EP1998930 - POSITIONING DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.03.2011 Database last updated on 27.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.10.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 06.11.2013 [2013/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ABB AG Kallstadter Strasse 1 68309 Mannheim / DE | [2008/50] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KOCK, Sönke Asgatan 8c S-724 63 Västeras / SE | 02 /
SOETEBIER, Sven Vorderer Rindweg 23 68526 Ladenburg / DE | 03 /
WALDI, Wolfgang Ortsstr. 20 69226 Nussloch-Maisbach / DE | [2008/50] | Representative(s) | Partner, Lothar ABB AG GF-IP/PV1 Wallstadter Strasse 59 68526 Ladenburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/50] | Partner, Lothar ABB AG GF-IP/PV1 Wallstadter Strasse 59 68526 Ladenburg / DE | Application number, filing date | 07711799.2 | 06.03.2007 | [2008/50] | WO2007EP01890 | Priority number, date | DE20061011823 | 13.03.2006 Original published format: DE102006011823 | [2008/50] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007104446 | Date: | 20.09.2007 | Language: | DE | [2007/38] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1998930 | Date: | 10.12.2008 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.09.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/50] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1998930 | Date: | 12.05.2010 | Language: | DE | [2010/19] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 20.09.2007 | Classification | IPC: | B23Q1/54, B25J17/02 | [2008/50] | CPC: |
B23Q1/5462 (EP,US);
B23Q1/54 (KR);
B25J17/02 (KR);
B25J17/0216 (EP,US);
Y10T74/20317 (EP,US);
Y10T74/20329 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/50] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | POSITIONIEREINRICHTUNG | [2008/50] | English: | POSITIONING DEVICE | [2008/50] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE POSITIONNEMENT | [2008/50] | Entry into regional phase | 20.08.2008 | National basic fee paid | 20.08.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.08.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.08.2008 | Examination requested [2008/50] | 30.03.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.07.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.11.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.02.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 08.02.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 15.02.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CZ | 12.05.2010 | DK | 12.05.2010 | EE | 12.05.2010 | FI | 12.05.2010 | HU | 12.05.2010 | IE | 12.05.2010 | LT | 12.05.2010 | LV | 12.05.2010 | MT | 12.05.2010 | NL | 12.05.2010 | PL | 12.05.2010 | RO | 12.05.2010 | SE | 12.05.2010 | SI | 12.05.2010 | SK | 12.05.2010 | TR | 12.05.2010 | CY | 02.06.2010 | BG | 12.08.2010 | GR | 13.08.2010 | IS | 12.09.2010 | PT | 13.09.2010 | [2013/45] |
Former [2013/44] | CZ | 12.05.2010 | |
DK | 12.05.2010 | ||
EE | 12.05.2010 | ||
FI | 12.05.2010 | ||
IE | 12.05.2010 | ||
LT | 12.05.2010 | ||
LV | 12.05.2010 | ||
MT | 12.05.2010 | ||
NL | 12.05.2010 | ||
PL | 12.05.2010 | ||
RO | 12.05.2010 | ||
SE | 12.05.2010 | ||
SI | 12.05.2010 | ||
SK | 12.05.2010 | ||
TR | 12.05.2010 | ||
CY | 02.06.2010 | ||
BG | 12.08.2010 | ||
GR | 13.08.2010 | ||
IS | 12.09.2010 | ||
PT | 13.09.2010 | ||
Former [2013/42] | CZ | 12.05.2010 | |
DK | 12.05.2010 | ||
EE | 12.05.2010 | ||
FI | 12.05.2010 | ||
IE | 12.05.2010 | ||
LT | 12.05.2010 | ||
LV | 12.05.2010 | ||
MT | 12.05.2010 | ||
NL | 12.05.2010 | ||
PL | 12.05.2010 | ||
RO | 12.05.2010 | ||
SE | 12.05.2010 | ||
SI | 12.05.2010 | ||
SK | 12.05.2010 | ||
CY | 02.06.2010 | ||
BG | 12.08.2010 | ||
GR | 13.08.2010 | ||
IS | 12.09.2010 | ||
PT | 13.09.2010 | ||
Former [2012/05] | CZ | 12.05.2010 | |
DK | 12.05.2010 | ||
EE | 12.05.2010 | ||
FI | 12.05.2010 | ||
IE | 12.05.2010 | ||
LT | 12.05.2010 | ||
LV | 12.05.2010 | ||
MT | 12.05.2010 | ||
NL | 12.05.2010 | ||
PL | 12.05.2010 | ||
RO | 12.05.2010 | ||
SE | 12.05.2010 | ||
SI | 12.05.2010 | ||
SK | 12.05.2010 | ||
CY | 02.06.2010 | ||
GR | 13.08.2010 | ||
IS | 12.09.2010 | ||
PT | 13.09.2010 | ||
Former [2011/25] | CZ | 12.05.2010 | |
DK | 12.05.2010 | ||
EE | 12.05.2010 | ||
FI | 12.05.2010 | ||
IE | 12.05.2010 | ||
LT | 12.05.2010 | ||
LV | 12.05.2010 | ||
NL | 12.05.2010 | ||
PL | 12.05.2010 | ||
RO | 12.05.2010 | ||
SE | 12.05.2010 | ||
SI | 12.05.2010 | ||
SK | 12.05.2010 | ||
CY | 02.06.2010 | ||
GR | 13.08.2010 | ||
IS | 12.09.2010 | ||
PT | 13.09.2010 | ||
Former [2010/45] | NL | 12.05.2010 | Cited in | International search | [A]US5656905 (TSAI LUNG-WEN [US]) [A] 1-13* abstract *; | [XA]US6041500 (TERPSTRA PAUL D [US]) [X] 1-6,8,10,12,13 * column 5, line 12 - column 6, line 5; figures 1-4; claims 1-12 * [A] 7,9,11; | [A]WO0185402 (ALBERTA RES COUNCIL [CA]) [A] 1-13 * page 5, line 18 - page 8, line 28; figures 1,2 *; | [XA]US6425177 (AKEEL HADI A [US]) [X] 1,3-13 * column 8, line 13 - column 13, line 38; figures 5-11 * [A] 2 |