EP2002622 - CHANNEL ESTIMATION FOR RAPID DISPERSIVE FADING CHANNELS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 10.04.2012 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.04.2012 | Withdrawal of application | published on 09.05.2012 [2012/19] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states National ICT Australia Limited Bay 15 Locomotive Workshop Australian Technology Park Garden Street Eveleigh NSW 1430 / AU | [2008/51] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ZHAO, Ming Locked Bag 8001 Canberra, ACT 2601 / AU | 02 /
SHI, Zhenning 127/26 Oliver Street Lyneham, ACT 2602 / AU | 03 /
REED, Mark 4 Fred William Crescent North Lyneham, ACT 2602 / AU | [2008/51] | Representative(s) | Pearson, James Ginn, et al Abel & Imray 20 Red Lion Street London WC1R 4PQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2008/51] | Pearson, James Ginn, et al Abel & Imray, 20 Red Lion Street London WC1R 4PQ / GB | Application number, filing date | 07718662.5 | 30.03.2007 | [2008/51] | WO2007AU00415 | Priority number, date | AU20060901723 | 03.04.2006 Original published format: AU 2006901723 | [2008/51] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007112489 | Date: | 11.10.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/41] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2002622 | Date: | 17.12.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.10.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/51] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | AU | 11.10.2007 | Classification | IPC: | H04L25/02, H04L5/02, H04L27/00 | [2008/51] | CPC: |
H04L25/022 (EP,KR,US);
H04L25/0202 (KR);
H04L25/023 (EP,KR,US);
H04L27/2647 (EP,KR,US);
H04L5/0007 (KR);
H04L5/0048 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/51] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | KANALSCHÄTZUNG FÜR KANÄLE MIT SCHNELLEM DISPERSIVEM FADING | [2008/51] | English: | CHANNEL ESTIMATION FOR RAPID DISPERSIVE FADING CHANNELS | [2008/51] | French: | ESTIMATION DE CANAL POUR CANAUX À ÉVANOUISSEMENT DISPERSIF RAPIDE | [2008/51] | Entry into regional phase | 26.09.2008 | National basic fee paid | 26.09.2008 | Search fee paid | 26.09.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.09.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.09.2008 | Examination requested [2008/51] | 30.03.2012 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2012/19] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.11.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]US2006062283 (ZHANG JIANZHONG C [US], et al); | [X]US2005176436 (MANTRAVADI ASHOK [US], et al); | [A]WO2005011128 (COHDA WIRELESS PTY LTD [AU], et al); | [X] - ITO ET AL., "An OFDM Receiver with Decision-Directed Channel Estimation for the Scattered Pilot Scheme in Fast Fading Environments", IEEE SEMIANNUAL, (20030422), vol. 1, pages 368 - 372, XP010862150 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/VETECS.2003.1207564 | [A] - CHEN ET AL., "Interacarrier Interference Suppression & Channel Estimation for OFDM Systems in Time-varying Frequency-selective Fading Channels", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON CONSUMER ELECTRONICS, (200405), vol. 50, no. 2, pages 429 - 435, XP001224951 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/TCE.2004.1309404 | [A] - BALIGA ET AL., "Turbo-BLAST with Iterative Channel Estimation in a Correlated Fast Fading Channel", SIGNALS, SYSTEMS & COMPUTERS, 2005. CONFERENCE RECORD OF THE 39TH ASILOMAR CONFERENCE, (20051028), pages 819 - 823, XP010900118 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/ACSSC.2005.1599868 | [A] - KUHN V., "Iterative Interference Cancellation & Channel Estimation for Coded OFDM-CDMA", IEEE INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON COMMUNICATIONS, (20030511), vol. 4, pages 2465 - 2469, XP008129510 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/ICC.2003.1204390 |