EP1995290 - PRESSURE-SENSITIVE ADHESIVE COMPOSITION AND PRESSURE-SENSITIVE ADHESIVE SHEET MAKING USE OF THE SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 29.03.2013 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2015 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU, LU | published on 19.08.2015 [2015/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Lintec Corporation 23-23 Honcho Itabashi-ku Tokyo 173-0001 / JP | [2008/48] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ARAI, Takayuki c/o LINTEC CORPORATION 23-23, Honcho Itabashi-ku Tokyo 173-0001 / JP | 02 /
KASHIO, Mikihiro c/o LINTEC CORPORATION 23-23, Honcho Itabashi-ku Tokyo 173-0001 / JP | 03 /
TAKATA, Toshikazu c/o TOKYO INSTITUTE OF TECHNOLOGY 12-1, Ookayama 2-chome Meguro-ku Tokyo 152-0033 / JP | [2012/21] |
Former [2008/48] | 01 /
ARAI, Takayuki c/o LINTEC CORPORATION 23-23, Honcho Itabashi-ku Tokyo 173-0001 / JP | ||
02 /
KASHIO, Mikihiro c/o LINTEC CORPORATION 23-23, Honcho Itabashi-ku Tokyo 173-0001 / JP | |||
03 /
TAKATA, Toshikazu c/o TOKYO INSTITUTE OF TECHNOLOGY 12-1, Ookayama 2-chome Meguro-ku Tokyo 152-0033 / JP | Representative(s) | Benson, John Everett, et al J A Kemp 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | [2012/21] |
Former [2010/26] | Benson, John Everett, et al J. A. Kemp & Co. 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | ||
Former [2008/48] | Cresswell, Thomas Anthony J.A. KEMP & CO. 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 07714697.5 | 21.02.2007 | [2008/48] | WO2007JP53197 | Priority number, date | JP20060046212 | 23.02.2006 Original published format: JP 2006046212 | [2008/48] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007097365 | Date: | 30.08.2007 | Language: | JA | [2007/35] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1995290 | Date: | 26.11.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/48] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1995290 | Date: | 23.05.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/21] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 30.08.2007 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.02.2011 | Classification | IPC: | C09J201/00, C09J4/00, C09J4/06, C09J7/00, C09J105/16, C09J109/00, C09J123/06, C09J123/12, C09J123/22, C09J133/08, C09J167/00, C09J171/00, C09J171/08, C09J179/02, C09J183/04, C09J201/02 | [2008/48] | CPC: |
C09J4/06 (EP,US);
C09J201/00 (KR);
C09J105/16 (EP,KR,US);
C09J109/00 (KR);
C09J123/06 (KR);
C09J123/22 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
C09J123/22, C08L2666/02 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/48] | Title | German: | HAFTKLEBSTOFF UND DAVON GEBRAUCH MACHENDE HAFTKLEBEFOLIE | [2008/48] | English: | PRESSURE-SENSITIVE ADHESIVE COMPOSITION AND PRESSURE-SENSITIVE ADHESIVE SHEET MAKING USE OF THE SAME | [2008/48] | French: | COMPOSITION ADHESIVE SENSIBLE A LA PRESSION ET FEUILLE ADHESIVE SENSIBLE A LA PRESSION L'UTILISANT | [2008/48] | Entry into regional phase | 23.09.2008 | Translation filed | 23.09.2008 | National basic fee paid | 23.09.2008 | Search fee paid | 23.09.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.09.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.09.2008 | Examination requested [2008/48] | 23.08.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 07.11.2011 | Observations by third parties | 02.12.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.04.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 04.04.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 02.12.2011 | Opposition(s) | 26.02.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/18] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.02.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.02.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.05.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 15.02.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 28.02.2011 | 05   M06   Fee paid on   11.05.2011 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 21.02.2007 | AT | 23.05.2012 | BE | 23.05.2012 | CY | 23.05.2012 | CZ | 23.05.2012 | DK | 23.05.2012 | EE | 23.05.2012 | IT | 23.05.2012 | LT | 23.05.2012 | LV | 23.05.2012 | RO | 23.05.2012 | SE | 23.05.2012 | SI | 23.05.2012 | SK | 23.05.2012 | TR | 23.05.2012 | BG | 23.08.2012 | GR | 24.08.2012 | ES | 03.09.2012 | IS | 23.09.2012 | PT | 24.09.2012 | GB | 21.02.2013 | IE | 21.02.2013 | LU | 21.02.2013 | [2015/34] |
Former [2015/32] | AT | 23.05.2012 | |
BE | 23.05.2012 | ||
CY | 23.05.2012 | ||
CZ | 23.05.2012 | ||
DK | 23.05.2012 | ||
EE | 23.05.2012 | ||
IT | 23.05.2012 | ||
LT | 23.05.2012 | ||
LV | 23.05.2012 | ||
RO | 23.05.2012 | ||
SE | 23.05.2012 | ||
SI | 23.05.2012 | ||
SK | 23.05.2012 | ||
TR | 23.05.2012 | ||
BG | 23.08.2012 | ||
GR | 24.08.2012 | ||
ES | 03.09.2012 | ||
IS | 23.09.2012 | ||
PT | 24.09.2012 | ||
GB | 21.02.2013 | ||
IE | 21.02.2013 | ||
Former [2014/09] | AT | 23.05.2012 | |
BE | 23.05.2012 | ||
CY | 23.05.2012 | ||
CZ | 23.05.2012 | ||
DK | 23.05.2012 | ||
EE | 23.05.2012 | ||
IT | 23.05.2012 | ||
LT | 23.05.2012 | ||
LV | 23.05.2012 | ||
RO | 23.05.2012 | ||
SE | 23.05.2012 | ||
SI | 23.05.2012 | ||
SK | 23.05.2012 | ||
BG | 23.08.2012 | ||
GR | 24.08.2012 | ||
ES | 03.09.2012 | ||
IS | 23.09.2012 | ||
PT | 24.09.2012 | ||
GB | 21.02.2013 | ||
IE | 21.02.2013 | ||
Former [2014/07] | AT | 23.05.2012 | |
BE | 23.05.2012 | ||
CY | 23.05.2012 | ||
CZ | 23.05.2012 | ||
DK | 23.05.2012 | ||
EE | 23.05.2012 | ||
IT | 23.05.2012 | ||
LT | 23.05.2012 | ||
LV | 23.05.2012 | ||
RO | 23.05.2012 | ||
SE | 23.05.2012 | ||
SI | 23.05.2012 | ||
SK | 23.05.2012 | ||
BG | 23.08.2012 | ||
GR | 24.08.2012 | ||
ES | 03.09.2012 | ||
IS | 23.09.2012 | ||
PT | 24.09.2012 | ||
IE | 21.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/34] | AT | 23.05.2012 | |
BE | 23.05.2012 | ||
CY | 23.05.2012 | ||
CZ | 23.05.2012 | ||
DK | 23.05.2012 | ||
EE | 23.05.2012 | ||
IT | 23.05.2012 | ||
LT | 23.05.2012 | ||
LV | 23.05.2012 | ||
RO | 23.05.2012 | ||
SE | 23.05.2012 | ||
SI | 23.05.2012 | ||
SK | 23.05.2012 | ||
BG | 23.08.2012 | ||
GR | 24.08.2012 | ||
ES | 03.09.2012 | ||
IS | 23.09.2012 | ||
PT | 24.09.2012 | ||
Former [2013/22] | AT | 23.05.2012 | |
BE | 23.05.2012 | ||
CY | 23.05.2012 | ||
CZ | 23.05.2012 | ||
DK | 23.05.2012 | ||
EE | 23.05.2012 | ||
IT | 23.05.2012 | ||
LT | 23.05.2012 | ||
LV | 23.05.2012 | ||
RO | 23.05.2012 | ||
SE | 23.05.2012 | ||
SI | 23.05.2012 | ||
SK | 23.05.2012 | ||
GR | 24.08.2012 | ||
ES | 03.09.2012 | ||
IS | 23.09.2012 | ||
PT | 24.09.2012 | ||
Former [2013/11] | AT | 23.05.2012 | |
BE | 23.05.2012 | ||
CY | 23.05.2012 | ||
CZ | 23.05.2012 | ||
DK | 23.05.2012 | ||
EE | 23.05.2012 | ||
IT | 23.05.2012 | ||
LT | 23.05.2012 | ||
LV | 23.05.2012 | ||
RO | 23.05.2012 | ||
SE | 23.05.2012 | ||
SI | 23.05.2012 | ||
SK | 23.05.2012 | ||
GR | 24.08.2012 | ||
IS | 23.09.2012 | ||
PT | 24.09.2012 | ||
Former [2013/10] | AT | 23.05.2012 | |
BE | 23.05.2012 | ||
CY | 23.05.2012 | ||
CZ | 23.05.2012 | ||
DK | 23.05.2012 | ||
EE | 23.05.2012 | ||
LT | 23.05.2012 | ||
LV | 23.05.2012 | ||
RO | 23.05.2012 | ||
SE | 23.05.2012 | ||
SI | 23.05.2012 | ||
SK | 23.05.2012 | ||
GR | 24.08.2012 | ||
IS | 23.09.2012 | ||
PT | 24.09.2012 | ||
Former [2013/09] | AT | 23.05.2012 | |
BE | 23.05.2012 | ||
CY | 23.05.2012 | ||
DK | 23.05.2012 | ||
EE | 23.05.2012 | ||
LT | 23.05.2012 | ||
LV | 23.05.2012 | ||
SE | 23.05.2012 | ||
SI | 23.05.2012 | ||
GR | 24.08.2012 | ||
IS | 23.09.2012 | ||
PT | 24.09.2012 | ||
Former [2013/08] | AT | 23.05.2012 | |
BE | 23.05.2012 | ||
CY | 23.05.2012 | ||
DK | 23.05.2012 | ||
LT | 23.05.2012 | ||
LV | 23.05.2012 | ||
SE | 23.05.2012 | ||
SI | 23.05.2012 | ||
GR | 24.08.2012 | ||
IS | 23.09.2012 | ||
PT | 24.09.2012 | ||
Former [2013/07] | AT | 23.05.2012 | |
BE | 23.05.2012 | ||
CY | 23.05.2012 | ||
LT | 23.05.2012 | ||
LV | 23.05.2012 | ||
SE | 23.05.2012 | ||
SI | 23.05.2012 | ||
GR | 24.08.2012 | ||
IS | 23.09.2012 | ||
PT | 24.09.2012 | ||
Former [2013/04] | BE | 23.05.2012 | |
CY | 23.05.2012 | ||
LT | 23.05.2012 | ||
LV | 23.05.2012 | ||
SE | 23.05.2012 | ||
SI | 23.05.2012 | ||
GR | 24.08.2012 | ||
IS | 23.09.2012 | ||
PT | 24.09.2012 | ||
Former [2013/01] | CY | 23.05.2012 | |
LT | 23.05.2012 | ||
LV | 23.05.2012 | ||
SE | 23.05.2012 | ||
SI | 23.05.2012 | ||
GR | 24.08.2012 | ||
IS | 23.09.2012 | ||
PT | 24.09.2012 | ||
Former [2012/51] | CY | 23.05.2012 | |
LT | 23.05.2012 | ||
LV | 23.05.2012 | ||
SE | 23.05.2012 | ||
SI | 23.05.2012 | ||
GR | 24.08.2012 | ||
IS | 23.09.2012 | ||
Former [2012/50] | CY | 23.05.2012 | |
LT | 23.05.2012 | ||
LV | 23.05.2012 | ||
SE | 23.05.2012 | ||
GR | 24.08.2012 | ||
IS | 23.09.2012 | ||
Former [2012/49] | CY | 23.05.2012 | |
LT | 23.05.2012 | ||
SE | 23.05.2012 | ||
IS | 23.09.2012 | ||
Former [2012/48] | LT | 23.05.2012 | |
SE | 23.05.2012 | ||
Former [2012/47] | LT | 23.05.2012 | Documents cited: | Search | [ ] - No further relevant documents disclosed | International search | [A]WO0183566 (CT FOR ADVANCED SCIENCE & TECH [JP], et al); | [A]WO03074099 (JAPAN TISSUE ENG CO LTD [JP], et al); | [A]WO2005095493 (ITO KOHZO [JP], et al); | [AP]WO2006088200 (UNIV TOKYO [JP], et al); | [AP]WO2006090819 (UNIV TOKYO [JP], et al) | by applicant | JPH03220120 | JP2003049143 | JP2004099792 | JP2005154675 | other | JP2006046212 | - KOUBUNSHI-KANKOUKAI(JAPAN), Pressure-sensitive adhesive - its function and mechanism- (first edition), (19910220), pages 13 - 14, XP003028447 | - ARAKI J. ET AL, "Efficient production of Polyrotaxanes from alpha-Cyclodextrin and Poly(ethylene glycol)", MACROMOLECULES, (2005), vol. 38, pages 7524 - 7527, XP003028448 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/MA050290 | - ARAKI J. ET AL, "Polyrotaxane derivatives. I. Preparation of modified polyrotaxanes with nonionic functional groups and their solubility in organic solvents", JOURNAL OF POLYMER SCIENCE:PART A: POLYMER CHEMISTRY, (2006), vol. 44, pages 6312 - 6323, XP008101850 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/POLA.21717 |