
LT | 27.06.2012 | ||
LV | 27.06.2012 | ||
SE | 27.06.2012 | ||
GR | 28.09.2012 | ||
Former [2012/48] | FI | 27.06.2012 | |
LT | 27.06.2012 | ||
SE | 27.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/47] | LT | 27.06.2012 | Cited in | International search | [A]DE2451900 (YORK HERBERT) [A] 1-3,5,6,8 * the whole document *; | [DA]WO2004079068 (KOENIG REINHARD [DE], et al) [DA] 1-3,6-9* page 12, line 10 - page 15, line 22; figures 6,11,12; claims 16,20 * |