EP1994776 - VISUAL MAPPING OF FIELD DEVICE MESSAGE ROUTES IN A WIRELESS MESH NETWORK [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.07.2019 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 27.07.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 11.03.2018 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 09.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.07.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 07.08.2019 [2019/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Fisher-Rosemount Systems, Inc. 12301 Research Boulevard Law Department Research Park Plaza, Building III Austin, Texas 78759-2369 / US | [2018/35] |
Former [2008/48] | For all designated states Fisher-Rosemount Systems, Inc. 12301 Research Boulevard Law Department Research Park Plaza, Building III Austen, Texas 78759-2369 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DOBROWSKI, Patrick M. c/o Fisher-Rosemount Systems, Inc. 12301 Research Boulevard - Law Department Research Park Plaza, Building III Austin, Texas 78759-2369 / US | 02 /
LOVEGREN, Eric R. c/o Fisher-Rosemount Systems, Inc. 12301 Research Boulevard - Law Department Research Park Plaza, Building III Austin, Texas 78759-2369 / US | 03 /
ORTH, Kelly M. c/o Fisher-Rosemount Systems, Inc. 12301 Research Boulevard - Law Department Research Park Plaza, Building III Austin, Texas 78759-2369 / US | 04 /
STOTZ, Kyle L. c/o Fisher-Rosemount Systems, Inc. 12301 Research Boulevard - Law Department Research Park Plaza, Building III Austin, Texas 78759-2369 / US | [2018/35] |
Former [2008/48] | 01 /
DOBROWSKI, Patrick, M. c/o Fisher-Rosemount Systems, Inc. 12301 Research Boulevard - Law Department Research Park Plaza, Building III Austin, Texas 78759-2369 / US | ||
02 /
LOVEGREN, Eric, R. c/o Fisher-Rosemount Systems, Inc. 12301 Research Boulevard - Law Department Research Park Plaza, Building III Austin, Texas 78759-2369 / US | |||
03 /
ORTH, Kelly, M. c/o Fisher-Rosemount Systems, Inc. 12301 Research Boulevard - Law Department Research Park Plaza, Building III Austin, Texas 78759-2369 / US | |||
04 /
STOTZ, Kyle, L. c/o Fisher-Rosemount Systems, Inc. 12301 Research Boulevard - Law Department Research Park Plaza, Building III Austin, Texas 78759-2369 / US | Representative(s) | Elsworth, Dominic Stephen Hargreaves Elsworth 26 Northumberland Square North Shields, Tyne & Wear NE30 1PW / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2018/35] | Elsworth, Dominic Stephen Hargreaves Elsworth 26 Northumberland Square North Shields, Tyne&Wear NE30 1PW / GB | ||
Former [2009/39] | Elsworth, Dominic Stephen Hargreaves Elsworth 6 Charlotte Square Newcastle-upon-Tyne NE1 4XF / GB | ||
Former [2008/48] | Elsworth, Dominic Stephen Hargreaves Elsworth Suite 14 6, Charlotte Square Newcastle-upon-Tyne, NE1 4XF / GB | Application number, filing date | 07717793.9 | 11.01.2007 | [2008/48] | WO2007US00678 | Priority number, date | US20060758167P | 11.01.2006 Original published format: US 758167 P | [2008/48] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2007082011 | Date: | 19.07.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/29] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1994776 | Date: | 26.11.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.07.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/48] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1994776 | Date: | 29.08.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/35] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 06.12.2007 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.10.2011 | Classification | IPC: | H04J3/26, H04W40/08, H04W40/10, H04W4/18, H04W8/26, H04W24/08, H04W16/18 | [2018/10] | CPC: |
H04W40/10 (EP,US);
H04L41/00 (EP,US);
H04L41/12 (US);
H04L41/22 (EP,US);
H04L43/045 (EP,US);
H04L47/28 (EP,US);
H04W16/18 (EP,US);
H04W28/02 (EP);
H04W40/08 (EP,US);
H04W40/22 (EP,US);
H04W52/0225 (EP,US);
G05B2219/31162 (EP,US);
H04L45/22 (US);
H04L45/24 (EP,US);
H04L45/28 (EP,US);
H04L47/10 (US);
H04L47/34 (EP,US);
H04W16/22 (EP,US);
H04W24/08 (EP,US);
H04W4/18 (EP,US);
H04W40/00 (EP,US);
H04W40/24 (EP,US);
H04W52/02 (EP,US);
H04W52/0229 (EP,US);
H04W56/00 (EP,US);
H04W76/20 (EP,US);
H04W8/04 (US);
H04W8/26 (EP,US);
H04W80/00 (EP,US);
H04W84/18 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2011/46] | H04J3/26, H04L12/56, H04W40/10 | ||
Former IPC [2008/48] | H04Q7/20 | Designated contracting states | CH, DE, LI [2018/35] |
Former [2009/08] | CH, DE, LI | ||
Former [2008/48] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VISUELLE ABBILDUNG VON NACHRICHTENSTRECKEN EINES FELDGERÄTS IN EINEM DRAHTLOSEN MASCHENNETZ | [2008/48] | English: | VISUAL MAPPING OF FIELD DEVICE MESSAGE ROUTES IN A WIRELESS MESH NETWORK | [2008/48] | French: | CARTOGRAPHIE VISUELLE DE TRAJECTOIRES DE MESSAGES DE DISPOSITIF DE TERRAIN, DANS UN RÉSEAU MAILLÉ SANS FIL | [2008/48] | Entry into regional phase | 11.08.2008 | National basic fee paid | 11.08.2008 | Search fee paid | 11.08.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.08.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.08.2008 | Examination requested [2008/48] | 12.08.2008 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 18.09.2008 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 22.06.2012 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report not received in time | 21.08.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 28.10.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 03.05.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.07.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.12.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.03.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.07.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 23.07.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 23.07.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 28.10.2016 | Opposition(s) | 31.05.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/32] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report/Supplementary European search report | 25.08.2012 | Request for further processing filed | 25.08.2012 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 04.09.2012 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.01.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.08.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 01.08.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.01.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.01.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.01.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 27.01.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 27.01.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 27.01.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 29.01.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.2010 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   02.08.2010 | 31.01.2011 | 05   M06   Fee paid on   01.08.2011 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO9315591 (NOKIA TELECOMMUNICATIONS OY [FI]) [A] 1-20 * page 4, line 35 - page 22, line 26 *; | [A]EP1107512 (SONY INT EUROPE GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-20 * paragraph [0001] - paragraph [0062] *; | [X]WO0210942 (WIRELESS VALLEY COMM INC [US]) [X] 1-20 * page 5, line 5 - page 7, line 7; claims 1,9 * * page 20, line 10 - page 21, line 21 * * page 30, line 6 - page 35, line 14 *; | [A]US2002129138 (CARTER TRENT R [US]) [A] 1-20* paragraph [0006] - paragraph [0011] *; | [X]WO03098447 (MESHNETWORKS INC [US], et al) [X] 1-20 * paragraph [0002] - paragraph [0007] * * paragraph [0026] - paragraph [0037] *; | [X]WO2004066077 (WIRELESS VALLEY COMM INC [US]) [X] 1-20 * page 16, line 20 - page 18, line 4; claims 1-3,44 * * page 36, line 27 - page 38, line 9 * * page 50, line 19 - page 57, line 19 * | International search | [A]US2004001084 (SHRINIDHI NANDINI [US], et al); | [X]US2004259555 (RAPPAPORT THEODORE S [US], et al); | [A]US2005164684 (CHEN DEJI [US], et al); | [A]US2005192727 (SHOSTAK OLEKSANDR T [UA], et al) | by applicant | WO0210942 | WO03098447 | WO2004066077 |