EP1999840 - IMPROVEMENT IN THE OUTER FRAME OF AN ELECTRIC MOTOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 31.01.2014 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 31.01.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 05.03.2014 [2014/10] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nidec Sole Motor Corporation S.r.l. Via Consorziale, 13 33170 Pordenone / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2010/32] | For all designated states Nidec Sole Motor Corporation SRL Via Consorziale 13 33170 Pordenone / IT | ||
Former [2008/50] | For all designated states Appliances Components Companies S.p.A. Via Consorziale 13 33170 Pordenone / IT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BONACINA, Sergio Via delle Bazzone 3 22043 Galbiate (Lecco) / IT | 02 /
TONUS, Elvio Via Cansiglio 6 33077 Sacile (Pordenone) / IT | [2008/50] | Representative(s) | Gonella, Mario, et al Propria S.r.l. Via della Colonna, 35 33170 Pordenone / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2008/50] | Gonella, Mario, et al Propria S.r.l. P.O. Box 365 Via della Colonna, 35 33170 Pordenone / IT | Application number, filing date | 07712466.7 | 07.03.2007 | [2008/50] | WO2007EP52144 | Priority number, date | IT2006PN00011U | 30.03.2006 Original published format: IT PN20060011 U | [2008/50] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007113071 | Date: | 11.10.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/41] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1999840 | Date: | 10.12.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.10.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/50] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 11.10.2007 | Classification | IPC: | H02K5/26 | [2008/50] | CPC: |
H02K5/26 (EP);
D06F37/206 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/50] | Title | German: | VERBESSERUNG IN DEM ÄUSSEREN RAHMEN EINES ELEKTROMOTORS | [2008/50] | English: | IMPROVEMENT IN THE OUTER FRAME OF AN ELECTRIC MOTOR | [2008/50] | French: | AMELIORATION APPORTEE A LA CARCASSE EXTERIEURE D'UN MOTEUR ELECTRIQUE | [2008/50] | Entry into regional phase | 25.07.2008 | National basic fee paid | 25.07.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.07.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.07.2008 | Examination requested [2008/50] | 02.02.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.05.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.10.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2014/10] | 29.10.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2014/10] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 02.02.2009 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 03.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 01.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2013 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]US5281878 (SCHAEFFER GEORGE L [US]) [X] 1-3,6 * page -, column 4, line 6 - column 6, line 43 *; | [X]US4506179 (CHERNOFF EDWARD A [US] ET AL) [X] 1-6 * column 2, line 37 - line 47; figures 4,9,10 * * column 3, line 26 - line 33 *; | [X]US4174821 (LEVINE FRED [US]) [X] 1-5 * figures 1,2,5,7,9,11 *; | [X]US4076196 (LEVINE FRED) [X] 1-5 * figures 1,6,9,10 *; | [X]GB2190251 (ZANUSSI ELETTROMECC ZANUSSI ELETTROMECC [IT]; SOLE SPA [IT]) [X] 1-5 * column 1, line 97 - column 2, line 35; figure - * |