EP2018182 - IMMUNOGENIC COMPOSITIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 15.11.2013 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.11.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 18.12.2013 [2013/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states THE WALTER AND ELIZA HALL INSTITUTE OF MEDICAL RESEARCH 1G Royal Parade Parkville, VIC 3050 / AU | [2009/05] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BELZ, Gabrielle Therese 58 Wilson Street Brunswick, Victoria 3056 / AU | 02 /
HEATH, William Ross 35 Munro Street Ascot Vale, Victoria 3032 / AU | [2009/05] | Representative(s) | Sweetinburgh, Mark Roger, et al Sweetinburgh & Windsor Churchill Court 3 Manor Royal Crawley, West Sussex RH10 9LU / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2011/51] | Sweetinburgh, Mark Roger, et al Sweetinburgh & Windsor Unit 65, Basepoint Metcalf Way Crawley West Sussex, RH11 7XX / GB | ||
Former [2009/05] | Sweetinburgh, Mark Roger, et al Fry Heath & Spence LLP The Gables Massetts Road Horley, Surrey RH6 7DQ / GB | Application number, filing date | 07718937.1 | 18.05.2007 | [2009/05] | WO2007AU00691 | Priority number, date | US20060801998P | 19.05.2006 Original published format: US 801998 P | [2009/05] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007134385 | Date: | 29.11.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/48] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2018182 | Date: | 28.01.2009 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.11.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/05] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | AU | 29.11.2007 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.09.2010 | Classification | IPC: | A61K39/385, A61K39/285, A61K39/02, A61K39/245, A61P37/00, A61K39/12 | [2010/39] | CPC: |
A61K39/385 (EP,US);
A61P35/00 (EP);
A61P37/00 (EP);
A61K2035/124 (EP,US);
A61K2039/6031 (EP,US);
C12N2760/16134 (EP,US);
C12N2770/24111 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2009/05] | A61K39/395, A61K39/02, A61K39/245, A61P37/00, A61K39/12, A61K39/285 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/05] | Title | German: | IMMUNOGENE ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN | [2009/05] | English: | IMMUNOGENIC COMPOSITIONS | [2009/05] | French: | COMPOSITIONS IMMUNOGENES | [2009/12] |
Former [2009/05] | COMPOSITIONS IMMUNOGÈNES | Entry into regional phase | 12.11.2008 | National basic fee paid | 12.11.2008 | Search fee paid | 12.11.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.11.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.03.2008 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: AU | 12.11.2008 | Examination requested [2009/05] | 28.03.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 25.02.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.07.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2013/51] | 13.08.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2013/51] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 25.02.2013 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.05.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.05.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 10.05.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A] - TOLBA KHALED A ET AL, "Herpes simplex virus (HSV) amplicon-mediated codelivery of secondary lymphoid tissue chemokine and CD40L results in augmented antitumor activity", CANCER RESEARCH, (20021115), vol. 62, no. 22, ISSN 0008-5472, pages 6545 - 6551, XP002597839 [A] 1-15 * page 6650, column l, paragraph l - column r * | International search | [XP]WO2006093524 (GEN HOSPITAL CORP [US], et al); | [X] - MAHNKE K. ET AL., "Antibody-based targeting of tumor antigens to dendritic cells in vivo induces protective tumor immunity in a B16 melanoma model", 65TH ANNUAL MEETING OF THE SOCIETY-FOR-INVESTIGATIVE-DERMATOLOGY; PROVIDENCE, RI, USA, (20040428), vol. 122, no. 3, page A118, XP008092526 | [X] - QIAN Y. ET AL., "Targeting of tumor antigens to dendritic cells in vivo induces protective tumor immunity in a B16 melanoma model", 31ST ANNUAL MEETING OF THE ARBEITSGEMEINSCHAFT DERMATOLOGISCHE FORSCHUNG IN COOPERATION WITH THE DEUBERLIN, GERMANY, (20040226), vol. 295, no. 8-9, page 326, XP008092525 | [Y] - BELZ G.T. ET AL., "Cutting Edge: Conventional CD8alpha+ Dendritic Cells are Generally Involved in Priming CTL Immunity to Viruses", THE JOURNAL OF IMMUNOLOGY, (2004), vol. 172, pages 1996 - 2000, XP008091977 | [Y] - MAHNKE KARSTEN ET AL., "Targeting of Antigens to Activated Dendritic Cells In vivo Cures Metastatic Melanoma in Mice", CANCER RESEARCH, (20050801), vol. 65, pages 7007 - 7012, XP002464332 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1158/0008-5472.CAN-05-0938 | by applicant | - BELZ, GT. ET AL., PNAS, vol. 101, no. 23, pages 8670 - 8675 |