EP2038821 - METHOD AND DEVICE FOR OPERATING A TEST CENTRE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 02.05.2014 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.05.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 04.06.2014 [2014/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states AVL List GmbH Hans-List-Platz 1 8020 Graz / AT | [2009/13] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CONRAD, Michael Friedensstrasse 5 66564 Ottweiler / DE | 02 /
KURZ, Alexander Bleidenstädter Äcker 16a 65719 Hofheim-Wallau / DE | [2009/13] | Representative(s) | Weiss, Christian, et al Pinter & Weiss OG Patentanwälte Prinz-Eugen-Strasse 70 1040 Wien / AT | [N/P] |
Former [2012/44] | Weiss, Christian, et al Pinter & Weiss OG Patentanwälte Prinz-Eugen-Strasse 70 1040 Wien / AT | ||
Former [2009/13] | Weiss, Christian Pinter, Laminger & Weiss OG Patentanwälte Prinz-Eugen-Strasse 70 1040 Wien / AT | Application number, filing date | 07718519.7 | 26.06.2007 | [2009/13] | WO2007AT00314 | Priority number, date | AT20060001084 | 27.06.2006 Original published format: AT 10842006 | [2009/13] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2008000009 | Date: | 03.01.2008 | Language: | DE | [2008/01] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2038821 | Date: | 25.03.2009 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.01.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/13] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 03.01.2008 | Classification | IPC: | G06Q10/00 | [2009/13] | CPC: |
G06Q10/06 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/13] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUM BETREIBEN EINER PRÜFFABRIK | [2009/13] | English: | METHOD AND DEVICE FOR OPERATING A TEST CENTRE | [2009/13] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET DISPOSITIF POUR EXPLOITER UN CENTRE D'ESSAI | [2009/13] | Entry into regional phase | 18.12.2008 | National basic fee paid | 18.12.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.12.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.04.2008 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 18.12.2008 | Examination requested [2009/13] | 03.01.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2014/23] | 28.01.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2014/23] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.06.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.06.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.06.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2013 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]EP0483035 (IBM [US]) [A] 1-23 * abstract ** column 5, line 30 - column 6, line 47 *; | [A]WO9963471 (I2 TECHNOLOGIES INC [US]) [A] 1-23 * page 8, line 20 - page 9, line 9 * * abstract *; | [X]US6236976 (GINSBERG MATTHEW L [US], et al) [X] 1-23 * the whole document *; | [X]US6266646 (FARGHER HUGH E [US], et al) [X] 1-23 * the whole document *; | [A]WO2006007447 (KINAXIS INC [US], et al) [A] 1-23 * abstract * * page 5, paragraph 20 - page 14, paragraph 46 * |