EP2129527 - FLUIDICALLY DAMPED PRINTHEAD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.03.2015 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.10.2017 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): BG, HU, TR | published on 15.11.2017 [2017/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Memjet Technology Limited 61/62 Fitzwilliam Lane Dublin 2 / IE | [2014/39] |
Former [2014/33] | For all designated states Memjet Technololgy Limited 61/62 Fitzwilliam Lane Dublin 2 / IE | ||
Former [2014/07] | For all designated states Zamtec Limited 61/62 Fitzwilliam Lane Dublin 2 / IE | ||
Former [2013/04] | For all designated states Zamtec Limited 8 Fitzwilliam Square Dublin 2 / IE | ||
Former [2009/50] | For all designated states Silverbrook Research Pty. Ltd 393 Darling Street Balmain, New South Wales 2041 / AU | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BROWN, Brian Robert 393 Darling Street Balmain, NSW 2041 / AU | 02 /
BERRY, Norman Micheal 393 Darling Street Balmain, NSW 2041 / AU | 03 /
JACKSON, Garry Raymond 393 Darling Street Balmain, NSW 2041 / AU | 04 /
SHARP, Paul Timothy 393 Darling Street Balmain, NSW 2041 / AU | 05 /
MORGAN, John Douglas 393 Darling Street Balmain, NSW 2041 / AU | 06 /
SILVERBROOK, Kia 393 Darling Street Balmain, NSW 2041 / AU | 07 /
NAKAZAWA, Akira 393 Darling Street Balmain, Nsw 2041 / AU | 08 /
HUDSON, Michael John 393 Darling Street Balmain, NSW 2041 / AU | 09 /
HIBBARD, Christopher 393 Darling Street Balmain, NSW 2041 / AU | 10 /
MALLINSON, Samuel George 393 Darling Street Balmain, NSW 2041 / AU | 11 /
REICHL, Paul Justin 393 Darling Street Balmain, NSW 2041 / AU | [2009/50] | Representative(s) | Moore, Barry, et al Hanna Moore + Curley Garryard House 25/26 Earlsfort Terrace Dublin 2, D02 PX51 / IE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/50] | Moore, Barry, et al Hanna Moore & Curley 13 Lower Lad Lane Dublin 2 / IE | Application number, filing date | 07718588.2 | 21.03.2007 | [2009/50] | WO2007AU00341 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2008113094 | Date: | 25.09.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/39] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2129527 | Date: | 09.12.2009 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.09.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/50] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2129527 | Date: | 07.05.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/19] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | AU | 25.09.2008 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.02.2013 | Classification | IPC: | B41J2/175, B41J2/045, B41J2/155 | [2013/12] | CPC: |
B41J2/045 (KR);
B41J2/055 (EP);
B41J2/14 (EP);
B41J2/155 (EP);
B41J2/1707 (EP);
B41J2/175 (KR);
|
Former IPC [2009/50] | B41J2/175, B41J2/045 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/50] | Title | German: | DRUCKKOPF MIT FLUIDDÄMPFUNG | [2009/50] | English: | FLUIDICALLY DAMPED PRINTHEAD | [2009/50] | French: | TÊTE D'IMPRESSION À AMORTISSEMENT FLUIDIQUE | [2009/50] | Entry into regional phase | 08.10.2009 | National basic fee paid | 08.10.2009 | Search fee paid | 08.10.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.10.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.10.2009 | Examination requested [2009/50] | 27.02.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.05.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.07.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.10.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.12.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.03.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 25.03.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 27.02.2013 | Opposition(s) | 10.02.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit [2015/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.10.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.08.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2012 | 06   M06   Fee paid on   31.08.2012 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 21.03.2007 | AT | 07.05.2014 | BE | 07.05.2014 | BG | 07.05.2014 | CY | 07.05.2014 | CZ | 07.05.2014 | DK | 07.05.2014 | EE | 07.05.2014 | ES | 07.05.2014 | FI | 07.05.2014 | IT | 07.05.2014 | LT | 07.05.2014 | LV | 07.05.2014 | MC | 07.05.2014 | MT | 07.05.2014 | PL | 07.05.2014 | RO | 07.05.2014 | SE | 07.05.2014 | SI | 07.05.2014 | SK | 07.05.2014 | TR | 07.05.2014 | GR | 08.08.2014 | IS | 07.09.2014 | PT | 08.09.2014 | [2017/39] |
Former [2017/03] | AT | 07.05.2014 | |
BE | 07.05.2014 | ||
CY | 07.05.2014 | ||
CZ | 07.05.2014 | ||
DK | 07.05.2014 | ||
EE | 07.05.2014 | ||
ES | 07.05.2014 | ||
FI | 07.05.2014 | ||
IT | 07.05.2014 | ||
LT | 07.05.2014 | ||
LV | 07.05.2014 | ||
MC | 07.05.2014 | ||
MT | 07.05.2014 | ||
PL | 07.05.2014 | ||
RO | 07.05.2014 | ||
SE | 07.05.2014 | ||
SI | 07.05.2014 | ||
SK | 07.05.2014 | ||
GR | 08.08.2014 | ||
IS | 07.09.2014 | ||
PT | 08.09.2014 | ||
Former [2015/46] | AT | 07.05.2014 | |
BE | 07.05.2014 | ||
CY | 07.05.2014 | ||
CZ | 07.05.2014 | ||
DK | 07.05.2014 | ||
EE | 07.05.2014 | ||
ES | 07.05.2014 | ||
FI | 07.05.2014 | ||
IT | 07.05.2014 | ||
LT | 07.05.2014 | ||
LV | 07.05.2014 | ||
MC | 07.05.2014 | ||
PL | 07.05.2014 | ||
RO | 07.05.2014 | ||
SE | 07.05.2014 | ||
SI | 07.05.2014 | ||
SK | 07.05.2014 | ||
GR | 08.08.2014 | ||
IS | 07.09.2014 | ||
PT | 08.09.2014 | ||
Former [2015/36] | AT | 07.05.2014 | |
BE | 07.05.2014 | ||
CY | 07.05.2014 | ||
CZ | 07.05.2014 | ||
DK | 07.05.2014 | ||
EE | 07.05.2014 | ||
ES | 07.05.2014 | ||
FI | 07.05.2014 | ||
IT | 07.05.2014 | ||
LT | 07.05.2014 | ||
LV | 07.05.2014 | ||
PL | 07.05.2014 | ||
RO | 07.05.2014 | ||
SE | 07.05.2014 | ||
SI | 07.05.2014 | ||
SK | 07.05.2014 | ||
GR | 08.08.2014 | ||
IS | 07.09.2014 | ||
PT | 08.09.2014 | ||
Former [2015/22] | AT | 07.05.2014 | |
BE | 07.05.2014 | ||
CY | 07.05.2014 | ||
CZ | 07.05.2014 | ||
DK | 07.05.2014 | ||
EE | 07.05.2014 | ||
ES | 07.05.2014 | ||
FI | 07.05.2014 | ||
IT | 07.05.2014 | ||
LT | 07.05.2014 | ||
LV | 07.05.2014 | ||
PL | 07.05.2014 | ||
RO | 07.05.2014 | ||
SE | 07.05.2014 | ||
SK | 07.05.2014 | ||
GR | 08.08.2014 | ||
IS | 07.09.2014 | ||
PT | 08.09.2014 | ||
Former [2015/11] | AT | 07.05.2014 | |
BE | 07.05.2014 | ||
CY | 07.05.2014 | ||
CZ | 07.05.2014 | ||
DK | 07.05.2014 | ||
EE | 07.05.2014 | ||
ES | 07.05.2014 | ||
FI | 07.05.2014 | ||
LT | 07.05.2014 | ||
LV | 07.05.2014 | ||
PL | 07.05.2014 | ||
RO | 07.05.2014 | ||
SE | 07.05.2014 | ||
SK | 07.05.2014 | ||
GR | 08.08.2014 | ||
IS | 07.09.2014 | ||
PT | 08.09.2014 | ||
Former [2015/10] | AT | 07.05.2014 | |
BE | 07.05.2014 | ||
CY | 07.05.2014 | ||
CZ | 07.05.2014 | ||
DK | 07.05.2014 | ||
EE | 07.05.2014 | ||
ES | 07.05.2014 | ||
FI | 07.05.2014 | ||
LT | 07.05.2014 | ||
LV | 07.05.2014 | ||
PL | 07.05.2014 | ||
SE | 07.05.2014 | ||
SK | 07.05.2014 | ||
GR | 08.08.2014 | ||
IS | 07.09.2014 | ||
PT | 08.09.2014 | ||
Former [2015/08] | AT | 07.05.2014 | |
BE | 07.05.2014 | ||
CY | 07.05.2014 | ||
DK | 07.05.2014 | ||
ES | 07.05.2014 | ||
FI | 07.05.2014 | ||
LT | 07.05.2014 | ||
LV | 07.05.2014 | ||
PL | 07.05.2014 | ||
SE | 07.05.2014 | ||
GR | 08.08.2014 | ||
IS | 07.09.2014 | ||
PT | 08.09.2014 | ||
Former [2015/02] | AT | 07.05.2014 | |
CY | 07.05.2014 | ||
ES | 07.05.2014 | ||
FI | 07.05.2014 | ||
LT | 07.05.2014 | ||
LV | 07.05.2014 | ||
PL | 07.05.2014 | ||
SE | 07.05.2014 | ||
GR | 08.08.2014 | ||
IS | 07.09.2014 | ||
PT | 08.09.2014 | ||
Former [2014/51] | AT | 07.05.2014 | |
CY | 07.05.2014 | ||
ES | 07.05.2014 | ||
FI | 07.05.2014 | ||
LT | 07.05.2014 | ||
LV | 07.05.2014 | ||
PL | 07.05.2014 | ||
SE | 07.05.2014 | ||
GR | 08.08.2014 | ||
IS | 07.09.2014 | ||
Former [2014/50] | CY | 07.05.2014 | |
ES | 07.05.2014 | ||
FI | 07.05.2014 | ||
LT | 07.05.2014 | ||
LV | 07.05.2014 | ||
PL | 07.05.2014 | ||
SE | 07.05.2014 | ||
GR | 08.08.2014 | ||
IS | 07.09.2014 | ||
Former [2014/49] | CY | 07.05.2014 | |
FI | 07.05.2014 | ||
LT | 07.05.2014 | ||
IS | 07.09.2014 | ||
Former [2014/48] | CY | 07.05.2014 | |
LT | 07.05.2014 | ||
Former [2014/47] | CY | 07.05.2014 | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]EP1078760 (CANON KK [JP]) [X] 1-6 * paragraphs [0152] , [ 182]; figures 11-12c,14,15a,16a * [I] 7; | [X]US5969736 (FIELD LESLIE A [US], et al) [X] 1-3 * figures 1a,2,6b *; | [X]EP1362703 (CANON KK [JP]) [X] 1-3 * abstract *; | [X]EP1184183 (CANON KK [JP]) [X] 1-6 * figures 1,4,8,9 * | International search | [A]US6460986 (SASAKI TOSHIYUKI [JP]); | [A]US2006170735 (HONG YOUNG-KI [KR], et al); | [A]US6905202 (SHIMAMOTO KEISUKE [JP], et al); | [A]US6955418 (ITO ATSUSHI [JP]); | [A]US2006181581 (JUNG CHANG-HOON [KR], et al); | [A]US7004576 (ITO ATSUSHI [JP]); | [A]US2005248628 (ISONO JUN [JP]) | by applicant | EP1078760 |