EP2007662 - CELLULAR ENCASEMENT PROTECTION SYSTEM FOR ROLLER ASSEMBLY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 29.08.2014 Database last updated on 13.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.07.2016 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 17.08.2016 [2016/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Gagnon, Jean-Pierre 41 des Remparts Quebec, QC G1R 3R7 / CA | [2009/25] |
Former [2009/01] | For all designated states Developpement Enduride Inc. Suite 205 2300 Léon-Harmel Québec QC G1N 4L2 / CA | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2009/25] |
Former [2009/01] | 01 /
GAGNON, Jean-Pierre 41 Des Remparts Québec, Québec G1R 3R7 / CA | Representative(s) | Regimbeau 20, rue de Chazelles 75847 Paris Cedex 17 / FR | [2012/49] |
Former [2009/49] | Le Forestier, Eric, et al Cabinet Régimbeau 20, rue de Chazelles 75847 Paris cedex 17 / FR | ||
Former [2009/01] | Le Forestier, Eric, et al Cabinet Régimbeau 20, rue de Chazelles 75847 Paris Cedex 17 / FR | Application number, filing date | 07719418.1 | 23.03.2007 | [2009/01] | WO2007CA00484 | Priority number, date | US20060787511P | 31.03.2006 Original published format: US 787511 P | [2009/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007112553 | Date: | 11.10.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/41] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2007662 | Date: | 31.12.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.10.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/01] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2007662 | Date: | 23.10.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/43] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CA | 11.10.2007 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.05.2012 | Classification | IPC: | B65G39/09, F16C33/76, F16C27/06, F16C33/80, F16C35/077, F16C33/72 | [2012/26] | CPC: |
B65G39/09 (EP,US);
F16C13/022 (EP,US);
F16C27/066 (EP,US);
F16C33/80 (EP,US);
F16C35/042 (EP,US);
F16C19/06 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2009/01] | B65G39/09, F16C33/76 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/01] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ZELLENFÖRMIGES GEHÄUSESCHUTZSYSTEM FÜR ROLLENANORDNUNG | [2009/01] | English: | CELLULAR ENCASEMENT PROTECTION SYSTEM FOR ROLLER ASSEMBLY | [2009/01] | French: | SYSTEME CELLULAIRE DE PROTECTION DE BOITIER POUR ENSEMBLE ROULEAU | [2009/01] | Entry into regional phase | 31.10.2008 | National basic fee paid | 31.10.2008 | Search fee paid | 31.10.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 31.10.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 31.10.2008 | Examination requested [2009/01] | 18.12.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 06.05.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.09.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 09.09.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 06.05.2013 | Opposition(s) | 24.07.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/40] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.09.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2012 | 06   M06   Fee paid on   28.09.2012 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 23.03.2007 | AT | 23.10.2013 | BE | 23.10.2013 | BG | 23.10.2013 | CY | 23.10.2013 | CZ | 23.10.2013 | DK | 23.10.2013 | EE | 23.10.2013 | ES | 23.10.2013 | FI | 23.10.2013 | IT | 23.10.2013 | LT | 23.10.2013 | LV | 23.10.2013 | MC | 23.10.2013 | MT | 23.10.2013 | NL | 23.10.2013 | PL | 23.10.2013 | RO | 23.10.2013 | SE | 23.10.2013 | SI | 23.10.2013 | SK | 23.10.2013 | TR | 23.10.2013 | GR | 24.01.2014 | IS | 23.02.2014 | PT | 24.02.2014 | GB | 23.03.2014 | IE | 23.03.2014 | LU | 23.03.2014 | CH | 31.03.2014 | FR | 31.03.2014 | LI | 31.03.2014 | [2016/33] |
Former [2016/32] | HU | 23.03.2007 | |
AT | 23.10.2013 | ||
BE | 23.10.2013 | ||
BG | 23.10.2013 | ||
CY | 23.10.2013 | ||
CZ | 23.10.2013 | ||
DK | 23.10.2013 | ||
EE | 23.10.2013 | ||
ES | 23.10.2013 | ||
FI | 23.10.2013 | ||
IT | 23.10.2013 | ||
LT | 23.10.2013 | ||
LV | 23.10.2013 | ||
MC | 23.10.2013 | ||
MT | 23.10.2013 | ||
NL | 23.10.2013 | ||
PL | 23.10.2013 | ||
RO | 23.10.2013 | ||
SE | 23.10.2013 | ||
SI | 23.10.2013 | ||
SK | 23.10.2013 | ||
GR | 24.01.2014 | ||
IS | 23.02.2014 | ||
PT | 24.02.2014 | ||
GB | 23.03.2014 | ||
IE | 23.03.2014 | ||
LU | 23.03.2014 | ||
CH | 31.03.2014 | ||
FR | 31.03.2014 | ||
LI | 31.03.2014 | ||
Former [2016/28] | AT | 23.10.2013 | |
BE | 23.10.2013 | ||
BG | 23.10.2013 | ||
CY | 23.10.2013 | ||
CZ | 23.10.2013 | ||
DK | 23.10.2013 | ||
EE | 23.10.2013 | ||
ES | 23.10.2013 | ||
FI | 23.10.2013 | ||
IT | 23.10.2013 | ||
LT | 23.10.2013 | ||
LV | 23.10.2013 | ||
MC | 23.10.2013 | ||
MT | 23.10.2013 | ||
NL | 23.10.2013 | ||
PL | 23.10.2013 | ||
RO | 23.10.2013 | ||
SE | 23.10.2013 | ||
SI | 23.10.2013 | ||
SK | 23.10.2013 | ||
GR | 24.01.2014 | ||
IS | 23.02.2014 | ||
PT | 24.02.2014 | ||
GB | 23.03.2014 | ||
IE | 23.03.2014 | ||
LU | 23.03.2014 | ||
CH | 31.03.2014 | ||
FR | 31.03.2014 | ||
LI | 31.03.2014 | ||
Former [2016/27] | AT | 23.10.2013 | |
BE | 23.10.2013 | ||
BG | 23.10.2013 | ||
CY | 23.10.2013 | ||
CZ | 23.10.2013 | ||
DK | 23.10.2013 | ||
EE | 23.10.2013 | ||
ES | 23.10.2013 | ||
FI | 23.10.2013 | ||
IT | 23.10.2013 | ||
LT | 23.10.2013 | ||
LV | 23.10.2013 | ||
MC | 23.10.2013 | ||
MT | 23.10.2013 | ||
NL | 23.10.2013 | ||
PL | 23.10.2013 | ||
RO | 23.10.2013 | ||
SE | 23.10.2013 | ||
SI | 23.10.2013 | ||
SK | 23.10.2013 | ||
IS | 23.02.2014 | ||
PT | 24.02.2014 | ||
GB | 23.03.2014 | ||
IE | 23.03.2014 | ||
LU | 23.03.2014 | ||
CH | 31.03.2014 | ||
FR | 31.03.2014 | ||
LI | 31.03.2014 | ||
Former [2016/25] | AT | 23.10.2013 | |
BE | 23.10.2013 | ||
BG | 23.10.2013 | ||
CY | 23.10.2013 | ||
CZ | 23.10.2013 | ||
DK | 23.10.2013 | ||
EE | 23.10.2013 | ||
ES | 23.10.2013 | ||
FI | 23.10.2013 | ||
IT | 23.10.2013 | ||
LT | 23.10.2013 | ||
LV | 23.10.2013 | ||
MT | 23.10.2013 | ||
NL | 23.10.2013 | ||
PL | 23.10.2013 | ||
RO | 23.10.2013 | ||
SE | 23.10.2013 | ||
SI | 23.10.2013 | ||
SK | 23.10.2013 | ||
IS | 23.02.2014 | ||
PT | 24.02.2014 | ||
GB | 23.03.2014 | ||
IE | 23.03.2014 | ||
LU | 23.03.2014 | ||
CH | 31.03.2014 | ||
FR | 31.03.2014 | ||
LI | 31.03.2014 | ||
Former [2016/12] | AT | 23.10.2013 | |
BE | 23.10.2013 | ||
CY | 23.10.2013 | ||
CZ | 23.10.2013 | ||
DK | 23.10.2013 | ||
EE | 23.10.2013 | ||
ES | 23.10.2013 | ||
FI | 23.10.2013 | ||
IT | 23.10.2013 | ||
LT | 23.10.2013 | ||
LV | 23.10.2013 | ||
MT | 23.10.2013 | ||
NL | 23.10.2013 | ||
PL | 23.10.2013 | ||
RO | 23.10.2013 | ||
SE | 23.10.2013 | ||
SI | 23.10.2013 | ||
SK | 23.10.2013 | ||
IS | 23.02.2014 | ||
PT | 24.02.2014 | ||
GB | 23.03.2014 | ||
IE | 23.03.2014 | ||
LU | 23.03.2014 | ||
CH | 31.03.2014 | ||
FR | 31.03.2014 | ||
LI | 31.03.2014 | ||
Former [2015/14] | AT | 23.10.2013 | |
BE | 23.10.2013 | ||
CY | 23.10.2013 | ||
CZ | 23.10.2013 | ||
DK | 23.10.2013 | ||
EE | 23.10.2013 | ||
ES | 23.10.2013 | ||
FI | 23.10.2013 | ||
IT | 23.10.2013 | ||
LT | 23.10.2013 | ||
LV | 23.10.2013 | ||
NL | 23.10.2013 | ||
PL | 23.10.2013 | ||
RO | 23.10.2013 | ||
SE | 23.10.2013 | ||
SI | 23.10.2013 | ||
SK | 23.10.2013 | ||
IS | 23.02.2014 | ||
PT | 24.02.2014 | ||
GB | 23.03.2014 | ||
IE | 23.03.2014 | ||
LU | 23.03.2014 | ||
CH | 31.03.2014 | ||
FR | 31.03.2014 | ||
LI | 31.03.2014 | ||
Former [2015/09] | AT | 23.10.2013 | |
BE | 23.10.2013 | ||
CY | 23.10.2013 | ||
CZ | 23.10.2013 | ||
DK | 23.10.2013 | ||
EE | 23.10.2013 | ||
ES | 23.10.2013 | ||
FI | 23.10.2013 | ||
IT | 23.10.2013 | ||
LT | 23.10.2013 | ||
LV | 23.10.2013 | ||
NL | 23.10.2013 | ||
PL | 23.10.2013 | ||
RO | 23.10.2013 | ||
SE | 23.10.2013 | ||
SK | 23.10.2013 | ||
IS | 23.02.2014 | ||
PT | 24.02.2014 | ||
GB | 23.03.2014 | ||
IE | 23.03.2014 | ||
LU | 23.03.2014 | ||
CH | 31.03.2014 | ||
FR | 31.03.2014 | ||
LI | 31.03.2014 | ||
Former [2015/08] | AT | 23.10.2013 | |
BE | 23.10.2013 | ||
CY | 23.10.2013 | ||
CZ | 23.10.2013 | ||
DK | 23.10.2013 | ||
EE | 23.10.2013 | ||
ES | 23.10.2013 | ||
FI | 23.10.2013 | ||
IT | 23.10.2013 | ||
LT | 23.10.2013 | ||
LV | 23.10.2013 | ||
NL | 23.10.2013 | ||
PL | 23.10.2013 | ||
RO | 23.10.2013 | ||
SE | 23.10.2013 | ||
SK | 23.10.2013 | ||
IS | 23.02.2014 | ||
PT | 24.02.2014 | ||
IE | 23.03.2014 | ||
LU | 23.03.2014 | ||
CH | 31.03.2014 | ||
FR | 31.03.2014 | ||
LI | 31.03.2014 | ||
Former [2015/07] | AT | 23.10.2013 | |
BE | 23.10.2013 | ||
CY | 23.10.2013 | ||
CZ | 23.10.2013 | ||
DK | 23.10.2013 | ||
EE | 23.10.2013 | ||
ES | 23.10.2013 | ||
FI | 23.10.2013 | ||
IT | 23.10.2013 | ||
LT | 23.10.2013 | ||
LV | 23.10.2013 | ||
NL | 23.10.2013 | ||
PL | 23.10.2013 | ||
RO | 23.10.2013 | ||
SE | 23.10.2013 | ||
SK | 23.10.2013 | ||
IS | 23.02.2014 | ||
PT | 24.02.2014 | ||
IE | 23.03.2014 | ||
LU | 23.03.2014 | ||
Former [2014/48] | AT | 23.10.2013 | |
BE | 23.10.2013 | ||
CY | 23.10.2013 | ||
CZ | 23.10.2013 | ||
DK | 23.10.2013 | ||
EE | 23.10.2013 | ||
ES | 23.10.2013 | ||
FI | 23.10.2013 | ||
IT | 23.10.2013 | ||
LT | 23.10.2013 | ||
LV | 23.10.2013 | ||
NL | 23.10.2013 | ||
PL | 23.10.2013 | ||
RO | 23.10.2013 | ||
SE | 23.10.2013 | ||
SK | 23.10.2013 | ||
IS | 23.02.2014 | ||
PT | 24.02.2014 | ||
LU | 23.03.2014 | ||
Former [2014/41] | AT | 23.10.2013 | |
BE | 23.10.2013 | ||
CY | 23.10.2013 | ||
CZ | 23.10.2013 | ||
DK | 23.10.2013 | ||
EE | 23.10.2013 | ||
ES | 23.10.2013 | ||
FI | 23.10.2013 | ||
IT | 23.10.2013 | ||
LT | 23.10.2013 | ||
LV | 23.10.2013 | ||
NL | 23.10.2013 | ||
PL | 23.10.2013 | ||
RO | 23.10.2013 | ||
SE | 23.10.2013 | ||
SK | 23.10.2013 | ||
IS | 23.02.2014 | ||
PT | 24.02.2014 | ||
Former [2014/38] | AT | 23.10.2013 | |
BE | 23.10.2013 | ||
CY | 23.10.2013 | ||
CZ | 23.10.2013 | ||
EE | 23.10.2013 | ||
ES | 23.10.2013 | ||
FI | 23.10.2013 | ||
IT | 23.10.2013 | ||
LT | 23.10.2013 | ||
LV | 23.10.2013 | ||
NL | 23.10.2013 | ||
PL | 23.10.2013 | ||
RO | 23.10.2013 | ||
SE | 23.10.2013 | ||
SK | 23.10.2013 | ||
IS | 23.02.2014 | ||
PT | 24.02.2014 | ||
Former [2014/37] | AT | 23.10.2013 | |
BE | 23.10.2013 | ||
CY | 23.10.2013 | ||
CZ | 23.10.2013 | ||
EE | 23.10.2013 | ||
ES | 23.10.2013 | ||
FI | 23.10.2013 | ||
LT | 23.10.2013 | ||
LV | 23.10.2013 | ||
NL | 23.10.2013 | ||
PL | 23.10.2013 | ||
RO | 23.10.2013 | ||
SE | 23.10.2013 | ||
SK | 23.10.2013 | ||
IS | 23.02.2014 | ||
PT | 24.02.2014 | ||
Former [2014/36] | AT | 23.10.2013 | |
BE | 23.10.2013 | ||
CY | 23.10.2013 | ||
EE | 23.10.2013 | ||
ES | 23.10.2013 | ||
FI | 23.10.2013 | ||
LT | 23.10.2013 | ||
LV | 23.10.2013 | ||
NL | 23.10.2013 | ||
SE | 23.10.2013 | ||
IS | 23.02.2014 | ||
PT | 24.02.2014 | ||
Former [2014/28] | AT | 23.10.2013 | |
BE | 23.10.2013 | ||
CY | 23.10.2013 | ||
ES | 23.10.2013 | ||
FI | 23.10.2013 | ||
LT | 23.10.2013 | ||
LV | 23.10.2013 | ||
NL | 23.10.2013 | ||
SE | 23.10.2013 | ||
IS | 23.02.2014 | ||
PT | 24.02.2014 | ||
Former [2014/26] | AT | 23.10.2013 | |
BE | 23.10.2013 | ||
CY | 23.10.2013 | ||
ES | 23.10.2013 | ||
FI | 23.10.2013 | ||
LT | 23.10.2013 | ||
LV | 23.10.2013 | ||
NL | 23.10.2013 | ||
SE | 23.10.2013 | ||
IS | 23.02.2014 | ||
Former [2014/25] | AT | 23.10.2013 | |
BE | 23.10.2013 | ||
ES | 23.10.2013 | ||
FI | 23.10.2013 | ||
LT | 23.10.2013 | ||
LV | 23.10.2013 | ||
NL | 23.10.2013 | ||
SE | 23.10.2013 | ||
IS | 23.02.2014 | ||
Former [2014/24] | AT | 23.10.2013 | |
BE | 23.10.2013 | ||
ES | 23.10.2013 | ||
FI | 23.10.2013 | ||
LT | 23.10.2013 | ||
NL | 23.10.2013 | ||
SE | 23.10.2013 | ||
IS | 23.02.2014 | ||
Former [2014/23] | BE | 23.10.2013 | |
FI | 23.10.2013 | ||
LT | 23.10.2013 | ||
NL | 23.10.2013 | ||
SE | 23.10.2013 | ||
IS | 23.02.2014 | ||
Former [2014/22] | FI | 23.10.2013 | |
LT | 23.10.2013 | ||
NL | 23.10.2013 | ||
SE | 23.10.2013 | ||
Former [2014/20] | LT | 23.10.2013 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE19627048 (ARTUR KUEPPER GMBH & CO KG [DE]) [A] 1,2 * column 1, line 27 - column 3, line 12 * * figures 1,2 *; | [YD]CA2269435 (MAC LEAN FOGG CO [US]) [YD] 1,2 * page 5, line 6 - line 17 * * figure 9 *; | [Y]DE10208972 (ARTUR KUEPPER GMBH & CO KG [DE]) [Y] 1,2 * column 3, line 26 - column 5, line 16 * * figures 1-3 *; | [A]WO2005060648 (ASHLAND INC [US], et al) [A] 3,4 * claims 13,14 ** page 12, paragraph 4 * | International search | [A]US3144280 (SORENSON GERALD T); | [A]US3610387 (STEIN HANS VOM); | [A]US3984160 (SHELDON JEROME F, et al); | [A]CA1031715 (INTERROLL FOERDERTECHNIK GMBH); | [A]CA2092856 (BOUCHAL MILAN [CA]); | [A]CA2141125 (JPG COMPOSITE PLUS INC [CA]); | [A]CA2240742 (BOUCHAL MILAN [CA]); | [A]CA2290522 (SVEDALA IND CANADA INC [CA]); | [A]CA2269435 (MAC LEAN FOGG CO [US]) |