EP1977213 - INTEGRATED CENTRAL MANIFOLD FOR ORTHOPEDIC SIMULATOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.04.2020 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 26.04.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 06.12.2018 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 23.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IS | published on 03.08.2022 [2022/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MTS SYSTEMS CORPORATION 14000 Technology Drive, M/S 228 Eden Prairie, MN 55344 / US | [2019/22] |
Former [2008/41] | For all designated states MTS SYSTEMS CORPORATION 14000 Technolog Drive, M/s 228 Eden Prairie, MN 55344 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FAHRENDORFF, Harold F. 4022 Wayzata Boulevard Golden Valley, MN 55416 / US | 02 /
LESKA, Paul J. Sr. 97 Castle Ridge Court Chanhassen, MN 55317 / US | 03 /
WILLIS, Dennis J. 8231 Quinn Road Bloomington, MN 55437 / US | 04 /
SCHULZ, Bradley D. 15224 Aquila Avenue Savage, MN 55378 / US | [2008/41] | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [2019/22] |
Former [2008/41] | Vossius & Partner Siebertstrasse 4 81675 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 07716565.2 | 10.01.2007 | [2008/41] | WO2007US00797 | Priority number, date | US20060332407 | 13.01.2006 Original published format: US 332407 | US20060335974 | 20.01.2006 Original published format: US 335974 | US20060760595P | 20.01.2006 Original published format: US 760595 P | US20070649961 | 05.01.2007 Original published format: US 649961 | [2008/41] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2007084355 | Date: | 26.07.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/30] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1977213 | Date: | 08.10.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.07.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/41] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1977213 | Date: | 29.05.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/22] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 22.05.2008 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.03.2014 | Classification | IPC: | G01B3/00, F16B31/02, G01N3/32, A61F2/46 | [2014/15] | CPC: |
G01N3/32 (EP,US);
A61F2/468 (EP,US);
G01N3/36 (EP,US);
A61F2/4425 (EP,US);
G01N2203/0005 (EP,US);
G01N2203/0019 (EP,US);
G01N2203/0021 (EP,US);
G01N2203/0023 (EP,US);
G01N2203/0044 (EP,US);
G01N2203/0048 (EP,US);
G01N2203/0069 (EP,US);
G01N2203/0089 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2008/41] | G01M19/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2019/22] |
Former [2008/41] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | 07.08.2008 | BA | 07.08.2008 | MK | 07.08.2008 | RS | 07.08.2008 | Title | German: | INTEGRIERTER ZENTRALER VERTEILER FÜR ORTHOPÄDISCHEN SIMULATOR | [2008/41] | English: | INTEGRATED CENTRAL MANIFOLD FOR ORTHOPEDIC SIMULATOR | [2008/41] | French: | COLLECTEUR CENTRAL INTEGRE POUR SIMULATEUR ORTHOPEDIQUE | [2008/41] | Entry into regional phase | 07.08.2008 | National basic fee paid | 07.08.2008 | Search fee paid | 07.08.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.08.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.08.2008 | Examination requested [2008/41] | 06.10.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.01.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.05.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.11.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.02.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.12.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.04.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 17.04.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 17.04.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 03.01.2017 | Opposition(s) | 03.03.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2020/19] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.01.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.01.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.01.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.01.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.01.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 27.01.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 27.01.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 27.01.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 29.01.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 28.01.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 13 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 10.01.2007 | AT | 29.05.2019 | CY | 29.05.2019 | CZ | 29.05.2019 | DK | 29.05.2019 | EE | 29.05.2019 | ES | 29.05.2019 | FI | 29.05.2019 | LT | 29.05.2019 | LV | 29.05.2019 | MC | 29.05.2019 | NL | 29.05.2019 | PL | 29.05.2019 | RO | 29.05.2019 | SE | 29.05.2019 | SI | 29.05.2019 | SK | 29.05.2019 | TR | 29.05.2019 | BG | 29.08.2019 | GR | 30.08.2019 | IS | 29.09.2019 | PT | 30.09.2019 | LU | 10.01.2020 | BE | 31.01.2020 | [2022/30] |
Former [2022/27] | HU | 10.01.2007 | |
AT | 29.05.2019 | ||
CY | 29.05.2019 | ||
CZ | 29.05.2019 | ||
DK | 29.05.2019 | ||
EE | 29.05.2019 | ||
ES | 29.05.2019 | ||
FI | 29.05.2019 | ||
LT | 29.05.2019 | ||
LV | 29.05.2019 | ||
MC | 29.05.2019 | ||
NL | 29.05.2019 | ||
PL | 29.05.2019 | ||
RO | 29.05.2019 | ||
SE | 29.05.2019 | ||
SI | 29.05.2019 | ||
SK | 29.05.2019 | ||
TR | 29.05.2019 | ||
BG | 29.08.2019 | ||
GR | 30.08.2019 | ||
PT | 30.09.2019 | ||
LU | 10.01.2020 | ||
BE | 31.01.2020 | ||
Former [2020/51] | AT | 29.05.2019 | |
CZ | 29.05.2019 | ||
DK | 29.05.2019 | ||
EE | 29.05.2019 | ||
ES | 29.05.2019 | ||
FI | 29.05.2019 | ||
LT | 29.05.2019 | ||
LV | 29.05.2019 | ||
MC | 29.05.2019 | ||
NL | 29.05.2019 | ||
PL | 29.05.2019 | ||
RO | 29.05.2019 | ||
SE | 29.05.2019 | ||
SI | 29.05.2019 | ||
SK | 29.05.2019 | ||
TR | 29.05.2019 | ||
BG | 29.08.2019 | ||
GR | 30.08.2019 | ||
PT | 30.09.2019 | ||
LU | 10.01.2020 | ||
BE | 31.01.2020 | ||
Former [2020/46] | AT | 29.05.2019 | |
CZ | 29.05.2019 | ||
DK | 29.05.2019 | ||
EE | 29.05.2019 | ||
ES | 29.05.2019 | ||
FI | 29.05.2019 | ||
LT | 29.05.2019 | ||
LV | 29.05.2019 | ||
MC | 29.05.2019 | ||
NL | 29.05.2019 | ||
PL | 29.05.2019 | ||
RO | 29.05.2019 | ||
SE | 29.05.2019 | ||
SI | 29.05.2019 | ||
SK | 29.05.2019 | ||
TR | 29.05.2019 | ||
BG | 29.08.2019 | ||
GR | 30.08.2019 | ||
PT | 30.09.2019 | ||
LU | 10.01.2020 | ||
Former [2020/39] | AT | 29.05.2019 | |
CZ | 29.05.2019 | ||
DK | 29.05.2019 | ||
EE | 29.05.2019 | ||
ES | 29.05.2019 | ||
FI | 29.05.2019 | ||
LT | 29.05.2019 | ||
LV | 29.05.2019 | ||
MC | 29.05.2019 | ||
NL | 29.05.2019 | ||
PL | 29.05.2019 | ||
RO | 29.05.2019 | ||
SE | 29.05.2019 | ||
SI | 29.05.2019 | ||
SK | 29.05.2019 | ||
TR | 29.05.2019 | ||
BG | 29.08.2019 | ||
GR | 30.08.2019 | ||
PT | 30.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/25] | AT | 29.05.2019 | |
CZ | 29.05.2019 | ||
DK | 29.05.2019 | ||
EE | 29.05.2019 | ||
ES | 29.05.2019 | ||
FI | 29.05.2019 | ||
LT | 29.05.2019 | ||
LV | 29.05.2019 | ||
NL | 29.05.2019 | ||
PL | 29.05.2019 | ||
RO | 29.05.2019 | ||
SE | 29.05.2019 | ||
SI | 29.05.2019 | ||
SK | 29.05.2019 | ||
TR | 29.05.2019 | ||
BG | 29.08.2019 | ||
GR | 30.08.2019 | ||
PT | 30.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/17] | AT | 29.05.2019 | |
CZ | 29.05.2019 | ||
DK | 29.05.2019 | ||
EE | 29.05.2019 | ||
ES | 29.05.2019 | ||
FI | 29.05.2019 | ||
LT | 29.05.2019 | ||
LV | 29.05.2019 | ||
NL | 29.05.2019 | ||
RO | 29.05.2019 | ||
SE | 29.05.2019 | ||
SK | 29.05.2019 | ||
TR | 29.05.2019 | ||
BG | 29.08.2019 | ||
GR | 30.08.2019 | ||
PT | 30.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/11] | AT | 29.05.2019 | |
CZ | 29.05.2019 | ||
DK | 29.05.2019 | ||
EE | 29.05.2019 | ||
ES | 29.05.2019 | ||
FI | 29.05.2019 | ||
LT | 29.05.2019 | ||
LV | 29.05.2019 | ||
NL | 29.05.2019 | ||
RO | 29.05.2019 | ||
SE | 29.05.2019 | ||
SK | 29.05.2019 | ||
BG | 29.08.2019 | ||
GR | 30.08.2019 | ||
PT | 30.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/10] | AT | 29.05.2019 | |
CZ | 29.05.2019 | ||
DK | 29.05.2019 | ||
ES | 29.05.2019 | ||
FI | 29.05.2019 | ||
LT | 29.05.2019 | ||
LV | 29.05.2019 | ||
NL | 29.05.2019 | ||
RO | 29.05.2019 | ||
SE | 29.05.2019 | ||
BG | 29.08.2019 | ||
GR | 30.08.2019 | ||
PT | 30.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/09] | CZ | 29.05.2019 | |
DK | 29.05.2019 | ||
ES | 29.05.2019 | ||
FI | 29.05.2019 | ||
LT | 29.05.2019 | ||
LV | 29.05.2019 | ||
NL | 29.05.2019 | ||
SE | 29.05.2019 | ||
BG | 29.08.2019 | ||
GR | 30.08.2019 | ||
PT | 30.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/07] | ES | 29.05.2019 | |
FI | 29.05.2019 | ||
LT | 29.05.2019 | ||
LV | 29.05.2019 | ||
NL | 29.05.2019 | ||
SE | 29.05.2019 | ||
BG | 29.08.2019 | ||
GR | 30.08.2019 | ||
PT | 30.09.2019 | ||
Former [2019/51] | ES | 29.05.2019 | |
FI | 29.05.2019 | ||
LT | 29.05.2019 | ||
LV | 29.05.2019 | ||
SE | 29.05.2019 | ||
BG | 29.08.2019 | ||
GR | 30.08.2019 | ||
PT | 30.09.2019 | ||
Former [2019/48] | ES | 29.05.2019 | |
FI | 29.05.2019 | ||
LT | 29.05.2019 | ||
SE | 29.05.2019 | ||
PT | 30.09.2019 | ||
Former [2019/47] | ES | 29.05.2019 | |
FI | 29.05.2019 | ||
LT | 29.05.2019 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US5916800 (ELIZONDO DAVID R [US], et al) [X] 1-16 * figure 3 *; | [X]US2003199083 (VILENDRER KENT [US], et al) [X] 1-16 * paragraphs [0068] - [0071]; figure 9 *; | [X]US2004016301 (MORENO MICHAEL R [US], et al) [X] 1-16 * figure 1 *; | [X]US2004219659 (ALTMAN GREGORY H [US], et al) [X] 1-16 * the whole document *; | [A]US2005106545 (HERUTH KENNETH T [US], et al) [A] 1-16* the whole document * | International search | [Y]GB1108652 (WESTINGHOUSE ELECTRIC CORP); | [X]US5670708 (VILENDRER KENT [US]); | [X]US2003110830 (DEHDASHTIAN MARK [US], et al) | by applicant | US5670708 | US5916800 | US2003110830 | US2003199083 | US2004016301 | US2004219659 |