EP1987826 - MEDICINE AND FUNCTIONAL FOOD FOR CONTROLLING OR RELIEVING ITCHING AND INFLAMMATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.04.2016 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.04.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 04.05.2016 [2016/18] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kands R&D Corporation D' Grafort 809, 3-4 Tsurumaki Tama-shi, Tokyo 2060034 / JP | For all designated states Erina Co. Inc. 9-2, Higashishinbashi 1-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 1050021 / JP | [2008/45] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TAGUCHI, Kazue c/o Kands R & D Corporation D' Grafort 809, 3-4 Tsurumaki Tama-shi, Tokyo 2060034 / JP | 02 /
TAGUCHI, Shigeru c/o Kands R & D Corporation D' Grafort 809, 3-4 Tsurumaki Tama-shi, Tokyo 2060034 / JP | 03 /
SASHIDA, Yutaka 20-7, Nanyodai 3-chome Hachioji-shi, Tokyo 1920371 / JP | [2015/22] |
Former [2009/01] | 01 /
TAGUCHI, Kazue c/o Kands R & D Corporation D' Grafort 809, 3-4 Tsurumaki Tama-shi, Tokyo 2060034 / JP | ||
02 /
TAGUCHI, Shigeru c/o Kands R & D Corporation D' Grafort 809, 3-4 Tsurumaki Tama-shi, Tokyo 2060034 / JP | |||
03 /
SASHIDA, Yutaka 20-7, Nanyodai 3-chome Hachioji-shi, Tokyo 1920371 / JP | |||
Former [2008/45] | 01 /
TAGUCHI, Kazue c/o Kands R & D Corporation D' Grafort 809, 3-4 Tsurumaki Tama-shi, Tokyo 2060034 / JP | ||
02 /
TAGUCHI, Shigeru c/o Kands R & D Corporation D' Grafort 809, 3-4 Tsurumaki Tama-shi, Tokyo 2060034 / JP | |||
03 /
SASHIDA, Yutaka 20-7, Nanyodai 3-chome Hachioji-shi, Tokyo 1920371 / JP | |||
04 /
NAGAI, Kazuo 42-17, Ikebukuro 3-chome Toshima-ku, Tokyo 170014 / JP | Representative(s) | Weickmann & Weickmann PartmbB Postfach 860 820 81635 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2015/22] | Weickmann & Weickmann Postfach 860 820 81635 München / DE | ||
Former [2008/45] | Böhm, Brigitte, et al Weickmann & Weickmann Patentanwälte Postfach 860 820 81635 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 07714504.3 | 19.02.2007 | [2008/45] | WO2007JP52978 | Priority number, date | JP20060044801 | 22.02.2006 Original published format: JP 2006044801 | [2008/45] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007097286 | Date: | 30.08.2007 | Language: | JA | [2007/35] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1987826 | Date: | 05.11.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/45] | Type: | A8 Corrected patent application | No.: | EP1987826 | Date: | 18.03.2009 | [2009/12] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1987826 | Date: | 27.05.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/22] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 30.08.2007 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.06.2011 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/353, A61K36/752, A61K36/75, A23L1/30, A61P17/04 | [2014/44] | CPC: |
A61K36/752 (EP,US);
A61K31/353 (EP,KR,US);
A23L2/52 (US);
A23L33/105 (EP,US);
A61K36/75 (EP,KR,US);
A61P11/06 (EP);
A61P17/00 (EP);
A61P17/04 (EP);
A61P27/16 (EP);
A61P29/00 (EP);
A61P37/08 (EP);
A61P39/00 (EP);
A23V2002/00 (EP,US)
(-)
| C-Set: |
A23V2002/00, A23V2200/318, A23V2250/21 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2008/45] | A61K31/353, A23L1/30, A61K36/75, A61P17/04 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2015/22] |
Former [2010/11] | DE, FR, GB, IT | ||
Former [2008/45] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | MEDIKAMENT UND FUNKTIONELLES NAHRUNGSMITTEL ZUR BEKÄMPFUNG ODER LINDERUNG VON JUCKREIZ UND ENTZÜNDUNG | [2008/45] | English: | MEDICINE AND FUNCTIONAL FOOD FOR CONTROLLING OR RELIEVING ITCHING AND INFLAMMATION | [2008/45] | French: | MEDICAMENT ET ALIMENT FONCTIONNEL DESTINES A CONTROLER OU A ATTENUER LE PRURIT ET L'INFLAMMATION | [2008/45] | Entry into regional phase | 20.08.2008 | Translation filed | 20.08.2008 | National basic fee paid | 20.08.2008 | Search fee paid | 20.08.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.08.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.08.2008 | Examination requested [2008/45] | 14.07.2010 | Observations by third parties | 16.01.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.12.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.04.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.05.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.08.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.12.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.04.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 09.04.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 09.04.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 04.12.2013 | Opposition(s) | 01.03.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/18] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.02.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.01.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.02.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.02.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.01.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 31.01.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 30.01.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JP2004083417 ; | [X]JP2005213178 ; | [X]JP2003192588 | [I] - KIM DAE KEUN ET AL, "Anti-allergic components from the peels of Citrus unshiu", ARCHIVES OF PHARMACAL RESEARCH, NATL. FISHERIES UNIVERSITY, PUSAN, KR, (19991201), vol. 22, no. 6, doi:10.1007/BF02975340, ISSN 0253-6269, pages 642 - 645, XP002554213 [I] 1-3 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/BF02975340 | [IP] - WU Y Q ET AL, "Antagonistic effects of nobiletin, a polymethoxyflavonoid, on eosinophilic airway inflammation of asthmatic rats and relevant mechanisms", LIFE SCIENCES, PERGAMON PRESS, OXFORD, GB, vol. 78, no. 23, doi:10.1016/J.LFS.2005.10.029, ISSN 0024-3205, (20060501), pages 2689 - 2696, (20060501), XP025191359 [IP] 1-3 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.lfs.2005.10.029 | [I] - SANKAWA U ET AL, "ANTI-ALLERGIC SUBSTANCES FROM CHINESE MEDICINAL PLANTS", ADVANCES IN CHINESE MEDICINAL MATERIALS RESEARCH, WORLD SCIENTIFIC PUBL., SINGAPORE, SG, (19850101), pages 171 - 180, XP001106027 [I] 1-3 * the whole document * | [X] - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 2004, no. 25, Database accession no. 2004-262447, XP002643332 & JP2004083417 A 20040318 (DOKURITSU GYOSEI HOJIN NOGYO SEIBUTSU SH) [X] 1-3 * abstract * | [X] - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 2005, no. 55, Database accession no. 2005-537830, XP002643333 & JP2005213178 A 20050811 (MARUZEN SEIYAKU KK) [X] 1,2 * abstract * | [X] - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 2003, no. 77, Database accession no. 2003-819487, XP002643334 & JP2003192588 A 20030709 (DOKURITSU GYOSEI HOJIN NOGYO SEIBUTSU SH) [X] 1,2 * abstract * | International search | [X]JPH07118151 (KUREHA CHEMICAL IND CO LTD); | [X]JP2004091489 (MERCK PATENT GMBH); | [XP]JP2006348003 (SANEI GEN FFI INC, et al); | [X]JP2001240539 (MACHIDA & MACHIDA SHOKAI KK, et al); | [A]JP2005336070 (SANEI GEN FFI INC) | other | - "Shayaaf-e-Naaranj", TKDL, Database accession no. AH5/1318, XP003027327 | - MOHAMMAD AKMAL KHAN, Qaraabaadeen Azam wa Akmal, (1909), page 484 | - "Barayooma Naranj", TKDL, Database accession no. MH5/487, XP003027328 | - MOHAMMAD AKBAR ARZANI, Qaraabaadeen Qaadri, (1968), page 85 |