EP2027385 - DEVICE FOR INJECTING FUEL INTO THE COMBUSTION CHAMBER OF AN INTERNAL COMBUSTION ENGINE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.02.2011 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.08.2014 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): GR | published on 17.09.2014 [2014/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ROBERT BOSCH GMBH Wernerstrasse 51 70469 Stuttgart-Feuerbach / DE | For all designated states AVL List GmbH Hans-List-Platz 1 8020 Graz / AT | [2009/09] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KAMMERSTETTER, Heribert Zenzlmühlstrasse 3 5411 Oberalm / AT | 02 /
HLOUSEK, Jaroslav Markt 359 5440 Golling / AT | 03 /
GRASPEUNTNER, Christian Wiestallandesstrasse 31c 5400 Hallein / AT | 04 /
KATHAN, Markus Fischhornstrasse 4 5020 Salzburg / AT | 05 /
MEISL, Christian Steinerweg 34 5412 St. Jakob / AT | [2009/09] | Representative(s) | Haffner und Keschmann Patentanwälte GmbH Schottengasse 3a 1014 Wien / AT | [N/P] |
Former [2009/09] | Haffner und Keschmann Patentanwälte OG Schottengasse 3a 1014 Wien / AT | Application number, filing date | 07718497.6 | 13.06.2007 | [2009/09] | WO2007AT00286 | Priority number, date | AT20060001008 | 13.06.2006 Original published format: AT 10082006 | AT20070000065 | 12.01.2007 Original published format: AT 652007 | [2009/09] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007143768 | Date: | 21.12.2007 | Language: | DE | [2007/51] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2027385 | Date: | 25.02.2009 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.12.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/09] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2027385 | Date: | 31.03.2010 | Language: | DE | [2010/13] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 21.12.2007 | Classification | IPC: | F02M55/02, F02M55/04 | [2009/09] | CPC: |
F02M47/027 (EP,US);
F02M2200/28 (EP,US);
F02M2200/315 (EP,US);
F02M2547/001 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/09] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG ZUM EINSPRITZEN VON KRAFTSTOFF IN DEN BRENNRAUM EINER BRENNKRAFTMASCHINE | [2009/09] | English: | DEVICE FOR INJECTING FUEL INTO THE COMBUSTION CHAMBER OF AN INTERNAL COMBUSTION ENGINE | [2009/09] | French: | DISPOSITIF D'INJECTION DE CARBURANT DANS UNE CHAMBRE DE COMBUSTION D'UN MOTEUR À COMBUSTION INTERNE | [2009/09] | Entry into regional phase | 20.11.2008 | National basic fee paid | 20.11.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.11.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.11.2008 | Examination requested [2009/09] | 27.10.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.02.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 16.02.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 04.01.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/10] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.05.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 31.03.2010 | CZ | 31.03.2010 | DK | 31.03.2010 | EE | 31.03.2010 | GR | 31.03.2010 | IE | 31.03.2010 | LT | 31.03.2010 | LV | 31.03.2010 | MT | 31.03.2010 | NL | 31.03.2010 | PL | 31.03.2010 | RO | 31.03.2010 | SE | 31.03.2010 | SI | 31.03.2010 | SK | 31.03.2010 | TR | 31.03.2010 | LU | 13.06.2010 | BE | 30.06.2010 | BG | 30.06.2010 | MC | 30.06.2010 | ES | 12.07.2010 | IS | 31.07.2010 | PT | 02.08.2010 | HU | 01.10.2010 | [2014/38] |
Former [2013/42] | CY | 31.03.2010 | |
CZ | 31.03.2010 | ||
DK | 31.03.2010 | ||
EE | 31.03.2010 | ||
IE | 31.03.2010 | ||
LT | 31.03.2010 | ||
LV | 31.03.2010 | ||
MT | 31.03.2010 | ||
NL | 31.03.2010 | ||
PL | 31.03.2010 | ||
RO | 31.03.2010 | ||
SE | 31.03.2010 | ||
SI | 31.03.2010 | ||
SK | 31.03.2010 | ||
TR | 31.03.2010 | ||
LU | 13.06.2010 | ||
BE | 30.06.2010 | ||
BG | 30.06.2010 | ||
MC | 30.06.2010 | ||
ES | 12.07.2010 | ||
IS | 31.07.2010 | ||
PT | 02.08.2010 | ||
HU | 01.10.2010 | ||
Former [2012/47] | BG | 31.03.2010 | |
CY | 31.03.2010 | ||
CZ | 31.03.2010 | ||
DK | 31.03.2010 | ||
EE | 31.03.2010 | ||
IE | 31.03.2010 | ||
LT | 31.03.2010 | ||
LV | 31.03.2010 | ||
MT | 31.03.2010 | ||
NL | 31.03.2010 | ||
PL | 31.03.2010 | ||
RO | 31.03.2010 | ||
SE | 31.03.2010 | ||
SI | 31.03.2010 | ||
SK | 31.03.2010 | ||
TR | 31.03.2010 | ||
LU | 13.06.2010 | ||
BE | 30.06.2010 | ||
MC | 30.06.2010 | ||
ES | 12.07.2010 | ||
IS | 31.07.2010 | ||
PT | 02.08.2010 | ||
HU | 01.10.2010 | ||
Former [2012/43] | BG | 31.03.2010 | |
CY | 31.03.2010 | ||
CZ | 31.03.2010 | ||
DK | 31.03.2010 | ||
EE | 31.03.2010 | ||
IE | 31.03.2010 | ||
LT | 31.03.2010 | ||
LV | 31.03.2010 | ||
MT | 31.03.2010 | ||
NL | 31.03.2010 | ||
PL | 31.03.2010 | ||
RO | 31.03.2010 | ||
SE | 31.03.2010 | ||
SI | 31.03.2010 | ||
SK | 31.03.2010 | ||
LU | 13.06.2010 | ||
BE | 30.06.2010 | ||
MC | 30.06.2010 | ||
ES | 12.07.2010 | ||
IS | 31.07.2010 | ||
PT | 02.08.2010 | ||
HU | 01.10.2010 | ||
Former [2012/42] | BG | 31.03.2010 | |
CY | 31.03.2010 | ||
CZ | 31.03.2010 | ||
DK | 31.03.2010 | ||
EE | 31.03.2010 | ||
IE | 31.03.2010 | ||
LT | 31.03.2010 | ||
LV | 31.03.2010 | ||
MT | 31.03.2010 | ||
NL | 31.03.2010 | ||
PL | 31.03.2010 | ||
RO | 31.03.2010 | ||
SE | 31.03.2010 | ||
SI | 31.03.2010 | ||
SK | 31.03.2010 | ||
BE | 30.06.2010 | ||
MC | 30.06.2010 | ||
ES | 12.07.2010 | ||
IS | 31.07.2010 | ||
PT | 02.08.2010 | ||
HU | 01.10.2010 | ||
Former [2012/41] | BG | 31.03.2010 | |
CY | 31.03.2010 | ||
CZ | 31.03.2010 | ||
DK | 31.03.2010 | ||
EE | 31.03.2010 | ||
IE | 31.03.2010 | ||
LT | 31.03.2010 | ||
LV | 31.03.2010 | ||
MT | 31.03.2010 | ||
NL | 31.03.2010 | ||
PL | 31.03.2010 | ||
RO | 31.03.2010 | ||
SE | 31.03.2010 | ||
SI | 31.03.2010 | ||
SK | 31.03.2010 | ||
BE | 30.06.2010 | ||
MC | 30.06.2010 | ||
ES | 12.07.2010 | ||
IS | 31.07.2010 | ||
PT | 02.08.2010 | ||
Former [2011/41] | CY | 31.03.2010 | |
CZ | 31.03.2010 | ||
DK | 31.03.2010 | ||
EE | 31.03.2010 | ||
IE | 31.03.2010 | ||
LT | 31.03.2010 | ||
LV | 31.03.2010 | ||
MT | 31.03.2010 | ||
NL | 31.03.2010 | ||
PL | 31.03.2010 | ||
RO | 31.03.2010 | ||
SE | 31.03.2010 | ||
SI | 31.03.2010 | ||
SK | 31.03.2010 | ||
BE | 30.06.2010 | ||
MC | 30.06.2010 | ||
ES | 12.07.2010 | ||
IS | 31.07.2010 | ||
PT | 02.08.2010 | ||
Former [2011/27] | CY | 31.03.2010 | |
CZ | 31.03.2010 | ||
DK | 31.03.2010 | ||
EE | 31.03.2010 | ||
IE | 31.03.2010 | ||
LT | 31.03.2010 | ||
LV | 31.03.2010 | ||
MT | 31.03.2010 | ||
NL | 31.03.2010 | ||
PL | 31.03.2010 | ||
RO | 31.03.2010 | ||
SE | 31.03.2010 | ||
SI | 31.03.2010 | ||
SK | 31.03.2010 | ||
IT | 13.06.2010 | ||
BE | 30.06.2010 | ||
MC | 30.06.2010 | ||
ES | 12.07.2010 | ||
IS | 31.07.2010 | ||
PT | 02.08.2010 | ||
Former [2011/25] | CY | 31.03.2010 | |
CZ | 31.03.2010 | ||
DK | 31.03.2010 | ||
EE | 31.03.2010 | ||
IE | 31.03.2010 | ||
LT | 31.03.2010 | ||
LV | 31.03.2010 | ||
MT | 31.03.2010 | ||
NL | 31.03.2010 | ||
PL | 31.03.2010 | ||
RO | 31.03.2010 | ||
SE | 31.03.2010 | ||
SI | 31.03.2010 | ||
SK | 31.03.2010 | ||
IT | 13.06.2010 | ||
MC | 30.06.2010 | ||
ES | 12.07.2010 | ||
IS | 31.07.2010 | ||
PT | 02.08.2010 | ||
Former [2010/45] | LT | 31.03.2010 | |
LV | 31.03.2010 | ||
NL | 31.03.2010 | ||
PL | 31.03.2010 | ||
SI | 31.03.2010 | ||
Former [2010/43] | LT | 31.03.2010 | |
LV | 31.03.2010 | ||
PL | 31.03.2010 | ||
SI | 31.03.2010 | Cited in | International search | [A]GB925937 (TATRA NP) [A] 1-13* page 1, line 68 - page 2, line 7; figures 1,2 *; | [A]FR2407764 (SCHWARZE RIGOBERT [DE]) [A] 1-13 * page 3, lines 31-35; figure 1 *; | [A]DE3739937 (MAN B & W DIESEL GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-13 * abstract *; | [DA]DE10307871 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [DA] 1-13 * page 6, paragraph 49; figure 6 *; | [A]EP1469188 (GEN MOTORS CORP [US]) [A] 1-13 * abstract * |