EP2153132 - METHOD FOR BURNING COAL USING OXYGEN IN A RECYCLED FLUE GAS STREAM FOR CARBON DIOXIDE CAPTURE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.09.2016 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.08.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): BG | published on 19.09.2018 [2018/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Her Majesty the Queen in Right of Canada as Represented by The Minister of Natural Resources 16th floor, 580 Booth Street Ottawa Ontario K1A 0E4 / CA | [2010/07] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DOUGLAS, Mark Austin 2185 Saturn Crescent Ottawa, Ontario K4A 3T6 / CA | 02 /
TAN, Yewen 66 Hemlo Crescent Ottawa, Ontario K2T 1C9 / CA | 03 /
SELLERS, Thomas 670 Hayes Street Buckingham, Quebec J8L 3A1 / CA | 04 /
CHUI, Eddy 120 Osprey Crescent Kanata, Ontario K2M 2Z9 / CA | 05 /
MAJESKI, Adrian 203 Moffatt Street Carleton Place, Ontario K1N 7Z9 / CA | [2010/16] |
Former [2010/07] | 01 /
DOUGLAS, Mark Austin 2185 Saturn Crescent Ottawa, Ontario K4A 3T6 / CA | ||
02 /
TAN, Yewen 66 Hemlo Crescent Ottawa, Ontario K2T 1C9 / CA | |||
03 /
SELLERS, Thomas 670 Hayes Street Buckingham, Quebec J8L 3A1 / CA | |||
04 /
CHUI, Eddy 120 Osprey Crescent Kanata, Ontario K2M 2Z9 / CA | |||
05 /
MAJESKI, Adrian 2-658 Chapel Street Ottawa, Ontario K1N 7Z9 / CA | Representative(s) | Laghi, Alberto, et al Praxi Intellectual Property S.p.A. Piazza Brà, 28 37121 Verona / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2015/45] | Reniero, Cirillo Silvano Dr. Reniero & Associati S.r.l. Patents Piazza Bra, 28 37121 Verona / IT | ||
Former [2010/07] | Reniero, Cirillo Silvano Dr. Reniero & Associati S.r.l. Patents Piazza Bra, 28 37121 Verona / IT | Application number, filing date | 07719812.5 | 18.05.2007 | [2010/07] | WO2007CA00890 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2008141412 | Date: | 27.11.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/48] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2153132 | Date: | 17.02.2010 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.11.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2010/07] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2153132 | Date: | 04.11.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/45] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CA | 27.11.2008 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.02.2012 | Classification | IPC: | F23L7/00, F23D1/00, F23K1/02, F23L5/00, F23C7/00 | [2012/12] | CPC: |
F23D1/005 (EP,US);
F23C7/002 (EP,US);
F23C9/003 (EP,US);
F23L7/007 (EP,US);
F23D2900/01001 (EP,US);
F23L2900/07005 (EP,US);
Y02E20/34 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2010/07] | F23L7/00, F23D1/00, F23K1/02, F23L5/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2015/45] |
Former [2010/07] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUM VERBRENNEN VON KOHLE UNTER VERWENDUNG VON SAUERSTOFF IN EINEM RÜCKGEFÜHRTEN RAUCHGASSTROM ZUR GEWINNUNG VON KOHLENDIOXID | [2010/07] | English: | METHOD FOR BURNING COAL USING OXYGEN IN A RECYCLED FLUE GAS STREAM FOR CARBON DIOXIDE CAPTURE | [2010/07] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE COMBUSTION DE CHARBON À L'AIDE D'OXYGÈNE DANS UN COURANT DE GAZ DE COMBUSTION RECYCLÉ POUR UNE CAPTURE DE DIOXYDE DE CARBONE | [2010/07] | Entry into regional phase | 14.12.2009 | National basic fee paid | 14.12.2009 | Search fee paid | 14.12.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.12.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.12.2009 | Examination requested [2010/07] | 12.06.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.09.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 23.09.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 23.09.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 12.06.2015 | Opposition(s) | 05.08.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/41] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.12.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.05.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.05.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.05.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 22.05.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 29.05.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 22.05.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 18.05.2007 | AT | 04.11.2015 | BE | 04.11.2015 | BG | 04.11.2015 | CY | 04.11.2015 | CZ | 04.11.2015 | DK | 04.11.2015 | EE | 04.11.2015 | ES | 04.11.2015 | FI | 04.11.2015 | IT | 04.11.2015 | LT | 04.11.2015 | LV | 04.11.2015 | MC | 04.11.2015 | NL | 04.11.2015 | PL | 04.11.2015 | RO | 04.11.2015 | SE | 04.11.2015 | SI | 04.11.2015 | SK | 04.11.2015 | TR | 04.11.2015 | GR | 05.02.2016 | IS | 04.03.2016 | PT | 04.03.2016 | IE | 18.05.2016 | LU | 18.05.2016 | CH | 31.05.2016 | FR | 31.05.2016 | LI | 31.05.2016 | MT | 31.05.2016 | [2018/38] |
Former [2018/32] | HU | 18.05.2007 | |
AT | 04.11.2015 | ||
BE | 04.11.2015 | ||
CY | 04.11.2015 | ||
CZ | 04.11.2015 | ||
DK | 04.11.2015 | ||
EE | 04.11.2015 | ||
ES | 04.11.2015 | ||
FI | 04.11.2015 | ||
IT | 04.11.2015 | ||
LT | 04.11.2015 | ||
LV | 04.11.2015 | ||
MC | 04.11.2015 | ||
NL | 04.11.2015 | ||
PL | 04.11.2015 | ||
RO | 04.11.2015 | ||
SE | 04.11.2015 | ||
SI | 04.11.2015 | ||
SK | 04.11.2015 | ||
TR | 04.11.2015 | ||
GR | 05.02.2016 | ||
IS | 04.03.2016 | ||
PT | 04.03.2016 | ||
IE | 18.05.2016 | ||
LU | 18.05.2016 | ||
CH | 31.05.2016 | ||
FR | 31.05.2016 | ||
LI | 31.05.2016 | ||
MT | 31.05.2016 | ||
Former [2018/29] | HU | 18.05.2007 | |
AT | 04.11.2015 | ||
BE | 04.11.2015 | ||
CY | 04.11.2015 | ||
CZ | 04.11.2015 | ||
DK | 04.11.2015 | ||
EE | 04.11.2015 | ||
ES | 04.11.2015 | ||
FI | 04.11.2015 | ||
IT | 04.11.2015 | ||
LT | 04.11.2015 | ||
LV | 04.11.2015 | ||
MC | 04.11.2015 | ||
NL | 04.11.2015 | ||
PL | 04.11.2015 | ||
RO | 04.11.2015 | ||
SE | 04.11.2015 | ||
SI | 04.11.2015 | ||
SK | 04.11.2015 | ||
TR | 04.11.2015 | ||
GR | 05.02.2016 | ||
IS | 04.03.2016 | ||
PT | 04.03.2016 | ||
IE | 18.05.2016 | ||
LU | 18.05.2016 | ||
CH | 31.05.2016 | ||
FR | 31.05.2016 | ||
LI | 31.05.2016 | ||
Former [2018/28] | HU | 18.05.2007 | |
AT | 04.11.2015 | ||
BE | 04.11.2015 | ||
CY | 04.11.2015 | ||
CZ | 04.11.2015 | ||
DK | 04.11.2015 | ||
EE | 04.11.2015 | ||
ES | 04.11.2015 | ||
FI | 04.11.2015 | ||
IT | 04.11.2015 | ||
LT | 04.11.2015 | ||
LV | 04.11.2015 | ||
MC | 04.11.2015 | ||
NL | 04.11.2015 | ||
PL | 04.11.2015 | ||
RO | 04.11.2015 | ||
SE | 04.11.2015 | ||
SI | 04.11.2015 | ||
SK | 04.11.2015 | ||
GR | 05.02.2016 | ||
IS | 04.03.2016 | ||
PT | 04.03.2016 | ||
IE | 18.05.2016 | ||
LU | 18.05.2016 | ||
CH | 31.05.2016 | ||
FR | 31.05.2016 | ||
LI | 31.05.2016 | ||
Former [2017/26] | AT | 04.11.2015 | |
BE | 04.11.2015 | ||
CZ | 04.11.2015 | ||
DK | 04.11.2015 | ||
EE | 04.11.2015 | ||
ES | 04.11.2015 | ||
FI | 04.11.2015 | ||
IT | 04.11.2015 | ||
LT | 04.11.2015 | ||
LV | 04.11.2015 | ||
NL | 04.11.2015 | ||
PL | 04.11.2015 | ||
RO | 04.11.2015 | ||
SE | 04.11.2015 | ||
SI | 04.11.2015 | ||
SK | 04.11.2015 | ||
GR | 05.02.2016 | ||
IS | 04.03.2016 | ||
PT | 04.03.2016 | ||
IE | 18.05.2016 | ||
LU | 18.05.2016 | ||
CH | 31.05.2016 | ||
FR | 31.05.2016 | ||
LI | 31.05.2016 | ||
Former [2017/07] | AT | 04.11.2015 | |
BE | 04.11.2015 | ||
CZ | 04.11.2015 | ||
DK | 04.11.2015 | ||
EE | 04.11.2015 | ||
ES | 04.11.2015 | ||
FI | 04.11.2015 | ||
IT | 04.11.2015 | ||
LT | 04.11.2015 | ||
LV | 04.11.2015 | ||
NL | 04.11.2015 | ||
PL | 04.11.2015 | ||
RO | 04.11.2015 | ||
SE | 04.11.2015 | ||
SI | 04.11.2015 | ||
SK | 04.11.2015 | ||
GR | 05.02.2016 | ||
IS | 04.03.2016 | ||
PT | 04.03.2016 | ||
LU | 18.05.2016 | ||
CH | 31.05.2016 | ||
LI | 31.05.2016 | ||
Former [2017/04] | AT | 04.11.2015 | |
BE | 04.11.2015 | ||
CZ | 04.11.2015 | ||
DK | 04.11.2015 | ||
EE | 04.11.2015 | ||
ES | 04.11.2015 | ||
FI | 04.11.2015 | ||
IT | 04.11.2015 | ||
LT | 04.11.2015 | ||
LV | 04.11.2015 | ||
NL | 04.11.2015 | ||
PL | 04.11.2015 | ||
RO | 04.11.2015 | ||
SE | 04.11.2015 | ||
SI | 04.11.2015 | ||
SK | 04.11.2015 | ||
GR | 05.02.2016 | ||
IS | 04.03.2016 | ||
PT | 04.03.2016 | ||
LU | 18.05.2016 | ||
Former [2017/03] | AT | 04.11.2015 | |
BE | 04.11.2015 | ||
CZ | 04.11.2015 | ||
DK | 04.11.2015 | ||
EE | 04.11.2015 | ||
ES | 04.11.2015 | ||
FI | 04.11.2015 | ||
IT | 04.11.2015 | ||
LT | 04.11.2015 | ||
LV | 04.11.2015 | ||
NL | 04.11.2015 | ||
PL | 04.11.2015 | ||
RO | 04.11.2015 | ||
SE | 04.11.2015 | ||
SI | 04.11.2015 | ||
SK | 04.11.2015 | ||
GR | 05.02.2016 | ||
IS | 04.03.2016 | ||
PT | 04.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/49] | AT | 04.11.2015 | |
CZ | 04.11.2015 | ||
DK | 04.11.2015 | ||
EE | 04.11.2015 | ||
ES | 04.11.2015 | ||
FI | 04.11.2015 | ||
IT | 04.11.2015 | ||
LT | 04.11.2015 | ||
LV | 04.11.2015 | ||
NL | 04.11.2015 | ||
PL | 04.11.2015 | ||
RO | 04.11.2015 | ||
SE | 04.11.2015 | ||
SI | 04.11.2015 | ||
SK | 04.11.2015 | ||
GR | 05.02.2016 | ||
IS | 04.03.2016 | ||
PT | 04.03.2016 | ||
BE | 31.05.2016 | ||
Former [2016/39] | AT | 04.11.2015 | |
CZ | 04.11.2015 | ||
DK | 04.11.2015 | ||
EE | 04.11.2015 | ||
ES | 04.11.2015 | ||
FI | 04.11.2015 | ||
IT | 04.11.2015 | ||
LT | 04.11.2015 | ||
LV | 04.11.2015 | ||
NL | 04.11.2015 | ||
PL | 04.11.2015 | ||
RO | 04.11.2015 | ||
SE | 04.11.2015 | ||
SK | 04.11.2015 | ||
GR | 05.02.2016 | ||
IS | 04.03.2016 | ||
PT | 04.03.2016 | ||
BE | 31.05.2016 | ||
Former [2016/36] | AT | 04.11.2015 | |
CZ | 04.11.2015 | ||
EE | 04.11.2015 | ||
ES | 04.11.2015 | ||
FI | 04.11.2015 | ||
IT | 04.11.2015 | ||
LT | 04.11.2015 | ||
LV | 04.11.2015 | ||
NL | 04.11.2015 | ||
PL | 04.11.2015 | ||
RO | 04.11.2015 | ||
SE | 04.11.2015 | ||
SK | 04.11.2015 | ||
GR | 05.02.2016 | ||
IS | 04.03.2016 | ||
PT | 04.03.2016 | ||
BE | 31.05.2016 | ||
Former [2016/34] | AT | 04.11.2015 | |
CZ | 04.11.2015 | ||
ES | 04.11.2015 | ||
FI | 04.11.2015 | ||
IT | 04.11.2015 | ||
LT | 04.11.2015 | ||
LV | 04.11.2015 | ||
NL | 04.11.2015 | ||
PL | 04.11.2015 | ||
SE | 04.11.2015 | ||
GR | 05.02.2016 | ||
IS | 04.03.2016 | ||
PT | 04.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/25] | AT | 04.11.2015 | |
ES | 04.11.2015 | ||
FI | 04.11.2015 | ||
IT | 04.11.2015 | ||
LT | 04.11.2015 | ||
LV | 04.11.2015 | ||
NL | 04.11.2015 | ||
PL | 04.11.2015 | ||
SE | 04.11.2015 | ||
GR | 05.02.2016 | ||
IS | 04.03.2016 | ||
PT | 04.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/24] | AT | 04.11.2015 | |
ES | 04.11.2015 | ||
FI | 04.11.2015 | ||
IT | 04.11.2015 | ||
LT | 04.11.2015 | ||
NL | 04.11.2015 | ||
PL | 04.11.2015 | ||
SE | 04.11.2015 | ||
GR | 05.02.2016 | ||
IS | 04.03.2016 | ||
PT | 04.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/23] | ES | 04.11.2015 | |
IT | 04.11.2015 | ||
LT | 04.11.2015 | ||
NL | 04.11.2015 | ||
SE | 04.11.2015 | ||
IS | 04.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/22] | ES | 04.11.2015 | |
IT | 04.11.2015 | ||
LT | 04.11.2015 | ||
NL | 04.11.2015 | ||
IS | 04.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/21] | ES | 04.11.2015 | |
IT | 04.11.2015 | ||
LT | 04.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/20] | ES | 04.11.2015 | |
LT | 04.11.2015 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US6237510 (TSUMURA TOSHIKAZU [JP], et al) [A] 1,10 * column 2, line 66 - column 3, line 27 * * column 4, line 42 - line 50 * * figures 1,2,10,14 *; | [A]US2002144636 (TSUMURA TOSHIKAZU [JP], et al) [A] 1,10 * paragraph [0140] - paragraph [0140]; figure 6 *; | [A]JPS59208305 (HITACHI LTD, et al) [A] 1,10 * abstract *; | [A]US5944507 (FELDERMANN CHRISTIAN J [GB]) [A] 1,10 * abstract * | International search | [A]US2006201405 (DEVAULT DOUGLAS J [US], et al); | [A]CA2519981 (MAXON CORP [US]); | [A]CA1253745 (AIR LIQUIDE); | [A]US4928605 (SUWA TOSHIO [JP], et al); | [A]CA2271960 (AIR PROD & CHEM [US]); | [A]CA2485570 (PRAXAIR TECHNOLOGY INC [US]); | [A]US6202574 (LILJEDAHL GREGORY N [US], et al); | [A]US6935251 (MARIN OVIDIU [US], et al); | [A]US5309850 (DOWNS WILLIAM [US], et al); | [A]US2847979 (ANDREAS SIFRIN, et al); | [A]WO9855803 (KARLSRUHE FORSCHZENT [DE]) |