EP1984094 - USE OF A FILTER ELEMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2008/44] | FILTER ELEMENT AND ARRANGEMENT | ||
[2009/49] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 29.04.2011 Database last updated on 10.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.10.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): ES | published on 13.11.2013 [2013/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Carl Freudenberg KG Höhnerweg 2-4 69469 Weinheim / DE | [2008/44] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PFEUFFER, Peter Von Draisstrasse 11 68775 Ketsch / DE | 02 /
KAFFENBERGER, Rainer Eberbach 8 64385 Reichelsheim / DE | [2008/44] | Application number, filing date | 07711430.4 | 02.02.2007 | [2008/44] | WO2007EP00905 | Priority number, date | DE20061007182 | 15.02.2006 Original published format: DE102006007182 | [2008/44] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007093291 | Date: | 23.08.2007 | Language: | DE | [2007/34] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1984094 | Date: | 29.10.2008 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.08.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/44] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1984094 | Date: | 23.06.2010 | Language: | DE | [2010/25] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 23.08.2007 | Classification | IPC: | B01D46/06, B01D46/52 | [2008/44] | CPC: |
B01D46/06 (EP,US);
B01D46/02 (EP,US);
B01D46/023 (EP,US);
B01D46/52 (EP,US);
B01D2275/20 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/44] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERWENDUNG EINES FILTERELEMENTS | [2009/49] | English: | USE OF A FILTER ELEMENT | [2009/49] | French: | UTILISATION D'UN ELEMENT FILTRANT | [2009/49] |
Former [2008/44] | FILTERELEMENT UND ANORDNUNG | ||
Former [2008/44] | FILTER ELEMENT AND ARRANGEMENT | ||
Former [2008/44] | ELEMENT FILTRANT ET AGENCEMENT | Entry into regional phase | 08.08.2008 | National basic fee paid | 08.08.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.08.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.08.2008 | Examination requested [2008/44] | 22.12.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 26.06.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.12.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.04.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 01.04.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 24.03.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/22] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.02.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.02.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 23.06.2010 | CZ | 23.06.2010 | DK | 23.06.2010 | EE | 23.06.2010 | FI | 23.06.2010 | HU | 23.06.2010 | IE | 23.06.2010 | IT | 23.06.2010 | LT | 23.06.2010 | LV | 23.06.2010 | NL | 23.06.2010 | PL | 23.06.2010 | RO | 23.06.2010 | SE | 23.06.2010 | SI | 23.06.2010 | SK | 23.06.2010 | TR | 23.06.2010 | BG | 23.09.2010 | GR | 24.09.2010 | ES | 04.10.2010 | IS | 23.10.2010 | PT | 25.10.2010 | GB | 02.02.2011 | LU | 02.02.2011 | BE | 28.02.2011 | CH | 28.02.2011 | FR | 28.02.2011 | LI | 28.02.2011 | MC | 28.02.2011 | [2013/46] |
Former [2013/45] | CY | 23.06.2010 | |
CZ | 23.06.2010 | ||
DK | 23.06.2010 | ||
EE | 23.06.2010 | ||
FI | 23.06.2010 | ||
HU | 23.06.2010 | ||
IE | 23.06.2010 | ||
IT | 23.06.2010 | ||
LT | 23.06.2010 | ||
LV | 23.06.2010 | ||
NL | 23.06.2010 | ||
PL | 23.06.2010 | ||
RO | 23.06.2010 | ||
SE | 23.06.2010 | ||
SI | 23.06.2010 | ||
SK | 23.06.2010 | ||
TR | 23.06.2010 | ||
BG | 23.09.2010 | ||
GR | 24.09.2010 | ||
IS | 23.10.2010 | ||
PT | 25.10.2010 | ||
GB | 02.02.2011 | ||
LU | 02.02.2011 | ||
BE | 28.02.2011 | ||
CH | 28.02.2011 | ||
FR | 28.02.2011 | ||
LI | 28.02.2011 | ||
MC | 28.02.2011 | ||
Former [2013/44] | CY | 23.06.2010 | |
CZ | 23.06.2010 | ||
DK | 23.06.2010 | ||
EE | 23.06.2010 | ||
FI | 23.06.2010 | ||
IE | 23.06.2010 | ||
IT | 23.06.2010 | ||
LT | 23.06.2010 | ||
LV | 23.06.2010 | ||
NL | 23.06.2010 | ||
PL | 23.06.2010 | ||
RO | 23.06.2010 | ||
SE | 23.06.2010 | ||
SI | 23.06.2010 | ||
SK | 23.06.2010 | ||
TR | 23.06.2010 | ||
BG | 23.09.2010 | ||
GR | 24.09.2010 | ||
IS | 23.10.2010 | ||
PT | 25.10.2010 | ||
GB | 02.02.2011 | ||
LU | 02.02.2011 | ||
BE | 28.02.2011 | ||
CH | 28.02.2011 | ||
FR | 28.02.2011 | ||
LI | 28.02.2011 | ||
MC | 28.02.2011 | ||
Former [2013/42] | CY | 23.06.2010 | |
CZ | 23.06.2010 | ||
DK | 23.06.2010 | ||
EE | 23.06.2010 | ||
FI | 23.06.2010 | ||
IE | 23.06.2010 | ||
IT | 23.06.2010 | ||
LT | 23.06.2010 | ||
LV | 23.06.2010 | ||
NL | 23.06.2010 | ||
PL | 23.06.2010 | ||
RO | 23.06.2010 | ||
SE | 23.06.2010 | ||
SI | 23.06.2010 | ||
SK | 23.06.2010 | ||
BG | 23.09.2010 | ||
GR | 24.09.2010 | ||
IS | 23.10.2010 | ||
PT | 25.10.2010 | ||
GB | 02.02.2011 | ||
LU | 02.02.2011 | ||
BE | 28.02.2011 | ||
CH | 28.02.2011 | ||
FR | 28.02.2011 | ||
LI | 28.02.2011 | ||
MC | 28.02.2011 | ||
Former [2013/25] | CY | 23.06.2010 | |
CZ | 23.06.2010 | ||
DK | 23.06.2010 | ||
EE | 23.06.2010 | ||
FI | 23.06.2010 | ||
IE | 23.06.2010 | ||
IT | 23.06.2010 | ||
LT | 23.06.2010 | ||
LV | 23.06.2010 | ||
NL | 23.06.2010 | ||
PL | 23.06.2010 | ||
RO | 23.06.2010 | ||
SE | 23.06.2010 | ||
SI | 23.06.2010 | ||
SK | 23.06.2010 | ||
GR | 24.09.2010 | ||
IS | 23.10.2010 | ||
PT | 25.10.2010 | ||
GB | 02.02.2011 | ||
LU | 02.02.2011 | ||
BE | 28.02.2011 | ||
CH | 28.02.2011 | ||
FR | 28.02.2011 | ||
LI | 28.02.2011 | ||
MC | 28.02.2011 | ||
Former [2012/11] | CY | 23.06.2010 | |
CZ | 23.06.2010 | ||
DK | 23.06.2010 | ||
EE | 23.06.2010 | ||
FI | 23.06.2010 | ||
IE | 23.06.2010 | ||
IT | 23.06.2010 | ||
LT | 23.06.2010 | ||
LV | 23.06.2010 | ||
NL | 23.06.2010 | ||
PL | 23.06.2010 | ||
RO | 23.06.2010 | ||
SE | 23.06.2010 | ||
SI | 23.06.2010 | ||
SK | 23.06.2010 | ||
GR | 24.09.2010 | ||
IS | 23.10.2010 | ||
PT | 25.10.2010 | ||
GB | 02.02.2011 | ||
BE | 28.02.2011 | ||
CH | 28.02.2011 | ||
FR | 28.02.2011 | ||
LI | 28.02.2011 | ||
MC | 28.02.2011 | ||
Former [2012/06] | CY | 23.06.2010 | |
CZ | 23.06.2010 | ||
DK | 23.06.2010 | ||
EE | 23.06.2010 | ||
FI | 23.06.2010 | ||
IE | 23.06.2010 | ||
IT | 23.06.2010 | ||
LT | 23.06.2010 | ||
LV | 23.06.2010 | ||
NL | 23.06.2010 | ||
PL | 23.06.2010 | ||
RO | 23.06.2010 | ||
SE | 23.06.2010 | ||
SI | 23.06.2010 | ||
SK | 23.06.2010 | ||
GR | 24.09.2010 | ||
IS | 23.10.2010 | ||
PT | 25.10.2010 | ||
BE | 28.02.2011 | ||
CH | 28.02.2011 | ||
FR | 28.02.2011 | ||
LI | 28.02.2011 | ||
MC | 28.02.2011 | ||
Former [2012/01] | CY | 23.06.2010 | |
CZ | 23.06.2010 | ||
DK | 23.06.2010 | ||
EE | 23.06.2010 | ||
FI | 23.06.2010 | ||
IE | 23.06.2010 | ||
IT | 23.06.2010 | ||
LT | 23.06.2010 | ||
LV | 23.06.2010 | ||
NL | 23.06.2010 | ||
PL | 23.06.2010 | ||
RO | 23.06.2010 | ||
SE | 23.06.2010 | ||
SI | 23.06.2010 | ||
SK | 23.06.2010 | ||
GR | 24.09.2010 | ||
IS | 23.10.2010 | ||
PT | 25.10.2010 | ||
BE | 28.02.2011 | ||
CH | 28.02.2011 | ||
LI | 28.02.2011 | ||
MC | 28.02.2011 | ||
Former [2011/48] | CY | 23.06.2010 | |
CZ | 23.06.2010 | ||
DK | 23.06.2010 | ||
EE | 23.06.2010 | ||
FI | 23.06.2010 | ||
IE | 23.06.2010 | ||
IT | 23.06.2010 | ||
LT | 23.06.2010 | ||
LV | 23.06.2010 | ||
NL | 23.06.2010 | ||
PL | 23.06.2010 | ||
RO | 23.06.2010 | ||
SE | 23.06.2010 | ||
SI | 23.06.2010 | ||
SK | 23.06.2010 | ||
GR | 24.09.2010 | ||
IS | 23.10.2010 | ||
PT | 25.10.2010 | ||
CH | 28.02.2011 | ||
LI | 28.02.2011 | ||
MC | 28.02.2011 | ||
Former [2011/45] | CY | 23.06.2010 | |
CZ | 23.06.2010 | ||
DK | 23.06.2010 | ||
EE | 23.06.2010 | ||
FI | 23.06.2010 | ||
IE | 23.06.2010 | ||
IT | 23.06.2010 | ||
LT | 23.06.2010 | ||
LV | 23.06.2010 | ||
NL | 23.06.2010 | ||
PL | 23.06.2010 | ||
RO | 23.06.2010 | ||
SE | 23.06.2010 | ||
SI | 23.06.2010 | ||
SK | 23.06.2010 | ||
GR | 24.09.2010 | ||
IS | 23.10.2010 | ||
PT | 25.10.2010 | ||
MC | 28.02.2011 | ||
Former [2011/25] | CY | 23.06.2010 | |
CZ | 23.06.2010 | ||
DK | 23.06.2010 | ||
EE | 23.06.2010 | ||
FI | 23.06.2010 | ||
IE | 23.06.2010 | ||
IT | 23.06.2010 | ||
LT | 23.06.2010 | ||
LV | 23.06.2010 | ||
NL | 23.06.2010 | ||
PL | 23.06.2010 | ||
RO | 23.06.2010 | ||
SE | 23.06.2010 | ||
SI | 23.06.2010 | ||
SK | 23.06.2010 | ||
GR | 24.09.2010 | ||
IS | 23.10.2010 | ||
PT | 25.10.2010 | Cited in | International search | [X]US3622446 (BURNHAM PAUL D) [X] 1,14,28 * abstract *; | [X]EP0250801 (ALLIED CORP [US]) [X] 1-4,6-9,11,12,14-17,23,24,26-28 * abstract * * column 2, line 1 - column 3, line 25 *; | [XY]US5230455 (PRICE FRANK C [GB]) [X] 1-6,8,9,11,13,28 * abstract * * column 7, line 4 - column 8, line 29 * [Y] 10,14-19,23,26,27; | [Y]DE19604577 (FREUDENBERG CARL FA [DE]) [Y] 10,14-19,23,26,27 * column 3, lines 2-9 * * column 3, line 56 - column 4, line 32; figures 1-4 *; | [A]DE10016182 (FREUDENBERG CARL FA [DE]) [A] 4,28 * abstract ** paragraphs [0002] , [0003] *; | [X]WO2005051518 (MADISON FILTER 981 LTD [GB], et al) [X] 1,14,28 * abstract * |