EP1995252 - METHOD FOR REMOVAL OF NUCLEIC ACID-PROTECTING GROUP [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 13.01.2012 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.01.2012 | Withdrawal of application | published on 15.02.2012 [2012/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nippon Shinyaku Co., Ltd. 14, Kisshoin Nishinosho Monguchicho, Minami-ku Kyoto-shi Kyoto 601-8550 / JP | [2008/48] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KITAGAWA, Hidetoshi 609-9, Onozaki, Tsukuba-shi Ibaraki 305-0034 / JP | 02 /
MASUDA, Hirofumi 283, Mukoishige Joso-shi, Ibaraki 300-2742 / JP | [2008/48] | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/48] | Vossius & Partner Siebertstrasse 4 81675 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 07714924.3 | 26.02.2007 | [2008/48] | WO2007JP53492 | Priority number, date | JP20060050394 | 27.02.2006 Original published format: JP 2006050394 | [2008/48] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007097447 | Date: | 30.08.2007 | Language: | JA | [2007/35] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1995252 | Date: | 26.11.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/48] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 30.08.2007 | Classification | IPC: | C07H19/067, C07H19/10, C07H19/167, C07H19/20, C07H21/02, C07H21/04 | [2008/48] | CPC: |
C07H19/067 (EP,KR,US);
C07H19/10 (EP,KR,US);
C07H19/167 (EP,KR,US);
C07H19/20 (EP,US);
C07H21/02 (EP,KR,US);
C07H21/04 (EP,US);
Y02P20/55 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/48] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUM ENTFERNEN EINER NUKLEINSÄURESCHUTZGRUPPE | [2008/48] | English: | METHOD FOR REMOVAL OF NUCLEIC ACID-PROTECTING GROUP | [2008/48] | French: | PROCEDE DE CLIVAGE D'UN GROUPE PROTECTEUR D'ACIDE NUCLEIQUE | [2008/48] | Entry into regional phase | 29.09.2008 | Translation filed | 29.09.2008 | National basic fee paid | 29.09.2008 | Search fee paid | 29.09.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.09.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.09.2008 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 29.09.2008 | Examination requested [2008/48] | 12.10.2011 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2012/07] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.02.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.02.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.02.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XP]WO2006022323 (NIPPON SHINYAKU CO LTD [JP], et al); | [AP]WO2006102970 (QIAGEN GMBH [DE], et al); | [Y] - SANDBRINK J. ET AL., "Investigation of potential RNA bulge stabilizing elements", CASREACT, Database accession no. (144:326428), XP003017303 | [ ] - JOURNAL OF MOLECULAR RECOGNITION, (2005), vol. 18, no. 4, pages 318 - 326 | [Y] - GREENE T.W. ET AL., PROTECTIVE GROUPS IN ORGANIC SYNTHESIS, JOHN WILEY & SONS, INC., (1999), vol. 3RD ED., pages 237 - 241, XP003017304 | [Y] - SANEYOSHI H. ET AL., "A General Method for the Synthesis of 2'-O-Cyanoethylated Oligoribonucleotides Having Promising Hybridization Affinity for DNA and RNA and Enhanced Nuclease Resistance", THE JOURNAL OF ORGANIC CHEMISTRY, (2005), vol. 70, no. 25, pages 10453 - 10460, XP003017305 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/jo051741r | [Y] - OHGI T. ET AL., "A New RNA Synthetic Method with a 2'-O-(2-Cyanoethoxymethyl) Protecting Group", CAPLUS, Database accession no. (2005:582219), XP003017306 | [ ] - ORGANIC LETTERS, (2005), vol. 7, no. 16, pages 3477 - 3480 | [Y] - WU X. ET AL., "Synthesis of 5'-C- and 2'-O-(Bromoalkyl)-Substituted Ribonucleotide Phosphoramidites of the Post-synthetic Functionalization of Oligonucleotides on Solid Support", HELVETICA CHIMICA ACTA, (2000), vol. 83, no. 6, pages 1127 - 1144, XP003009347 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/1522-2675(20000607)83:6<1127::AID-HLCA1127>3.0.CO;2-B | [A] - ITO T. ET AL., "(Methoxyethoxy)methyl Group: New Amide and Hydroxyl Protecting Group of Uridine in Oligonucleotide Synthesis", THE JOURNAL OF ORGANIC CHEMISTRY, (1986), vol. 51, no. 6, pages 931 - 933, XP002979646 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/jo00356a033 | by applicant | WO2005023828 | - OHGI ET AL., ORGANIC LETTERS, (2005), vol. 7, page 3477 | - TAKESHI WADA, BIO INDUSTRY, (2004), vol. 21, no. 1, page 17 | - UMEMOTO ET AL., TETRAHEDRON LETTERS, (2004), vol. 45, page 9529 | - HISAO SANEYOSHI ET AL., JOURNAL OF ORGANIC CHEMISTRY, (2005), vol. 70, page 10453 | - JOURNAL OF MOLECULAR STRUCTURE, (1989), vol. 193, page 247 | - POLISH JOURNAL OF CHEMISTRY, (1993), vol. 67, no. 2, page 281 | - CHEMISTRY-A EUROPEAN JOURNAL, (1998), vol. 4, no. 6, page 1043 | - JOURNAL OF FLUORINE CHEMISTRY, (2002), vol. 118, no. 1-2, page 123 | - T. BENNECHE ET AL., SYNTHESIS, (1983), page 762 | - M. MATTEUCCI, TETRAHEDRON LETTERS, (1990), vol. 31, page 2385 | - ALUL ET AL., NUCLEIC ACIDS RESEARCH, (1991), vol. 19, page 1527 | - WRIGHT ET AL., TETRAHEDRON LETTERS, (1993), vol. 34, page 3373 |