EP2018521 - INDUCTIVE SENSOR AND SEALING CAP FOR AN INDUCTIVE SENSOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.02.2016 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.12.2017 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): LU | published on 10.01.2018 [2018/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Baumer Electric AG Hummelstrasse 17 8500 Frauenfeld / CH | [2015/14] |
Former [2009/05] | For all designated states Baumer Electric AG Hummelstrasse 17 8500 Frauenfeld / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
JENNE, Bernd Franz-Moser-Strasse 8 78465 Konstanz / DE | 02 /
REETMEYER, Burkhard Blarerstrasse 17 78462 Konstanz / DE | [2009/12] |
Former [2009/05] | 01 /
JENNE, Bernd Franz-Moser-Strasse 8 78465 Konstanz / DE | ||
02 /
REETMEYER, Burkhard Gartenstrasse 18 78462 Konstanz / DE | Representative(s) | Strauss, Steffen Baumer Innotec AG Hummelstrasse 17 8500 Frauenfeld / CH | [2012/14] |
Former [2009/05] | Gachnang, Hans Rudolf Gachnang AG Badstrasse 5 Postfach 323 8501 Frauenfeld / CH | Application number, filing date | 07720122.6 | 04.05.2007 | [2009/05] | WO2007CH00225 | Priority number, date | CH20060078106 | 12.05.2006 Original published format: CH 781062006 | [2009/05] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007131373 | Date: | 22.11.2007 | Language: | DE | [2007/47] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2018521 | Date: | 28.01.2009 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.11.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/05] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2018521 | Date: | 01.04.2015 | Language: | DE | [2015/14] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 22.11.2007 | Classification | IPC: | G01D11/24, H03K17/95 | [2009/05] | CPC: |
G01D11/245 (EP);
H03K17/9505 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/05] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | INDUKTIVER SENSOR UND ABSCHLUSSKAPPE FÜR INDUKTIVEN SENSOR | [2009/05] | English: | INDUCTIVE SENSOR AND SEALING CAP FOR AN INDUCTIVE SENSOR | [2009/05] | French: | CAPTEUR INDUCTIF ET CAPOT DE FERMETURE DESTINÉ À UN CAPTEUR INDUCTIF | [2009/05] | Entry into regional phase | 20.09.2008 | National basic fee paid | 20.09.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.09.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.09.2008 | Examination requested [2009/05] | 26.03.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 28.09.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.10.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 09.10.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.01.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.02.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 17.02.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 17.02.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 26.03.2009 | Opposition(s) | 05.01.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/10] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.05.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.04.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.05.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.05.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 29.05.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 28.05.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 04.05.2007 | BG | 01.04.2015 | CY | 01.04.2015 | CZ | 01.04.2015 | DK | 01.04.2015 | EE | 01.04.2015 | ES | 01.04.2015 | FI | 01.04.2015 | IT | 01.04.2015 | LT | 01.04.2015 | LV | 01.04.2015 | MC | 01.04.2015 | MT | 01.04.2015 | NL | 01.04.2015 | PL | 01.04.2015 | RO | 01.04.2015 | SE | 01.04.2015 | SI | 01.04.2015 | SK | 01.04.2015 | TR | 01.04.2015 | AT | 04.05.2015 | IE | 04.05.2015 | LU | 04.05.2015 | BE | 31.05.2015 | GB | 01.07.2015 | GR | 02.07.2015 | IS | 01.08.2015 | PT | 03.08.2015 | [2018/02] |
Former [2017/39] | HU | 04.05.2007 | |
BG | 01.04.2015 | ||
CY | 01.04.2015 | ||
CZ | 01.04.2015 | ||
DK | 01.04.2015 | ||
EE | 01.04.2015 | ||
ES | 01.04.2015 | ||
FI | 01.04.2015 | ||
IT | 01.04.2015 | ||
LT | 01.04.2015 | ||
LV | 01.04.2015 | ||
MC | 01.04.2015 | ||
MT | 01.04.2015 | ||
NL | 01.04.2015 | ||
PL | 01.04.2015 | ||
RO | 01.04.2015 | ||
SE | 01.04.2015 | ||
SI | 01.04.2015 | ||
SK | 01.04.2015 | ||
TR | 01.04.2015 | ||
AT | 04.05.2015 | ||
IE | 04.05.2015 | ||
BE | 31.05.2015 | ||
GB | 01.07.2015 | ||
GR | 02.07.2015 | ||
IS | 01.08.2015 | ||
PT | 03.08.2015 | ||
Former [2017/03] | CZ | 01.04.2015 | |
DK | 01.04.2015 | ||
EE | 01.04.2015 | ||
ES | 01.04.2015 | ||
FI | 01.04.2015 | ||
IT | 01.04.2015 | ||
LT | 01.04.2015 | ||
LV | 01.04.2015 | ||
MC | 01.04.2015 | ||
MT | 01.04.2015 | ||
NL | 01.04.2015 | ||
PL | 01.04.2015 | ||
RO | 01.04.2015 | ||
SI | 01.04.2015 | ||
SK | 01.04.2015 | ||
AT | 04.05.2015 | ||
IE | 04.05.2015 | ||
GB | 01.07.2015 | ||
GR | 02.07.2015 | ||
IS | 01.08.2015 | ||
PT | 03.08.2015 | ||
Former [2016/36] | CZ | 01.04.2015 | |
DK | 01.04.2015 | ||
EE | 01.04.2015 | ||
ES | 01.04.2015 | ||
FI | 01.04.2015 | ||
IT | 01.04.2015 | ||
LT | 01.04.2015 | ||
LV | 01.04.2015 | ||
MC | 01.04.2015 | ||
NL | 01.04.2015 | ||
PL | 01.04.2015 | ||
RO | 01.04.2015 | ||
SI | 01.04.2015 | ||
SK | 01.04.2015 | ||
AT | 04.05.2015 | ||
IE | 04.05.2015 | ||
GB | 01.07.2015 | ||
GR | 02.07.2015 | ||
IS | 01.08.2015 | ||
PT | 03.08.2015 | ||
Former [2016/24] | CZ | 01.04.2015 | |
DK | 01.04.2015 | ||
EE | 01.04.2015 | ||
ES | 01.04.2015 | ||
FI | 01.04.2015 | ||
IT | 01.04.2015 | ||
LT | 01.04.2015 | ||
LV | 01.04.2015 | ||
MC | 01.04.2015 | ||
NL | 01.04.2015 | ||
PL | 01.04.2015 | ||
RO | 01.04.2015 | ||
SI | 01.04.2015 | ||
SK | 01.04.2015 | ||
IE | 04.05.2015 | ||
GB | 01.07.2015 | ||
GR | 02.07.2015 | ||
IS | 01.08.2015 | ||
PT | 03.08.2015 | ||
Former [2016/23] | CZ | 01.04.2015 | |
DK | 01.04.2015 | ||
EE | 01.04.2015 | ||
ES | 01.04.2015 | ||
FI | 01.04.2015 | ||
IT | 01.04.2015 | ||
LT | 01.04.2015 | ||
LV | 01.04.2015 | ||
MC | 01.04.2015 | ||
NL | 01.04.2015 | ||
PL | 01.04.2015 | ||
RO | 01.04.2015 | ||
SK | 01.04.2015 | ||
IE | 04.05.2015 | ||
GB | 01.07.2015 | ||
GR | 02.07.2015 | ||
IS | 01.08.2015 | ||
PT | 03.08.2015 | ||
Former [2016/20] | CZ | 01.04.2015 | |
DK | 01.04.2015 | ||
EE | 01.04.2015 | ||
ES | 01.04.2015 | ||
FI | 01.04.2015 | ||
IT | 01.04.2015 | ||
LT | 01.04.2015 | ||
LV | 01.04.2015 | ||
MC | 01.04.2015 | ||
NL | 01.04.2015 | ||
PL | 01.04.2015 | ||
RO | 01.04.2015 | ||
SK | 01.04.2015 | ||
IE | 04.05.2015 | ||
GR | 02.07.2015 | ||
IS | 01.08.2015 | ||
PT | 03.08.2015 | ||
Former [2016/10] | CZ | 01.04.2015 | |
DK | 01.04.2015 | ||
EE | 01.04.2015 | ||
ES | 01.04.2015 | ||
FI | 01.04.2015 | ||
IT | 01.04.2015 | ||
LT | 01.04.2015 | ||
LV | 01.04.2015 | ||
MC | 01.04.2015 | ||
NL | 01.04.2015 | ||
PL | 01.04.2015 | ||
RO | 01.04.2015 | ||
SK | 01.04.2015 | ||
GR | 02.07.2015 | ||
IS | 01.08.2015 | ||
PT | 03.08.2015 | ||
Former [2016/09] | CZ | 01.04.2015 | |
DK | 01.04.2015 | ||
EE | 01.04.2015 | ||
ES | 01.04.2015 | ||
FI | 01.04.2015 | ||
IT | 01.04.2015 | ||
LT | 01.04.2015 | ||
LV | 01.04.2015 | ||
MC | 01.04.2015 | ||
NL | 01.04.2015 | ||
GR | 02.07.2015 | ||
IS | 01.08.2015 | ||
PT | 03.08.2015 | ||
Former [2016/08] | CZ | 01.04.2015 | |
DK | 01.04.2015 | ||
ES | 01.04.2015 | ||
FI | 01.04.2015 | ||
IT | 01.04.2015 | ||
LT | 01.04.2015 | ||
LV | 01.04.2015 | ||
MC | 01.04.2015 | ||
NL | 01.04.2015 | ||
GR | 02.07.2015 | ||
IS | 01.08.2015 | ||
PT | 03.08.2015 | ||
Former [2016/07] | CZ | 01.04.2015 | |
DK | 01.04.2015 | ||
ES | 01.04.2015 | ||
FI | 01.04.2015 | ||
LT | 01.04.2015 | ||
LV | 01.04.2015 | ||
MC | 01.04.2015 | ||
NL | 01.04.2015 | ||
GR | 02.07.2015 | ||
IS | 01.08.2015 | ||
PT | 03.08.2015 | ||
Former [2016/06] | CZ | 01.04.2015 | |
ES | 01.04.2015 | ||
FI | 01.04.2015 | ||
LT | 01.04.2015 | ||
LV | 01.04.2015 | ||
MC | 01.04.2015 | ||
NL | 01.04.2015 | ||
GR | 02.07.2015 | ||
IS | 01.08.2015 | ||
PT | 03.08.2015 | ||
Former [2015/50] | CZ | 01.04.2015 | |
ES | 01.04.2015 | ||
FI | 01.04.2015 | ||
LT | 01.04.2015 | ||
LV | 01.04.2015 | ||
NL | 01.04.2015 | ||
GR | 02.07.2015 | ||
IS | 01.08.2015 | ||
PT | 03.08.2015 | ||
Former [2015/49] | CZ | 01.04.2015 | |
ES | 01.04.2015 | ||
FI | 01.04.2015 | ||
LT | 01.04.2015 | ||
LV | 01.04.2015 | ||
NL | 01.04.2015 | ||
GR | 02.07.2015 | ||
PT | 03.08.2015 | ||
Former [2015/42] | NL | 01.04.2015 | Cited in | International search | [Y]EP0149217 (VDO SCHINDLING [DE]) [Y] 1-9 * column 2, lines 14-17; figures 1,2,6,8 * * column 4, lines 10-38 *; | [Y]DE20211087U (TURCK WERNER KG [DE]) [Y] 1-9 * abstract *; | [Y]DE20019542U (TURCK WERNER KG [DE]) [Y] 1-9 * page 3, paragraph LAST; figures 1,2 *; | [Y]DE1915044 (SCHALLER DIPL ING WERNER) [Y] 1-9 * pages 5-6; figure 1 *; | [Y]DE4418570 (VDO SCHINDLING [DE]) [Y] 1-9 * abstract * | Examination | US5801530 | DE29907642U |