EP2015207 - MATERIAL DISTRIBUTION IMAGE TRACING INQUIRY SYSTEM WITH ELECTRONIC TAG SHOOTING FUNCTION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 29.10.2010 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.10.2010 | Refusal of application | published on 01.12.2010 [2010/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Li, Ke Room 301, No. 148, North Maoming Road Jing'an District, Shanghai 200041 / CN | [2009/03] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2009/03] | Representative(s) | Korga, Leokadia Kancelaria Rzecznika Patentowego ul. Bereniki 6/7 44-117 Gliwice / PL | [N/P] |
Former [2009/03] | Korga, Leokadia Kancelaria Rzecznika Patentowego ul. Bereniki 6/7 44-117 Gliwice / PL | Application number, filing date | 07720309.9 | 02.03.2007 | [2009/03] | WO2007CN00675 | Priority number, date | CN2006125130 | 27.03.2006 Original published format: CN200610025130 | [2009/03] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007109971 | Date: | 04.10.2007 | Language: | ZH | [2007/40] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2015207 | Date: | 14.01.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/03] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 04.10.2007 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.03.2009 | Classification | IPC: | G06F19/00, G06K17/00 | [2009/03] | CPC: |
G06Q10/087 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/03] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | MATERIALVERTEILUNGS-BILD-TRACING-ANFRAGESYSTEM MIT SHOOTING-FUNKTION ELEKTRONISCHER ETIKETTEN | [2009/03] | English: | MATERIAL DISTRIBUTION IMAGE TRACING INQUIRY SYSTEM WITH ELECTRONIC TAG SHOOTING FUNCTION | [2009/03] | French: | SYSTÈME D'INTERROGATION DE TRACÉ D'IMAGE À RÉPARTITION DE MATIÈRE AYANT UNE FONCTION DE PRISE DE VUE D'ÉTIQUETTE ÉLECTRONIQUE | [2009/03] | Entry into regional phase | 25.10.2008 | Translation filed | 25.10.2008 | National basic fee paid | 25.10.2008 | Search fee paid | 25.10.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.10.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.10.2008 | Examination requested [2009/03] | 24.04.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.08.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.04.2010 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 28.04.2010 | 28.04.2010 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 13.07.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2010/48] | 23.07.2010 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2010/48] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.10.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2004105006 (LAZO PHILIP A [US], et al) [X] 1-9 * the whole document *; | [X]EP1452997 (CANON KK [JP]) [X] 1-9 * abstract * * paragraph [0014] - paragraph [0019] * * paragraph [0022] - paragraph [0158] * * paragraph [0182] - paragraph [0224] * * figures 1-3,6-18C,27-44 *; | [X]US2005229227 (ROGERS BRIAN [US]) [X] 1-9 * figures 1-3,5-7,17-24 * * paragraph [0020] - paragraph [0026] ** paragraph [0051] - paragraph [0145] *; | [X]US2006007304 (ANDERSON DUANE [US]) [X] 1-9 * abstract * * figures 1-4,6-25 * * paragraph [0011] - paragraph [0018] * * paragraph [0049] - paragraph [0102] * | International search | [X]CN1538338 (CANON KK [JP]); | [A]JP2005184742 (CASIO COMPUTER CO LTD) | Examination | US2006022814 |