EP1988197 - STEREOSCOPIC KNITWORK [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 17.06.2011 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.06.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 20.07.2011 [2011/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Asahi Kasei Fibers Corporation 2-6, Dojimahama 1-chome, Kita-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 530-8205 / JP | [2008/45] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
IKENAGA, Hideo c/o Asahi Kasei Kabushiki Kaisha 1-2, Yurakucho 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8440 / JP | 02 /
TANIGUCHI, Yukihito c/o Asahi Kasei Kabushiki Kaisha 1-2, Yurakucho 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8440 / JP | [2008/45] | Representative(s) | dompatent von Kreisler Selting Werner - Partnerschaft von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten mbB Deichmannhaus am Dom Bahnhofsvorplatz 1 50667 Köln / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/45] | von Kreisler Selting Werner Patentanwälte P.O. Box 10 22 41 50462 Köln / DE | ||
Former [2008/39] | von Kreisler Selting Werner Deichmannhaus am Dom Postfach 10 22 41 50462 Köln / DE | Application number, filing date | 07714691.8 | 21.02.2007 | [2008/45] | WO2007JP53191 | Priority number, date | JP20060044987 | 22.02.2006 Original published format: JP 2006044987 | [2008/45] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007097363 | Date: | 30.08.2007 | Language: | JA | [2007/35] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1988197 | Date: | 05.11.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/45] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 30.08.2007 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 31.08.2010 | Classification | IPC: | D04B21/14, A47C27/00 | [2008/45] | CPC: |
D04B21/16 (EP,US);
D04B21/14 (KR);
A47C27/00 (KR);
B60N2/58 (EP,US);
B60N2/70 (EP,US);
D10B2403/021 (EP,US);
D10B2505/08 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/45] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | STEREOSKOPISCHE STRICKWARE | [2008/45] | English: | STEREOSCOPIC KNITWORK | [2008/45] | French: | TRICOT STEREOSCOPIQUE | [2008/45] | Entry into regional phase | 08.07.2008 | Translation filed | 08.07.2008 | National basic fee paid | 08.07.2008 | Search fee paid | 08.07.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.07.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.07.2008 | Examination requested [2008/45] | 16.09.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.01.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2011/29] | 04.03.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2011/29] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 16.09.2010 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.02.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.02.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 28.02.2011 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP1426473 (ASAHI CHEMICAL IND [JP]) [A] 1-4 * page 9, lines 14-19, paragraphs 34-41; examples 11, 13; claims 12, 15-17 *; | [A]EP0692563 (GUILFORD MILLS INC [US]) [A] 1-3 * page 3, lines 5-44; figures 3-10; claim 1 *; | [A]EP0529671 (KNEITZ WILHELM & CO AG [DE], et al) [A] 1-3,5 * page 5, line 21 - page 6, line 7; figure 8; claim 17; table 1 * | [A] - GUNTER SCHMIDT, "Abstandsgewirke ohne und mit Dekorseite für Anwendungen im Automobil", MELLIAND TEXTILBERICHTE, DEUTSCHER FACHVERLAG, FRANKFURT AM MAIN, DE, (19930228), ISSN 0341-0781, pages 37 - 39,128, XP002280005 [A] 1-3 * page 38, column 2, line 1 - page 130, column 1, paragraph 3; figures 13, 14; table 4 * | International search | [Y]JP2004190211 (ASAHI KASEI FIBERS CORP); | [Y]JP2006000207 (DELTA TOOLING CO LTD, et al); | [Y]WO02079558 (ASAHI CHEMICAL IND [JP]); | [Y]JP2006002274 (ASAHI KASEI FIBERS CORP); | [A]JP2003342859 (DELTA TOOLING CO LTD, et al) |