EP1982248 - POWER CONVERTER SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.07.2022 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 30.07.2021 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 18.03.2021 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 27.10.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.04.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY | published on 15.05.2024 [2024/20] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Analog Devices, Inc. One Analog Way Wilmington, MA 01887 / US | [2021/34] |
Former [2008/43] | For all designated states Analog Devices, Inc. Three Technology Way Norwood, Massachusetts 02062 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CHEN, Baoxing 4 Erins Way Westford, MA 01886 / US | 02 /
KLIGER, Ronn 5 Bryant Road Lexington, MA 02420 / US | [2008/43] | Representative(s) | Yang, Shu Withers & Rogers LLP 2 London Bridge London SE1 9RA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2021/35] | Yang, Shu Withers & Rogers LLP 4 More London Riverside London SE1 2AU / GB | ||
Former [2014/34] | Lowe, Alastair Nicholas, et al Withers & Rogers LLP 4 More London Riverside London SE1 2AU / GB | ||
Former [2013/02] | Beck, Simon Antony, et al Withers & Rogers LLP Goldings House 2 Hays Lane London SE1 2HW / GB | ||
Former [2008/43] | Diehl & Partner Patentanwälte Augustenstrasse 46 80333 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 07718141.0 | 18.01.2007 | [2008/43] | WO2007US01140 | Priority number, date | US20060335409 | 19.01.2006 Original published format: US 335409 | [2008/43] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2007084506 | Date: | 26.07.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/30] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1982248 | Date: | 22.10.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.07.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/43] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1982248 | Date: | 01.09.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/35] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 26.06.2008 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.06.2014 | Classification | IPC: | H02M3/335, H02M3/338 | [2014/28] | CPC: |
H02M3/3387 (EP,US);
H02M3/335 (KR);
H02M3/33523 (EP,US);
H02M3/33573 (EP,KR,US);
H02M3/33576 (EP,US);
H02M3/01 (EP,KR,US);
Y02B70/10 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2008/43] | G05F1/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2021/35] |
Former [2008/43] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | STROMWANDLERSYSTEM | [2008/43] | English: | POWER CONVERTER SYSTEM | [2008/43] | French: | SYSTÈME CONVERTISSEUR DE PUISSANCE | [2008/43] | Entry into regional phase | 19.08.2008 | National basic fee paid | 19.08.2008 | Search fee paid | 19.08.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.08.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.08.2008 | Examination requested [2008/43] | 19.12.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 31.10.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 26.04.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.12.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.04.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.10.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.02.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.03.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.07.2021 | Fee for grant paid | 22.07.2021 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 22.07.2021 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 31.10.2017 | Opposition(s) | 02.06.2022 | No opposition filed within time limit [2022/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.01.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.07.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 24.01.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 17.01.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 09.01.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 14.01.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 09.01.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 24.01.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 24.01.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 21.01.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | 20.01.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 15 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.2009 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   26.03.2009 | 31.01.2012 | 06   M06   Fee paid on   30.07.2012 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 18.01.2007 | AT | 01.09.2021 | CY | 01.09.2021 | CZ | 01.09.2021 | DK | 01.09.2021 | EE | 01.09.2021 | ES | 01.09.2021 | FI | 01.09.2021 | IT | 01.09.2021 | LT | 01.09.2021 | LV | 01.09.2021 | MC | 01.09.2021 | NL | 01.09.2021 | PL | 01.09.2021 | RO | 01.09.2021 | SE | 01.09.2021 | SI | 01.09.2021 | SK | 01.09.2021 | BG | 01.12.2021 | GR | 02.12.2021 | IS | 01.01.2022 | PT | 03.01.2022 | IE | 18.01.2022 | LU | 18.01.2022 | BE | 31.01.2022 | CH | 31.01.2022 | LI | 31.01.2022 | [2024/20] |
Former [2024/18] | HU | 18.01.2007 | |
AT | 01.09.2021 | ||
CZ | 01.09.2021 | ||
DK | 01.09.2021 | ||
EE | 01.09.2021 | ||
ES | 01.09.2021 | ||
FI | 01.09.2021 | ||
IT | 01.09.2021 | ||
LT | 01.09.2021 | ||
LV | 01.09.2021 | ||
MC | 01.09.2021 | ||
NL | 01.09.2021 | ||
PL | 01.09.2021 | ||
RO | 01.09.2021 | ||
SE | 01.09.2021 | ||
SI | 01.09.2021 | ||
SK | 01.09.2021 | ||
BG | 01.12.2021 | ||
GR | 02.12.2021 | ||
IS | 01.01.2022 | ||
PT | 03.01.2022 | ||
IE | 18.01.2022 | ||
LU | 18.01.2022 | ||
BE | 31.01.2022 | ||
CH | 31.01.2022 | ||
LI | 31.01.2022 | ||
Former [2023/09] | AT | 01.09.2021 | |
CZ | 01.09.2021 | ||
DK | 01.09.2021 | ||
EE | 01.09.2021 | ||
ES | 01.09.2021 | ||
FI | 01.09.2021 | ||
IT | 01.09.2021 | ||
LT | 01.09.2021 | ||
LV | 01.09.2021 | ||
MC | 01.09.2021 | ||
NL | 01.09.2021 | ||
PL | 01.09.2021 | ||
RO | 01.09.2021 | ||
SE | 01.09.2021 | ||
SI | 01.09.2021 | ||
SK | 01.09.2021 | ||
BG | 01.12.2021 | ||
GR | 02.12.2021 | ||
IS | 01.01.2022 | ||
PT | 03.01.2022 | ||
IE | 18.01.2022 | ||
LU | 18.01.2022 | ||
BE | 31.01.2022 | ||
CH | 31.01.2022 | ||
LI | 31.01.2022 | ||
Former [2023/03] | AT | 01.09.2021 | |
CZ | 01.09.2021 | ||
DK | 01.09.2021 | ||
EE | 01.09.2021 | ||
ES | 01.09.2021 | ||
FI | 01.09.2021 | ||
IT | 01.09.2021 | ||
LT | 01.09.2021 | ||
LV | 01.09.2021 | ||
MC | 01.09.2021 | ||
NL | 01.09.2021 | ||
PL | 01.09.2021 | ||
RO | 01.09.2021 | ||
SE | 01.09.2021 | ||
SI | 01.09.2021 | ||
SK | 01.09.2021 | ||
BG | 01.12.2021 | ||
GR | 02.12.2021 | ||
IS | 01.01.2022 | ||
PT | 03.01.2022 | ||
LU | 18.01.2022 | ||
BE | 31.01.2022 | ||
CH | 31.01.2022 | ||
LI | 31.01.2022 | ||
Former [2023/01] | AT | 01.09.2021 | |
CZ | 01.09.2021 | ||
DK | 01.09.2021 | ||
EE | 01.09.2021 | ||
ES | 01.09.2021 | ||
FI | 01.09.2021 | ||
IT | 01.09.2021 | ||
LT | 01.09.2021 | ||
LV | 01.09.2021 | ||
MC | 01.09.2021 | ||
NL | 01.09.2021 | ||
PL | 01.09.2021 | ||
RO | 01.09.2021 | ||
SE | 01.09.2021 | ||
SI | 01.09.2021 | ||
SK | 01.09.2021 | ||
BG | 01.12.2021 | ||
GR | 02.12.2021 | ||
IS | 01.01.2022 | ||
PT | 03.01.2022 | ||
LU | 18.01.2022 | ||
BE | 31.01.2022 | ||
Former [2022/46] | AT | 01.09.2021 | |
CZ | 01.09.2021 | ||
DK | 01.09.2021 | ||
EE | 01.09.2021 | ||
ES | 01.09.2021 | ||
FI | 01.09.2021 | ||
IT | 01.09.2021 | ||
LT | 01.09.2021 | ||
LV | 01.09.2021 | ||
MC | 01.09.2021 | ||
NL | 01.09.2021 | ||
PL | 01.09.2021 | ||
RO | 01.09.2021 | ||
SE | 01.09.2021 | ||
SI | 01.09.2021 | ||
SK | 01.09.2021 | ||
BG | 01.12.2021 | ||
GR | 02.12.2021 | ||
IS | 01.01.2022 | ||
PT | 03.01.2022 | ||
LU | 18.01.2022 | ||
Former [2022/39] | AT | 01.09.2021 | |
CZ | 01.09.2021 | ||
DK | 01.09.2021 | ||
EE | 01.09.2021 | ||
ES | 01.09.2021 | ||
FI | 01.09.2021 | ||
IT | 01.09.2021 | ||
LT | 01.09.2021 | ||
LV | 01.09.2021 | ||
MC | 01.09.2021 | ||
NL | 01.09.2021 | ||
PL | 01.09.2021 | ||
RO | 01.09.2021 | ||
SE | 01.09.2021 | ||
SI | 01.09.2021 | ||
SK | 01.09.2021 | ||
BG | 01.12.2021 | ||
GR | 02.12.2021 | ||
IS | 01.01.2022 | ||
PT | 03.01.2022 | ||
Former [2022/36] | AT | 01.09.2021 | |
CZ | 01.09.2021 | ||
DK | 01.09.2021 | ||
EE | 01.09.2021 | ||
ES | 01.09.2021 | ||
FI | 01.09.2021 | ||
IT | 01.09.2021 | ||
LT | 01.09.2021 | ||
LV | 01.09.2021 | ||
NL | 01.09.2021 | ||
PL | 01.09.2021 | ||
RO | 01.09.2021 | ||
SE | 01.09.2021 | ||
SI | 01.09.2021 | ||
SK | 01.09.2021 | ||
BG | 01.12.2021 | ||
GR | 02.12.2021 | ||
IS | 01.01.2022 | ||
PT | 03.01.2022 | ||
Former [2022/24] | AT | 01.09.2021 | |
CZ | 01.09.2021 | ||
EE | 01.09.2021 | ||
ES | 01.09.2021 | ||
FI | 01.09.2021 | ||
LT | 01.09.2021 | ||
LV | 01.09.2021 | ||
NL | 01.09.2021 | ||
PL | 01.09.2021 | ||
RO | 01.09.2021 | ||
SE | 01.09.2021 | ||
SK | 01.09.2021 | ||
BG | 01.12.2021 | ||
GR | 02.12.2021 | ||
IS | 01.01.2022 | ||
PT | 03.01.2022 | ||
Former [2022/21] | AT | 01.09.2021 | |
ES | 01.09.2021 | ||
FI | 01.09.2021 | ||
LT | 01.09.2021 | ||
LV | 01.09.2021 | ||
PL | 01.09.2021 | ||
SE | 01.09.2021 | ||
BG | 01.12.2021 | ||
GR | 02.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/12] | ES | 01.09.2021 | |
FI | 01.09.2021 | ||
LT | 01.09.2021 | ||
LV | 01.09.2021 | ||
PL | 01.09.2021 | ||
SE | 01.09.2021 | ||
BG | 01.12.2021 | ||
GR | 02.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/08] | ES | 01.09.2021 | |
FI | 01.09.2021 | ||
LT | 01.09.2021 | ||
SE | 01.09.2021 | ||
BG | 01.12.2021 | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]US6072702 (NAKAO FUMIAKI [JP], et al) [X] 1-4,6-8,13-17 * abstract * [Y] 5,14; | [AD]US6291907 (HAIGH GEOFFREY T [US], et al) [AD] 1-8,13-17* abstract *; | [XY]US6911848 (VINCIARELLI PATRIZIO [US]) [X] 1-4,6,7,13-17 * abstract * [Y] 5,14; | [Y]US2005174184 (WU YUE [US]) [Y] 5,14 * abstract * | International search | [A]US5327030 (DEVITO LAWRENCE M [US], et al); | [Y]EP0708529 (PLESSEY SEMICONDUCTORS LTD [GB]); | [A]US2004184289 (VINCIARELLI PATRIZIO [US]); | [X]US6911848 (VINCIARELLI PATRIZIO [US]) | Examination | US4443839 | US6317338 | US2005242789 | - YAMASAWA K, "A DC-DC Converter Using a Microtransformer", IEEE TRANSLATION JOURNAL ON MAGNETICS IN JAPAN, IEEE INC, NEW YORK, US, (19940701), vol. 6, no. 4, ISSN 0882-4959, pages 120 - 126, XP011231191 | by applicant | US6072702 | US6911848 | US2005174184 |