EP1978882 - SYSTEM AND METHODS FOR TREATING ATRIAL FIBRILLATION USING ELECTROPORATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 30.04.2010 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.04.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 02.06.2010 [2010/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states AngioDynamics 603 Queensbury Avenue Queensbury, NY 12804 / US | [2008/42] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
RUBINSKY, Borus 1619 Sonoma Avenue Albany, CA 94707 / US | 02 /
MIKUS, Paul 31 Pegasus Drive Coto de Caza, CA 92679 / US | [2008/42] | Representative(s) | Harris, Ian Richard D Young & Co LLP 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2008/42] | Harris, Ian Richard D Young & Co 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | Application number, filing date | 07716249.3 | 03.01.2007 | [2008/42] | WO2007US00084 | Priority number, date | US20060325256 | 03.01.2006 Original published format: US 325256 | [2008/42] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2007079438 | Date: | 12.07.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/28] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1978882 | Date: | 15.10.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.07.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/42] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 21.02.2008 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.02.2009 | Classification | IPC: | A61B18/14 | [2008/42] | CPC: |
A61B18/14 (KR);
A61B18/1482 (EP,US);
A61N1/04 (KR);
A61N1/365 (KR);
A61B18/1477 (EP,US);
A61B2018/00351 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/42] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SYSTEM UND VERFAHREN ZUR BEHANDLUNG VON HERZVORKAMMERFLIMMERN MIT ELEKTROPORATION | [2008/42] | English: | SYSTEM AND METHODS FOR TREATING ATRIAL FIBRILLATION USING ELECTROPORATION | [2008/42] | French: | SYSTEME ET PROCEDES DE TRAITEMENT DE LA FIBRILLATION ATRIALE PAR ELECTROPORATION | [2008/42] | Entry into regional phase | 01.08.2008 | National basic fee paid | 01.08.2008 | Search fee paid | 01.08.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 01.08.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 01.08.2008 | Examination requested [2008/42] | 22.09.2008 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 29.05.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 09.12.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2010/22] | 14.01.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2010/22] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.04.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.2009 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   16.04.2009 | 31.01.2010 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]US2005261672 (DEEM MARK [US], et al) [X] 1,4,6-11,15 * paragraphs [0002] , [0025] , [0058] , [0062] - [0067] - [0074]; figures 8,9A,9B * [Y] 2,3,5,12-14,16; | [Y]US2005171574 (RUBINSKY BORIS [US], et al) [Y] 2,3,5,12,16 * paragraphs [0003] , [0020] , [0025] , [0080] *; | [Y]EP1344497 (RITA MEDICAL SYSTEMS INC [US]) [Y] 13,14 * figure 1 * * paragraphs [0002] , [0022] , [0063] *; | [Y]WO9903412 (SOMNUS MEDICAL TECH INC [US], et al) [Y] 13,14 * figures 4a-ac * * page 12, lines 3-10 * * page 15, lines 16-25 * | International search | [X]US2005261672 (DEEM MARK [US], et al); | [Y]US2005171574 (RUBINSKY BORIS [US], et al) |