EP1990786 - OBJECT PATH PREDICTION METHOD AND APPARATUS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2008/46] | OBJECT COURSE PREDICTION METHOD, DEVICE, PROGRAM, AND AUTOMATIC DRIVING SYSTEM | ||
[2021/01] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.03.2022 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 16.04.2021 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 25.01.2021 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 11.07.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.03.2022 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 27.04.2022 [2022/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TOYOTA JIDOSHA KABUSHIKI KAISHA 1, Toyota-cho Toyota-shi, Aichi-ken, 471-8571 / JP | [2021/20] |
Former [2013/09] | For all designated states TOYOTA JIDOSHA KABUSHIKI KAISHA 1, Toyota-cho Toyota-shi Aichi-ken, 471-8571 / JP | ||
Former [2008/46] | For all designated states TOYOTA JIDOSHA KABUSHIKI KAISHA 1, Toyota-cho, Toyota-shi. Aichi-ken, 471-8571 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ASO, Kazuaki c/o TOYOTA JIDOSHA KABUSHIKI KAISHA 1, Toyota-cho, Toyota-shi Aichi-ken 471-8571 / JP | 02 /
KINDO, Toshiki c/o TOYOTA JIDOSHA KABUSHIKI KAISHA 1, Toyota-cho, Toyota-shi Aichi-ken 471-8571 / JP | [2021/20] |
Former [2008/46] | 01 /
ASO, Kazuaki TOYOTA JIDOSHA K.K. 1, Toyota-cho, Toyota-shi Aichi 471-8571 / JP | ||
02 /
KINDO, Toshiki TOYOTA JIDOSHA K.K. 1, Toyota-cho, Toyota-shi Aichi 471-8571 / JP | Representative(s) | TBK Bavariaring 4-6 80336 München / DE | [2021/20] |
Former [2008/46] | TBK-Patent Bavariaring 4-6 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 07715050.6 | 28.02.2007 | [2008/46] | WO2007JP53760 | Priority number, date | JP20060053878 | 28.02.2006 Original published format: JP 2006053878 | JP20060053879 | 28.02.2006 Original published format: JP 2006053879 | JP20060056874 | 02.03.2006 Original published format: JP 2006056874 | [2008/46] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007102367 | Date: | 13.09.2007 | Language: | JA | [2007/37] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1990786 | Date: | 12.11.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/46] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1990786 | Date: | 19.05.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/20] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 13.09.2007 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.07.2017 | Classification | IPC: | G08G1/16, B60W30/08, B60W40/08, G08G1/09, B60R21/00 | [2008/46] | CPC: |
G08G1/166 (EP,US);
B60W30/10 (EP,US);
B60W40/02 (EP,US);
G08G1/161 (EP,US);
G08G1/164 (EP,US);
G08G1/165 (EP,US);
G08G1/167 (EP,US);
B60W2554/4041 (EP,US);
B60W2556/50 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2021/20] |
Former [2009/13] | DE, FR, GB | ||
Former [2008/46] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | OBJEKTKURSPRÄDITIKTIONSVERFAHREN UND -VORRICHTUNG | [2021/01] | English: | OBJECT PATH PREDICTION METHOD AND APPARATUS | [2021/01] | French: | PROCEDE ET DISPOSITIF DE PREDICTION DE TRAJET D'OBJET | [2021/01] |
Former [2008/46] | OBJEKTKURSPRÄDITIKTIONSVERFAHREN, -EINRICHTUNG, -PROGRAMM UND AUTOMATISCHES FAHRSYSTEM | ||
Former [2008/46] | OBJECT COURSE PREDICTION METHOD, DEVICE, PROGRAM, AND AUTOMATIC DRIVING SYSTEM | ||
Former [2008/46] | PROCEDE DE PREDICTION DE TRAJET D'OBJET, DISPOSITIF, PROGRAMME ET SYSTEME DE PILOTAGE AUTOMATIQUE | Entry into regional phase | 27.08.2008 | Translation filed | 27.08.2008 | National basic fee paid | 27.08.2008 | Search fee paid | 27.08.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.08.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.08.2008 | Examination requested [2008/46] | 30.09.2008 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 04.11.2008 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 31.01.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 15.07.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.11.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.01.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.04.2021 | Fee for grant paid | 08.04.2021 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 08.04.2021 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 15.07.2020 | Opposition(s) | 22.02.2022 | No opposition filed within time limit [2022/17] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.02.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.02.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.02.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 15.02.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 12.02.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 12.02.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 11.02.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 10.02.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 10.02.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 14.02.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 13.02.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 13.02.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | 12.02.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 15 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2003139883 (TAKAFUJI TETSUYA [JP], et al) [X] 1,2,10,11,13,14,17,22,25,30,32,41,53 * paragraphs [0016] , [0017] , [0 44] - paragraph [0050]; figure 2 *; | [X]US2004030499 (KNOOP MICHAEL [DE], et al) [X] 1,2,10,17,22,25,30,32,41,53* paragraph [0020]; figure 1 *; | [X]WO2005027076 (SHILLER ZVI [IL]) [X] 1,2,10,17,22,25,30,32,41,53 * page 9, line 3 - page 10, line 5; figure 21 *; | [X]US2005216181 (ESTKOWSKI REGINA I [US], et al) [X] 1-3,10-12,17,22,25,30,32,41,53 * paragraphs [0008] , [0 23] - paragraphs [0028] , [0033] - [0058] - [0063] , [0071] , [0081]; figures 2A-2J,9 * * paragraph [0108] - paragraph [0112] * | International search | [A]JPH11126294 (TOYOTA MOTOR CORP); | [A]JP2000076581 (TOYOTA MOTOR CORP); | [A]JP2000207691 (TOYOTA MOTOR CORP); | [Y]JP2000276696 (TOYOTA MOTOR CORP); | [Y]JP2002140786 (NEC CORP, et al); | [A]JP2003058999 (PIONEER ELECTRONIC CORP); | [A]JP2003123185 (HITACHI LTD); | [X]JP2003205804 (DENSO CORP); | [A]JP2004199389 (TOYOTA MOTOR CORP) |