EP1997031 - DATA TRANSFERRING METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 25.05.2018 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 16.03.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.05.2018 | Withdrawal of application | published on 27.06.2018 [2018/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LG Electronics Inc. 20, Yeouido-dong Yeongdeungpo-gu Seoul 150-721 / KR | [N/P] |
Former [2010/07] | For all designated states LG Electronics Inc. 20, Yeouido-dong Yeongdeungpo-gu Seoul 150-721 / KR | ||
Former [2008/49] | For all designated states LG Electronics Inc. 20, Yoido-Dong Yongdungpo-Gu Seoul 150-010 / KR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
JEONG, Man-soo 103-402, Jung-ang Heights Apt. Oksu 2-dong, Seongdong-gu Seoul 133-765 / KR | 02 /
PARK, Il-gon 101-1208, Hyundai3-cha Apt. Mullae-dong 5-ga, Yeongdeungpo-gu Seoul 150-095 / KR | 03 /
PAK, Koo-yong NAS Group DM Lab., LG R & D Campus, 16 Umyeon-dong, Seocho-gu Seoul 137-724 / KR | 04 /
CHUNG, Min-gyu NAS Group DM Lab., LG R & D Campus, 16 Umyeon-dong, Seocho-gu Seoul 137-724 / KR | 05 /
CHO, Sung-hyun NAS Group, DM Lab, LG R&D Campus 16, Umyeon-dong, Seocho-gu Seoul 137-724 / KR | 06 /
KIM, Soo-jung Shine-hill 4-cha 601 806-9, Bangbae 4-dong, Seocho-gu Seoul 137-831 / KR | 07 /
K, Kiran Kumar NAS Group DM Lab., LG R & D Campus, 16 Umyeon-dong, Seocho-gu Seoul 137-724 / KR | [2009/04] |
Former [2008/49] | 01 /
JEONG, Man-soo 103-402, Jung-ang Heights Apt. Oksu 2-dong, Seongdong-gu Seoul 133-765 / KR | ||
02 /
PARK, Il-gon 101-1208, Hyundai3-cha Apt. Mullae-dong 5-ga, Yeongdeungpo-gu Seoul 150-095 / KR | |||
03 /
PAK, Koo-yong NAS Group DM Lab., LG R & D Campus, 16 Umyeon-dong, Seocho-gu Seoul 137-724 / KR | |||
04 /
CHUNG, Min-gyu NAS Group DM Lab., LG R & D Campus, 16 Umyeon-dong, Seocho-gu Seoul 137-724 / KR | |||
05 /
CHO, Sung-hyun 101-302, Jin Heung Ariel Apt. Sadang 4-dong, Dongjak-gu Seoul 156-094 / KR | |||
06 /
KIM, Soo-jung Shine-hill 4-cha 601 806-9, Bangbae 4-dong, Seocho-gu Seoul 137-831 / KR | |||
07 /
K, Kiran Kumar NAS Group DM Lab., LG R & D Campus, 16 Umyeon-dong, Seocho-gu Seoul 137-724 / KR | Representative(s) | Katérle, Axel Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patentanwälte PartG mbB Schweigerstraße 2 81541 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/49] | Katérle, Axel Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Schweigerstraße 2 81541 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 07715515.8 | 06.03.2007 | [2008/49] | WO2007KR01115 | Priority number, date | US20060778928P | 06.03.2006 Original published format: US 778928 P | US20060743417P | 07.03.2006 Original published format: US 743417 P | US20060744322P | 05.04.2006 Original published format: US 744322 P | US20060744811P | 13.04.2006 Original published format: US 744811 P | US20060799411P | 09.05.2006 Original published format: US 799411 P | US20060802943P | 23.05.2006 Original published format: US 802943 P | US20060803834P | 02.06.2006 Original published format: US 803834 P | US20060814977P | 19.06.2006 Original published format: US 814977 P | US20060832514P | 20.07.2006 Original published format: US 832514 P | US20060824700P | 06.09.2006 Original published format: US 824700 P | US20060862684P | 24.10.2006 Original published format: US 862684 P | US20060862808P | 25.10.2006 Original published format: US 862808 P | US20060865520P | 13.11.2006 Original published format: US 865520 P | [2008/49] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007102698 | Date: | 13.09.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/37] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1997031 | Date: | 03.12.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.09.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/49] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 13.09.2007 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.12.2014 | Classification | IPC: | H04L29/02, H04L9/32, H04L29/08, H04L29/06, G06F21/10 | [2015/03] | CPC: |
G06F21/1012 (EP,KR,US);
H04L63/10 (EP,KR,US);
H04L63/0428 (EP,KR,US);
G06F21/10 (KR);
H04L63/0823 (EP,KR,US);
H04L63/166 (EP,KR,US);
H04L69/329 (EP,US);
H04L2463/101 (EP,US);
Y10S707/99931 (US);
Y10S707/99932 (US);
Y10S707/99933 (US);
Y10S707/99934 (US);
Y10S707/99935 (US);
Y10S707/99936 (US);
Y10S707/99937 (US);
Y10S707/99938 (US);
Y10S707/99939 (US);
Y10S707/9994 (US);
Y10S707/99941 (US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2008/49] | G06F17/00, H04L9/32 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/49] | Title | German: | DATENÜBERTRAGUNGSVERFAHREN | [2008/49] | English: | DATA TRANSFERRING METHOD | [2008/49] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE TRANSFERT DE DONNÉES | [2008/49] | Entry into regional phase | 11.07.2008 | National basic fee paid | 11.07.2008 | Search fee paid | 11.07.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.07.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.07.2008 | Examination requested [2008/49] | 17.07.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.03.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.05.2018 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2018/26] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 20.03.2018 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 17.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 19.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 26.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 21.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 24.03.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 25.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 24.03.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 23.03.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 12 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2004158712 (LEE BYUNG-RAE [KR], et al) [X] 1-12 * abstract * * paragraph [0091] - paragraph [0097] * * figure 7 *; | [I]US2005132208 (HUG JOSHUA D [US], et al) [I] 1-12 * abstract * * paragraph [0002] - paragraph [0004] * * paragraph [0028] - paragraph [0034] ** figures 2,3 *; | [X]KR20050120579 (KOREA ELECTRONICS TELECOMM [KR], et al) [X] 1-12 * the whole document *; | US2010257370 [ ] (YOON KI SONG [KR], et al) [ ] * abstract * * paragraph [0052] - paragraph [0068] * * figure 8 * | International search | [A]WO03073760 (THOMSON LICENSING SA [FR], et al); | [X]US2005022033 (HAN HEE-CHUL [KR]); | [A]KR20050120579 (KOREA ELECTRONICS TELECOMM [KR], et al); | [X]WO2006011768 (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]) | Examination | US2003126086 | US2004193648 |