EP1973989 - FLAME RETARDANT RESIN COMPOSITION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 15.01.2010 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.01.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 17.02.2010 [2010/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY 1 River Road Schenectady, NY 12345 / US | [2008/40] |
Former [2008/38] | For all designated states General Electric Company One River Road Schenectady, NY 12345 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MEDIRATTA, Gaurav F-2, Chennu Homes 1st Coss, Kagadaspura C.V. Raman Nagar Bangalore, Karnataka 560093 / IN | 02 /
PAL, Subodh, Kumar No. 202, IIIrd Cross Hanumappa Road New Thippasandra Bangalore, Karnataka 560775 / IN | 03 /
SINHA, Reema No. 37, IInd Floor, 1st Main Michaelpalaya, Bangalore 560075 / IN | 04 /
KRISHNASWAMI, Srinivasan P-106, 7th Main Sector 10, Jeevanbheema Nagar Bangalore, Karnataka 560075 / IN | 05 /
RAVI, Gomatam, Raghavan O-61, Diamond District Airport Road Bangalore, Karnataka 560008 / IN | 06 /
VAN DER WEELE, Chris Vink 3 Sommelsdijk / NL | 07 /
KONDURI, Rama 140 Avenida Las Brisas Evansville, IN 47712 / US | 08 /
MILLER, Kenneth, Frederick 2 Old Orchard Road Mount Vernon, IN 47620 / US | [2008/40] | Representative(s) | Müller, Frank Peter, et al Müller Schupfner & Partner Patent- und Rechtsanwaltspartnerschaft mbB Bavariaring 11 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/40] | Müller, Frank Peter, et al Müller Schupfner & Partner Patentanwälte Bavariaring 11 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 07718183.2 | 18.01.2007 | [2008/40] | WO2007US01435 | Priority number, date | US20060336503 | 20.01.2006 Original published format: US 336503 | [2008/40] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2007084664 | Date: | 26.07.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/30] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1973989 | Date: | 01.10.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.07.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/40] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 07.09.2007 | Classification | IPC: | C09K21/12, C09K21/14, C08K3/32 | [2008/40] | CPC: |
C09K21/12 (EP,US);
C08L67/00 (EP,US);
C09K21/14 (EP,US);
C08K3/32 (EP,US);
C08K5/0066 (EP,US);
C08K5/49 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
C08L67/00, C08L2666/02 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/40] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | FLAMMHEMMENDE HARZZUSAMMENSETZUNG | [2008/40] | English: | FLAME RETARDANT RESIN COMPOSITION | [2008/40] | French: | COMPOSITION DE RESINE IGNIFUGE | [2008/40] | Entry into regional phase | 24.06.2008 | National basic fee paid | 24.06.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.06.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.06.2008 | Examination requested [2008/40] | 09.09.2008 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.05.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 31.07.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2010/07] | 14.09.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2010/07] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.01.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]WO2005121232 (ITALMATCH CHEMICALS SPA [IT], et al) [A] 1-31 * page 4, line 10 - page 6, line 25; claims 1-18 *; | [A]WO2005059018 (GEN ELECTRIC [US], et al) [A] 1-31 * pages 5-6; claims 1-10 * * pages 9-10 * |