EP2010996 - METHOD AND APPARATUS TO GENERATE XHTML-PRINT CONTENTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 25.01.2019 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.01.2019 | Refusal of application | published on 27.02.2019 [2019/09] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HP Printing Korea Co., Ltd. 129, Samsung-ro Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do 16677 / KR | [2018/25] |
Former [2017/12] | For all designated states S-Printing Solution Co., Ltd. 129, Samsung-ro Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do 16677 / KR | ||
Former [2012/38] | For all designated states Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 129, Samsung-ro Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do, 443-742 / KR | ||
Former [2009/02] | For all designated states Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 416 Maetan-dong, Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do 442-742 / KR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CHAE, Sung-Won 6-405 Samsung 3-cha Apt. Maetan-dong, Yeongtong-gu, Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do 443-719 / KR | [2009/02] | Representative(s) | Walaski, Jan Filip, et al Venner Shipley LLP 200 Aldersgate London EC1A 4HD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2009/02] | Walaski, Jan Filip, et al Venner Shipley LLP 20 Little Britain London EC1A 7DH / GB | Application number, filing date | 07715720.4 | 20.03.2007 | [2009/02] | WO2007KR01346 | Priority number, date | US20060791412P | 13.04.2006 Original published format: US 791412 P | KR20060043135 | 12.05.2006 Original published format: KR 20060043135 | [2009/02] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007119933 | Date: | 25.10.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/43] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2010996 | Date: | 07.01.2009 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.10.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/02] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 25.10.2007 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.09.2010 | Classification | IPC: | G06F3/12 | [2009/02] | CPC: |
G06F40/143 (EP,US);
G06F3/12 (KR);
G06F16/972 (EP,US);
G06F3/1206 (EP,US);
G06F3/1246 (EP,US);
G06F3/1284 (EP,US);
G06F3/1285 (EP,US);
G06F3/1297 (US);
G06F40/10 (EP,US);
G06K15/02 (US);
H04N1/32128 (EP,US);
H04N2201/3242 (EP,US);
H04N2201/3274 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | FR, GB, IT, NL [2009/19] |
Former [2009/02] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUM ERZEUGEN VON XHTML-DRUCKINHALTEN | [2009/02] | English: | METHOD AND APPARATUS TO GENERATE XHTML-PRINT CONTENTS | [2009/02] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET DISPOSITIF DE PRODUCTION DE CONTENUS D'IMPRESSION XHTML | [2009/02] | Entry into regional phase | 13.10.2008 | National basic fee paid | 13.10.2008 | Search fee paid | 13.10.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.10.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.10.2007 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: KR | 13.10.2008 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.10.2008 | Examination requested [2009/02] | 14.11.2008 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 23.12.2008 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, IS, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 15.10.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 26.04.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.03.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.06.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.09.2018 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2019/09] | 04.09.2018 | Date of oral proceedings | 25.09.2018 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 11.10.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2019/09] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 15.10.2010 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 20.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 19.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 18.03.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 22.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 20.03.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 23.03.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 12 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2002156796 (HISAMATSU YUTAKA [JP], et al) [A] 1,2,7-9,14,15* paragraph [0057] - paragraph [0074]; figure 4 *; | [XI]EP1489813 (HEWLETT PACKARD DEVELOPMENT CO [US]) [X] 1-3,5,7,8,10,13-15 * paragraph [0031] - paragraph [0064] * * figures 1-9 * [I] 4,6,9,11,12 | International search | [X]US2004021902 (OGIWARA SATOSHI [JP], et al); | [X]WO2004050374 (CANON KK [JP], et al); | [A]WO2005109173 (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR], et al) |