EP1989678 - IMAGE SIGNAL PROCESSING APPARATUS AND VIRTUAL REALITY CREATING SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 16.02.2018 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 14.05.2017 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 20.01.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.02.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 21.03.2018 [2018/12] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Panasonic Corporation 1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi Osaka 571-8501 / JP | [2012/11] |
Former [2009/08] | For all designated states Panasonic Electric Works Co., Ltd. 1048 Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi Osaka / JP | ||
Former [2008/46] | For all designated states MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC WORKS, LTD. 1048, Oaza-Kadoma Kadoma-shi, Osaka-fu 571-8686 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
YAMAMOTO, Atsuyuki c/o Matsushita Electric Works, Ltd 1048, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi Osaka / JP | 02 /
KASHIWAGI, Masanori c/o Matsushita Electric Works, Ltd 1048, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi Osaka / JP | [2008/46] | Representative(s) | Appelt, Christian W. Boehmert & Boehmert Anwaltspartnerschaft mbB Pettenkoferstrasse 22 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/46] | Appelt, Christian W. Forrester & Boehmert Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22 80336 München / DE | ||
Former [2008/44] | Appelt, Christian W. FORRESTER & BOEHMERT Anwaltssozietät Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 07713484.9 | 20.02.2007 | [2008/46] | WO2007JP00102 | Priority number, date | JP20060043093 | 20.02.2006 Original published format: JP 2006043093 | JP20060257932 | 22.09.2006 Original published format: JP 2006257932 | [2008/46] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2007097118 | Date: | 30.08.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/35] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1989678 | Date: | 12.11.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.08.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/46] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 07.08.2008 | Classification | IPC: | G06T5/00 | [2008/46] | CPC: |
G06T3/153 (EP,US);
G06T15/00 (KR);
G06T5/80 (EP,US);
H04N5/10 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/46] | Title | German: | BILDSIGNALVERARBEITUNGSVORRICHTUNG UND SYSTEM ZUR ERZEUGUNG EINER VIRTUELLEN REALITÄT | [2017/21] | English: | IMAGE SIGNAL PROCESSING APPARATUS AND VIRTUAL REALITY CREATING SYSTEM | [2008/46] | French: | APPAREIL DE TRAITEMENT DES SIGNAUX D'IMAGE ET SYSTÈME DE CRÉATION DE RÉALITÉ VIRTUELLE | [2008/46] |
Former [2008/46] | BILDSIGNALVERARBEITUNGSGERÄT UND SYSTEM ZUR ERZEUGUNG VIRTUELLER REALITÄTEN | Entry into regional phase | 05.08.2008 | National basic fee paid | 05.08.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.08.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.08.2008 | Examination requested [2008/46] | 01.12.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 04.06.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.03.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.06.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.09.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.01.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.05.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.09.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2018/12] | 02.11.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2018/12] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 01.12.2008 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.02.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.02.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.02.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 15.02.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 12.02.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 20.02.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 23.02.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 22.02.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 17.02.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]JP2000310826 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC WORKS LTD) [A] 1-13* abstract *; | [X]US6462769 (TROWBRIDGE SCOTT [US], et al) [X] 1-6,11-13 * the whole document *; | [A]JP2003018503 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC WORKS LTD) [A] 1-13 * abstract *; | [X] - SHIBANO N ET AL, "CyberDome: PC Clustered Hemi Spherical Immersive Projection Display", INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON ARTIFICIAL REALITY AND TELE-EXISTENCE, XX, XX, (20031205), XP002437177 [X] 1-13 * the whole document * | [X] - RASKAR R ET AL, "Multi-projector displays using camera-based registration", VISUALIZATION '99. PROCEEDINGS SAN FRANCISCO, CA, USA 24-29 OCT. 1999, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA,IEEE, US, (19990101), ISBN 978-0-7803-5897-3, pages 161 - 522, XP031172599 [X] 1-13 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/VISUAL.1999.809883 | [X] - SHIBANO N. ET AL, "A New System for Interactive VR Applications Using a Compact Hemi Spherical IPD (CyberDome)", PROC. VIRTUAL REALITY INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE (VRIC), (200405), pages 101 - 107, URL: http://www.lab.ime.cmc.osaka-u.ac.jp/paper/datas/2004/05/Shibano_0080/Shibano_200405_paper.pdf, (20080529), XP002482313 [X] 1-13 * the whole document * | [X] - SURATI R J, Scalable Self-Calibrating Display Technology for Seamless Large-Scale Displays, THESIS AT THE MASSACHUSETTS INSTITUTE OF TECHNOLOGY, XX, XX, PAGE(S) 1 - 67, (19990124), XP002275230 [X] 1-13 * the whole document * | Examination | US4714428 |