EP1985364 - METHANOL SYNTHESIS CATALYST, METHOD FOR PRODUCING SUCH CATALYST AND METHOD FOR PRODUCING METHANOL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 25.01.2013 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.01.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 27.02.2013 [2013/09] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nippon Steel Engineering Co., Ltd 6-3, Otemachi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8071 / JP | [2008/44] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FUJIMOTO, Kaoru 1-21-201, Hibikino, Wakamatsu-ku Kitakyushu-shi, Fukuoka 808-0135 / JP | 02 /
FUJIMOTO, Kenichiro c/o NIPPON STEEL CORP., Tech. Devel. Bureau 20-1, Shintomi Futtsu-shi, Chiba 293-8511 / JP | 03 /
YAMANE, Noriyuki c/o NIPPON STEEL CORP., Tech. Devel. Bureau 20-1, Shintomi Futtsu-shi, Chiba 293-8511 / JP | [2008/44] | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/44] | Vossius & Partner Siebertstrasse 4 81675 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 07714397.2 | 16.02.2007 | [2008/44] | WO2007JP52867 | Priority number, date | JP20060041618 | 17.02.2006 Original published format: JP 2006041618 | JP20070022125 | 31.01.2007 Original published format: JP 2007022125 | [2008/44] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007094461 | Date: | 23.08.2007 | Language: | JA | [2007/34] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1985364 | Date: | 29.10.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/44] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 23.08.2007 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.06.2009 | Classification | IPC: | B01J31/28, B01J37/03, C07C29/149, C07C31/04, C07B61/00, C07C27/22, C07C67/36, C07C69/06 | [2008/44] | CPC: |
C07C29/149 (EP,KR,US);
B01J31/28 (KR);
B01J23/8946 (EP,US);
B01J31/04 (EP,US);
B01J35/19 (EP,US);
B01J37/03 (KR);
C07C31/04 (KR);
C07C67/36 (EP,US);
B01J2231/349 (EP,US);
B01J2231/641 (EP,US);
B01J2231/643 (EP,US);
B01J2531/10 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
C07C29/149, C07C31/04 (US,EP);
C07C67/36, C07C69/06 (EP,US) | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/44] | Title | German: | METHANOLSYNTHESEKATALYSATOR, VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINES DERARTIGEN KATALYSATORS UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON METHANOL | [2008/44] | English: | METHANOL SYNTHESIS CATALYST, METHOD FOR PRODUCING SUCH CATALYST AND METHOD FOR PRODUCING METHANOL | [2008/44] | French: | CATALYSEUR POUR LA SYNTHESE DE METHANOL, PROCEDE DE FABRICATION D'UN TEL CATALYSEUR ET PROCEDE DE FABRICATION DE METHANOL | [2008/44] | Entry into regional phase | 14.08.2008 | Translation filed | 10.09.2008 | National basic fee paid | 10.09.2008 | Search fee paid | 10.09.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.09.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.05.1944 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.09.2008 | Examination requested [2008/44] | 10.11.2008 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 23.10.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 03.05.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.09.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2013/09] | 11.10.2012 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2013/09] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 17.05.1944 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.02.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.02.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.02.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 29.02.2012 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [YA]US2004171704 (FUJIMOTO KAORU [JP], et al) [Y] 2,14 * examples 1-3 *[A] 1,3-13,15,16; | [YA] - LIFAN ET AL, "Methanol Synthesis from Carbon Dioxide and Hydrogen via Formic ester", SEKIYU GAKKAISHI, (1998), pages 354 - 357, XP002530589 [Y] 2,14 * figures 1,2; table 1 * [A] 1,3-13,15,16 | International search | [A]JPS5585530 (INST FRANCAIS DU PETROLE); | [A]JPS5695137 (UNION CARBIDE CORP); | [A]JPS5998024 (SHINNENRYOYU KAIHATSU GIJUTSU); | [A]JPS59116238 (ICI LTD); | [Y]JPH06319999 (EXXON RESEARCH ENGINEERING CO); | [A]JPH0987217 (TSUSHO SANGYOSHO KISO SANGYO); | [A]JPH09509881 ; | [A]WO0162701 (NIPPON STEEL CORP [JP], et al); | [Y]JP2005095872 (NIPPON STEEL CORP, et al); | [Y]JP2005126427 (NIPPON STEEL CORP, et al); | [Y] - ARAKURA Y. ET AL., "Formic acid esters o Keiyu suru Gosei Gas kara no Teion Methanol Gosei", DAI 85 KAI SHOKUBAI TORONKAI TORONKAI A YOKOSHU, (20000324), page 74, XP003016665 | by applicant | WO0162701 | JP2006041618 | JP2007022125 | - J. C. J. BART ET AL., CATAL. TODAY, (1987), vol. 2, page 1 | - SEIICHI OHYAMA, PETROTECH, (1995), vol. 18, no. 1, page 27 | - S. OHYAMA, APPLIED CATALYSIS A: GENERAL, (1999), vol. 180, page 217 |