EP1974457 - METHOD FOR CONTROLLING A POLYPHASE ROTATING ELECTRICAL MACHINE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.06.2014 Database last updated on 10.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.07.2016 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 17.08.2016 [2016/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states VALEO EQUIPEMENTS ELECTRIQUES MOTEUR 2, rue André Boulle 94046 Créteil Cedex / FR | [2013/33] |
Former [2008/40] | For all designated states VALEO EQUIPEMENTS ELECTRIQUES MOTEUR 2, Rue André Boulle 94046 Créteil Cedex / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MASFARAUD, Julien 9 rue de Mazagran 75010 Paris / FR | 02 /
DOFFIN, Hugues 25 rue Cheret 94000 Créteil / FR | 03 /
BOUDJEMAI, Farouk 2 rue Jean Duboscq 91460 Marcoussis / FR | [2013/20] |
Former [2008/40] | 01 /
MASFARAUD, Julien 9 rue de Mazagran 75010 Paris / FR | ||
02 /
DOFFIN, Hugues 25 rue chéret Créteil 94000 / FR | |||
03 /
BOUDJEMAI, Farouk 2 rue Jean Duboscq 91460 Marcoussis / FR | Application number, filing date | 07718317.6 | 05.01.2007 | [2008/40] | WO2007FR50617 | Priority number, date | FR20060000536 | 20.01.2006 Original published format: FR 0600536 | [2008/40] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2007083049 | Date: | 26.07.2007 | Language: | FR | [2007/30] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1974457 | Date: | 01.10.2008 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.07.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/40] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1974457 | Date: | 14.08.2013 | Language: | FR | [2013/33] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 11.10.2007 | Classification | IPC: | H02P6/14 | [2008/40] | CPC: |
H02P6/15 (EP,US);
H02P25/034 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/40] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUM REGELN EINER ROTIERENDEN MEHRPHASIGEN ELEKTRISCHEN MASCHINE | [2013/18] | English: | METHOD FOR CONTROLLING A POLYPHASE ROTATING ELECTRICAL MACHINE | [2008/40] | French: | PROCEDE DE COMMANDE D'UNE MACHINE ELECTRIQUE TOURNANTE POLYPHASEE | [2008/40] |
Former [2008/40] | VORRICHTUNG ZUR STEUERUNG EINER ELEKTRISCHEN POLYPHASEN-ROTATIONSMASCHINE | Entry into regional phase | 17.06.2008 | National basic fee paid | 17.06.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.06.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.06.2008 | Examination requested [2008/40] | 07.11.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.03.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.04.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.06.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 28.06.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 07.11.2012 | Opposition(s) | 15.05.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.12.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.12.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 17.12.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 16.12.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 13.12.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 05.01.2007 | AT | 14.08.2013 | BG | 14.08.2013 | CY | 14.08.2013 | CZ | 14.08.2013 | DK | 14.08.2013 | EE | 14.08.2013 | FI | 14.08.2013 | IT | 14.08.2013 | LT | 14.08.2013 | LV | 14.08.2013 | MC | 14.08.2013 | NL | 14.08.2013 | PL | 14.08.2013 | RO | 14.08.2013 | SE | 14.08.2013 | SI | 14.08.2013 | SK | 14.08.2013 | TR | 14.08.2013 | GR | 15.11.2013 | IS | 14.12.2013 | PT | 16.12.2013 | GB | 05.01.2014 | IE | 05.01.2014 | LU | 05.01.2014 | BE | 31.01.2014 | CH | 31.01.2014 | LI | 31.01.2014 | [2016/33] |
Former [2016/32] | HU | 05.01.2007 | |
AT | 14.08.2013 | ||
BG | 14.08.2013 | ||
CY | 14.08.2013 | ||
CZ | 14.08.2013 | ||
DK | 14.08.2013 | ||
EE | 14.08.2013 | ||
FI | 14.08.2013 | ||
IT | 14.08.2013 | ||
LT | 14.08.2013 | ||
LV | 14.08.2013 | ||
MC | 14.08.2013 | ||
NL | 14.08.2013 | ||
PL | 14.08.2013 | ||
RO | 14.08.2013 | ||
SE | 14.08.2013 | ||
SI | 14.08.2013 | ||
SK | 14.08.2013 | ||
GR | 15.11.2013 | ||
IS | 14.12.2013 | ||
PT | 16.12.2013 | ||
GB | 05.01.2014 | ||
IE | 05.01.2014 | ||
LU | 05.01.2014 | ||
BE | 31.01.2014 | ||
CH | 31.01.2014 | ||
LI | 31.01.2014 | ||
Former [2016/25] | AT | 14.08.2013 | |
BG | 14.08.2013 | ||
CY | 14.08.2013 | ||
CZ | 14.08.2013 | ||
DK | 14.08.2013 | ||
EE | 14.08.2013 | ||
FI | 14.08.2013 | ||
IT | 14.08.2013 | ||
LT | 14.08.2013 | ||
LV | 14.08.2013 | ||
MC | 14.08.2013 | ||
NL | 14.08.2013 | ||
PL | 14.08.2013 | ||
RO | 14.08.2013 | ||
SE | 14.08.2013 | ||
SI | 14.08.2013 | ||
SK | 14.08.2013 | ||
GR | 15.11.2013 | ||
IS | 14.12.2013 | ||
PT | 16.12.2013 | ||
GB | 05.01.2014 | ||
IE | 05.01.2014 | ||
LU | 05.01.2014 | ||
BE | 31.01.2014 | ||
CH | 31.01.2014 | ||
LI | 31.01.2014 | ||
Former [2015/08] | AT | 14.08.2013 | |
CY | 14.08.2013 | ||
CZ | 14.08.2013 | ||
DK | 14.08.2013 | ||
EE | 14.08.2013 | ||
FI | 14.08.2013 | ||
IT | 14.08.2013 | ||
LT | 14.08.2013 | ||
LV | 14.08.2013 | ||
MC | 14.08.2013 | ||
NL | 14.08.2013 | ||
PL | 14.08.2013 | ||
RO | 14.08.2013 | ||
SE | 14.08.2013 | ||
SI | 14.08.2013 | ||
SK | 14.08.2013 | ||
GR | 15.11.2013 | ||
IS | 14.12.2013 | ||
PT | 16.12.2013 | ||
GB | 05.01.2014 | ||
IE | 05.01.2014 | ||
LU | 05.01.2014 | ||
BE | 31.01.2014 | ||
CH | 31.01.2014 | ||
LI | 31.01.2014 | ||
Former [2015/07] | AT | 14.08.2013 | |
CY | 14.08.2013 | ||
CZ | 14.08.2013 | ||
DK | 14.08.2013 | ||
EE | 14.08.2013 | ||
FI | 14.08.2013 | ||
IT | 14.08.2013 | ||
LT | 14.08.2013 | ||
LV | 14.08.2013 | ||
MC | 14.08.2013 | ||
NL | 14.08.2013 | ||
PL | 14.08.2013 | ||
RO | 14.08.2013 | ||
SE | 14.08.2013 | ||
SI | 14.08.2013 | ||
SK | 14.08.2013 | ||
GR | 15.11.2013 | ||
IS | 14.12.2013 | ||
PT | 16.12.2013 | ||
GB | 05.01.2014 | ||
IE | 05.01.2014 | ||
LU | 05.01.2014 | ||
CH | 31.01.2014 | ||
LI | 31.01.2014 | ||
Former [2014/51] | AT | 14.08.2013 | |
CY | 14.08.2013 | ||
CZ | 14.08.2013 | ||
DK | 14.08.2013 | ||
EE | 14.08.2013 | ||
FI | 14.08.2013 | ||
IT | 14.08.2013 | ||
LT | 14.08.2013 | ||
LV | 14.08.2013 | ||
MC | 14.08.2013 | ||
NL | 14.08.2013 | ||
PL | 14.08.2013 | ||
RO | 14.08.2013 | ||
SE | 14.08.2013 | ||
SI | 14.08.2013 | ||
SK | 14.08.2013 | ||
GR | 15.11.2013 | ||
IS | 14.12.2013 | ||
PT | 16.12.2013 | ||
GB | 05.01.2014 | ||
LU | 05.01.2014 | ||
CH | 31.01.2014 | ||
LI | 31.01.2014 | ||
Former [2014/46] | AT | 14.08.2013 | |
CY | 14.08.2013 | ||
CZ | 14.08.2013 | ||
DK | 14.08.2013 | ||
EE | 14.08.2013 | ||
FI | 14.08.2013 | ||
IT | 14.08.2013 | ||
LT | 14.08.2013 | ||
LV | 14.08.2013 | ||
MC | 14.08.2013 | ||
NL | 14.08.2013 | ||
PL | 14.08.2013 | ||
RO | 14.08.2013 | ||
SE | 14.08.2013 | ||
SI | 14.08.2013 | ||
SK | 14.08.2013 | ||
GR | 15.11.2013 | ||
IS | 14.12.2013 | ||
PT | 16.12.2013 | ||
LU | 05.01.2014 | ||
CH | 31.01.2014 | ||
LI | 31.01.2014 | ||
Former [2014/41] | AT | 14.08.2013 | |
CY | 14.08.2013 | ||
CZ | 14.08.2013 | ||
DK | 14.08.2013 | ||
EE | 14.08.2013 | ||
FI | 14.08.2013 | ||
IT | 14.08.2013 | ||
LT | 14.08.2013 | ||
LV | 14.08.2013 | ||
MC | 14.08.2013 | ||
NL | 14.08.2013 | ||
PL | 14.08.2013 | ||
RO | 14.08.2013 | ||
SE | 14.08.2013 | ||
SI | 14.08.2013 | ||
SK | 14.08.2013 | ||
GR | 15.11.2013 | ||
IS | 14.12.2013 | ||
PT | 16.12.2013 | ||
LU | 05.01.2014 | ||
Former [2014/38] | AT | 14.08.2013 | |
CY | 14.08.2013 | ||
CZ | 14.08.2013 | ||
DK | 14.08.2013 | ||
EE | 14.08.2013 | ||
FI | 14.08.2013 | ||
IT | 14.08.2013 | ||
LT | 14.08.2013 | ||
LV | 14.08.2013 | ||
MC | 14.08.2013 | ||
NL | 14.08.2013 | ||
PL | 14.08.2013 | ||
RO | 14.08.2013 | ||
SE | 14.08.2013 | ||
SI | 14.08.2013 | ||
SK | 14.08.2013 | ||
GR | 15.11.2013 | ||
IS | 14.12.2013 | ||
PT | 16.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/24] | AT | 14.08.2013 | |
CY | 14.08.2013 | ||
CZ | 14.08.2013 | ||
DK | 14.08.2013 | ||
EE | 14.08.2013 | ||
FI | 14.08.2013 | ||
IT | 14.08.2013 | ||
LT | 14.08.2013 | ||
LV | 14.08.2013 | ||
NL | 14.08.2013 | ||
PL | 14.08.2013 | ||
RO | 14.08.2013 | ||
SE | 14.08.2013 | ||
SI | 14.08.2013 | ||
SK | 14.08.2013 | ||
GR | 15.11.2013 | ||
IS | 14.12.2013 | ||
PT | 16.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/23] | AT | 14.08.2013 | |
CY | 14.08.2013 | ||
CZ | 14.08.2013 | ||
DK | 14.08.2013 | ||
EE | 14.08.2013 | ||
FI | 14.08.2013 | ||
LT | 14.08.2013 | ||
LV | 14.08.2013 | ||
NL | 14.08.2013 | ||
PL | 14.08.2013 | ||
RO | 14.08.2013 | ||
SE | 14.08.2013 | ||
SI | 14.08.2013 | ||
SK | 14.08.2013 | ||
GR | 15.11.2013 | ||
IS | 14.12.2013 | ||
PT | 16.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/22] | AT | 14.08.2013 | |
CY | 14.08.2013 | ||
DK | 14.08.2013 | ||
FI | 14.08.2013 | ||
LT | 14.08.2013 | ||
LV | 14.08.2013 | ||
NL | 14.08.2013 | ||
PL | 14.08.2013 | ||
RO | 14.08.2013 | ||
SE | 14.08.2013 | ||
SI | 14.08.2013 | ||
GR | 15.11.2013 | ||
IS | 14.12.2013 | ||
PT | 16.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/21] | AT | 14.08.2013 | |
CY | 14.08.2013 | ||
DK | 14.08.2013 | ||
FI | 14.08.2013 | ||
LT | 14.08.2013 | ||
LV | 14.08.2013 | ||
PL | 14.08.2013 | ||
SE | 14.08.2013 | ||
SI | 14.08.2013 | ||
GR | 15.11.2013 | ||
IS | 14.12.2013 | ||
PT | 16.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/18] | AT | 14.08.2013 | |
CY | 14.08.2013 | ||
FI | 14.08.2013 | ||
LT | 14.08.2013 | ||
LV | 14.08.2013 | ||
PL | 14.08.2013 | ||
SE | 14.08.2013 | ||
SI | 14.08.2013 | ||
GR | 15.11.2013 | ||
IS | 14.12.2013 | ||
PT | 16.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/12] | CY | 26.06.2013 | |
AT | 14.08.2013 | ||
FI | 14.08.2013 | ||
LT | 14.08.2013 | ||
LV | 14.08.2013 | ||
PL | 14.08.2013 | ||
SE | 14.08.2013 | ||
SI | 14.08.2013 | ||
GR | 15.11.2013 | ||
IS | 14.12.2013 | ||
PT | 16.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/11] | CY | 26.06.2013 | |
AT | 14.08.2013 | ||
FI | 14.08.2013 | ||
LT | 14.08.2013 | ||
PL | 14.08.2013 | ||
SE | 14.08.2013 | ||
IS | 14.12.2013 | ||
PT | 16.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/10] | CY | 26.06.2013 | |
AT | 14.08.2013 | ||
LT | 14.08.2013 | ||
SE | 14.08.2013 | ||
IS | 14.12.2013 | ||
PT | 16.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/09] | AT | 14.08.2013 | |
LT | 14.08.2013 | ||
SE | 14.08.2013 | ||
PT | 16.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/08] | LT | 14.08.2013 | |
PT | 16.12.2013 | Cited in | International search | [XAY]FR2026121 (SIEMENS AG) [X] 1-3,11 * page 3, line 26 - page 4, line 36 * [A] 4 [Y] 5-10,12-14; | [Y]EP0260176 (VALEO [FR]) [Y] 5-10 * page 4, line 47 - line 58 *; | [A]US4271385 (AZUSAWA NOBORU) [A] 1-11 * column 5, line 51 - line 66 *; | [Y]US2005283324 (SWANSON DAVID F [US]) [Y] 12-14 * paragraph [0043] *; | [DA]WO2004100351 (VALEO EQUIP ELECTR MOTEUR [FR], et al) [DA] 12-14 * page 6, line 10 - line 19 *; | [A]US6924611 (TZENG GUANG-NAN [TW], et al) [A] 12-14 * abstract *; | [A]US3909688 (BLASCHKE FELIX, et al) [A] 12-14 * abstract * |