EP1986274 - CONNECTION BLOCK FOR ELECTRICAL CONDUCTORS AND HAND TOOL FOR FOR DEFORMING THE TERMINAL POINTS OF ELECTRICAL CABLES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 08.01.2016 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.01.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 10.02.2016 [2016/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GARCÍA-MAURIÑO DELAS, Fernando C. Casas I Amigó 28 08193 Bellaterra Barcelona / ES | [2008/44] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2008/44] | Representative(s) | ZBM Patents - Zea, Barlocci & Markvardsen Rambla Catalunya, 123 08008 Barcelona / ES | [N/P] |
Former [2010/12] | ZBM Patents Zea, Barlocci & Markvardsen Plaza Catalunya, 1 08002 Barcelona / ES | ||
Former [2008/44] | Barlocci, Anna ZBM Patents Zea, Barlocci & Markvardsen C/ Balmes, 114 - 4º 08008 Barcelona / ES | Application number, filing date | 07712572.2 | 08.02.2007 | [2008/44] | WO2007ES70029 | Priority number, date | ES20060000306 | 10.02.2006 Original published format: ES 200600306 | ES20060002080 | 01.08.2006 Original published format: ES 200602080 | [2008/44] | Filing language | ES | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007090921 | Date: | 16.08.2007 | Language: | ES | [2007/33] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1986274 | Date: | 29.10.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/44] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | ES | 16.08.2007 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.10.2010 | Classification | IPC: | H01R9/26, H01R4/20, H01R4/38, H01R43/042, H01R4/42, H01R13/422, H01R13/426 | [2010/48] | CPC: |
H01R4/363 (EP);
H01R13/422 (EP);
H01R13/426 (EP);
H01R4/20 (EP);
H01R4/38 (EP);
H01R43/042 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2008/44] | H01R9/26, H01R4/20, H01R4/38, H01R43/042 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/44] | Title | German: | VERBINDUNGSBLOCK FÜR ELEKTRISCHE LEITER UND HANDWERKZEUG ZUM DEFORMIEREN DER ANSCHLUSSPUNKTE ELEKTRISCHER KABEL | [2008/44] | English: | CONNECTION BLOCK FOR ELECTRICAL CONDUCTORS AND HAND TOOL FOR FOR DEFORMING THE TERMINAL POINTS OF ELECTRICAL CABLES | [2008/44] | French: | BLOC DE CONNEXION POUR CONDUCTEURS ÉLECTRIQUES ET OUTIL MANUEL POUR LA DÉFORMATION DE POINTES D'EXTRÉMITÉ DE CÂBLES ÉLECTRIQUES | [2008/44] | Entry into regional phase | 21.08.2008 | Translation filed | 10.09.2008 | National basic fee paid | 10.09.2008 | Search fee paid | 10.09.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.09.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.09.2008 | Examination requested [2008/44] | 20.04.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.09.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2016/06] | 29.09.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2016/06] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 01.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.02.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.02.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.02.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 28.02.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 28.02.2015 | 09   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]GB2369254 (ENTRELEC SA [FR]) [Y] 1-9 * page 9, paragraph 2; figures 1-3 * * claims 1-3 *; | [Y]GB1247790 (GEORG SCHLEGEL ELEKTROTECHNISC [DE]; GEORG SCHLEGEL [DE]) [Y] 1-9 * figure 2; claim 1 *; | [Y]US2004157503 (FUJII MASAYASU [JP]) [Y] 2 * paragraph [0035]; figure 1 *; | [Y]US5775957 (FINK RANDY LYNN [US] ET AL) [Y] 3,4 * column 2, line 53 - column 3, line 8; figures 2,4 *; | [A]EP1096606 (PATRA PATENT TREUHAND [DE]) [A] 1 * abstract * | International search | [A]DE2845532 (WEIDMUELLER KG C); | [A]DE4102581 (SIEMENS AG [DE]); | [A]ES2039892T ; | [A]DE4409612 (LEGRAND SA [FR], et al); | [A]ES2105562T (AEROSPATIALE); | [A]EP0820117 (SYLEA SA [FR]); | [A]EP1383211 (SOURIAU [FR]) |