EP1984423 - PROCESS FOR PRODUCING POLYTRIMETHYLENE ETHER GLYCOL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 25.12.2009 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.12.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 27.01.2010 [2010/04] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states E. I. du Pont de Nemours and Company 1007 Market Street Wilmington, DE 19898 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2008/44] | For all designated states E.I. DU PONT DE NEMOURS AND COMPANY 1007 Market Street Wilmington, DE 19898 / US | ||
Former [2008/30] | For all designated states E.I. du Pont de Nemours and Company 1007 Market Street Wilmington, DE 19898 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SUNKARA, Hari, Babu 3 Fritze Court Hockessin, Delaware 19707 / US | 02 /
NG, Howard, C. 896 Nottinghill Avenue Kingston, Ontario K70 2B4 / CA | 03 /
ZHENG, Wei 511-790 Springland Drive Ottawa, Ontario K1V 6L7 / CA | [2008/44] | Representative(s) | Hirsch, Marc-Roger Hirsch & Associés 58, Avenue Marceau 75008 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2008/44] | Hirsch, Marc-Roger Cabinet Hirsch & Associates Law Office 58, avenue Marceau 75008 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 07718333.3 | 19.01.2007 | [2008/44] | WO2007US01373 | Priority number, date | US20060761291P | 23.01.2006 Original published format: US 761291 P | [2008/44] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2007084636 | Date: | 26.07.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/30] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1984423 | Date: | 29.10.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.07.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/44] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 22.11.2007 | Classification | IPC: | C08G65/34 | [2008/44] | CPC: |
C08G65/34 (EP,KR,US);
C07C41/09 (EP,US);
C08G65/26 (KR)
| C-Set: |
C07C41/09, C07C43/13 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, NL [2009/01] |
Former [2008/44] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON POLYTRIMETHYLEN-ETHER-GLYKOL | [2008/44] | English: | PROCESS FOR PRODUCING POLYTRIMETHYLENE ETHER GLYCOL | [2008/44] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE PRODUCTION DE POLYTRIMÉTHYLÈNE ÉTHER GLYCOL | [2008/44] | Entry into regional phase | 25.07.2008 | National basic fee paid | 25.07.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.07.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.07.2008 | Examination requested [2008/44] | 26.08.2008 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 02.10.2008 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, FI, GR, HU, IE, IS, LT, LU, LV, MC, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 02.10.2008 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) ES | 26.03.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.08.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2010/04] | 11.09.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2010/04] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.07.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US2005272911 (OKOSHI TORU [JP], et al) [A] 1-12 * examples 1-5; claims 1-12 *; | [A]JP2004182974 (MITSUBISHI CHEM CORP) [A] 1-12 * the whole document *; | [A]WO0144348 (DU PONT [US]) [A] 1-12 * the whole document * |